Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2353089

EP2353089 - METHOD FOR REPRESENTATION OF SAFETY-RELEVANT INFORMATION ON A DISPLAY AND APPARATUS FOR THE APPLICATION OF THE METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  27.04.2012
Database last updated on 11.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.04.2016Opposition withdrawnpublished on 18.05.2016  [2016/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Deuta-Werke GmbH
Paffrather Strasse 140
51465 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
[2011/32]
Inventor(s)01 / MANZ, Holger
Hebborner Hof 2
51467 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
02 / GANZ, Rudolf
Lombachstr. 19
51491 Overath / DE
03 / HAAS, Thorsten
Stargarder Str. 32
10437 Berlin / DE
 [2012/17]
Former [2011/32]01 / MANZ, Holger
Hebborner Hof 2
51467 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
02 / GANZ, Rudolf
Lombachstr. 19
51491 Overath / DE
03 / HAAS, Thorsten
Grabengasse 24
50679 Köln / DE
Representative(s)Lippert Stachow Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte
Partnerschaft mbB
Frankenforster Strasse 135-137
51427 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/22]Lippert, Stachow & Partner
Patentanwälte Frankenforster Strasse 135-137
51427 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
Former [2011/32]Lippert, Stachow & Partner
Patentanwälte Frankenforster Strasse 135-137
51427 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
Application number, filing date10730168.105.07.2010
[2011/32]
WO2010EP59572
Priority number, dateEP2009016467206.07.2009         Original published format: EP 09164672
WO2010EP5294609.03.2010         Original published format: PCT/EP2010/052946
[2011/32]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2011003872
Date:13.01.2011
Language:EN
[2011/02]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2353089
Date:10.08.2011
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.01.2011
[2011/32]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2353089
Date:30.05.2012
Language:EN
[2012/22]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP13.01.2011
ClassificationInternational:G06F11/00, G06F11/07
[2011/32]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/32]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR DARSTELLUNG SICHERHEITSRELEVANTER INFORMATIONEN AUF EINER ANZEIGE UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ANWENDUNG DIESES VERFAHRENS[2011/32]
English:METHOD FOR REPRESENTATION OF SAFETY-RELEVANT INFORMATION ON A DISPLAY AND APPARATUS FOR THE APPLICATION OF THE METHOD[2011/32]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE REPRÉSENTATION D'INFORMATIONS RELATIVES À LA SÉCURITÉ SUR UN AFFICHEUR ET APPAREIL POUR L'APPLICATION DU PROCÉDÉ[2011/32]
Entry into regional phase18.05.2011National basic fee paid 
18.05.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
18.05.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.05.2011Examination requested  [2011/32]
29.06.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.02.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.03.2012Fee for grant paid
29.03.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.02.2012
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  26.02.2013  11.04.2016  WITHDRAWN
Digital Simplex Pte Ltd.
105 Cecil Street
No. 03-02 The Octagon
Singapore 069534 / SG
Opponent's representative
Leffers, Thomas
Schweiger & Partners
Intellectual Property Law Firm
Elsenheimer Strasse 1
80687 München / DE
 02  28.02.2013  22.08.2013  WITHDRAWN
Bombardier Transportation GmbH
Schöneberger Ufer 1
10785 Berlin / DE
Opponent's representative
AWA Sweden AB
P.O. Box 45086
104 30 Stockholm / SE
 [N/P]
Former [2016/20]
Opponent(s)01  26.02.2013  11.04.2016  WITHDRAWN
Digital Simplex Pte Ltd.
105 Cecil Street
No. 03-02 The Octagon
Singapore 069534 / SG
Opponent's representative
Leffers, Thomas
Schweiger & Partners
Intellectual Property Law Firm
Elsenheimer Strasse 1
80687 München / DE
 02  28.02.2013  22.08.2013  WITHDRAWN
Bombardier Transportation GmbH
Schöneberger Ufer 1
10785 Berlin / DE
Opponent's representative
Awapatent AB
P.O. Box 45086
104 30 Stockholm / SE
Former [2016/01]
Opponent(s)01  26.02.2013  05.03.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Digital Simplex Pte Ltd.
105 Cecil Street
No. 03-02 The Octagon
Singapore 069534 / SG
Opponent's representative
Leffers, Thomas
Schweiger & Partners
Karlstraße 35
80333 München / DE
 02  28.02.2013  22.08.2013  WITHDRAWN
Bombardier Transportation GmbH
Schöneberger Ufer 1
10785 Berlin / DE
Opponent's representative
Awapatent AB
P.O. Box 45086
104 30 Stockholm / SE
Former [2015/51]
Opponent(s)01  26.02.2013  05.03.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Digital Simplex Pte Ltd.
105 Cecil Street
No. 03-02 The Octagon
Singapore 069534 / SG
Opponent's representative
Leffers, Thomas
Schweiger & Partners
Karlstraße 35
80333 München / DE
 02  28.02.2013  22.08.2013  WITHDRAWN
Bombardier Transportation GmbH
Schöneberger Ufer 1
10785 Berlin / DE
Opponent's representative
Hansson, Anders Max
Awapatent AB
P.O. Box 45086
104 30 Stockholm / SE
Former [2013/40]
Opponent(s)01  26.02.2013   
Digital Simplex Pte Ltd.
105 Cecil Street
No. 03-02 The Octagon
Singapore 069534 / SG
Opponent's representative
Schäfer, Horst
Schweiger & Partner Karlstraße 35
80333 München / DE
 02  28.02.2013  22.08.2013  WITHDRAWN
Bombardier Transportation GmbH
Schöneberger Ufer 1
10785 Berlin / DE
Opponent's representative
Hansson, Anders Max
Awapatent AB
P.O. Box 45086
104 30 Stockholm / SE
Former [2013/15]
Opponent(s)01  26.02.2013   
Digital Simplex Pte Ltd.
105 Cecil Street
No. 03-02 The Octagon
Singapore 069534 / SG
Opponent's representative
Schäfer, Horst
Schweiger & Partner Karlstraße 35
80333 München / DE
 02  28.02.2013   
Bombardier Transportation GmbH
Schöneberger Ufer 1
10785 Berlin / DE
Opponent's representative
Hansson, Anders Max
Awapatent AB
P.O. Box 45086
104 30 Stockholm / SE
Former [2013/14]
Opponent(s)01  26.02.2013   
Digital Simplex Pte Ltd.
105 Cecil Street
No. 03-02 The Octagon
Singapore 069534 / SG
Opponent's representative
Schäfer, Horst
Schweiger & Partner Karlstraße 35
80333 München / DE
10.04.2013Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
07.07.2014Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition31.07.2014Appeal received No.  T1657/14
17.11.2014Statement of grounds filed
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL30.05.2012
CY30.05.2012
CZ30.05.2012
DK30.05.2012
EE30.05.2012
FI30.05.2012
HR30.05.2012
LT30.05.2012
LV30.05.2012
MK30.05.2012
MT30.05.2012
RO30.05.2012
SI30.05.2012
SK30.05.2012
SM30.05.2012
TR30.05.2012
IE05.07.2012
LU05.07.2012
MC31.07.2012
BG30.08.2012
NO30.08.2012
GR31.08.2012
IS30.09.2012
PT01.10.2012
GB05.07.2014
[2015/24]
Former [2014/27]AL30.05.2012
CY30.05.2012
CZ30.05.2012
DK30.05.2012
EE30.05.2012
FI30.05.2012
HR30.05.2012
LT30.05.2012
LV30.05.2012
MK30.05.2012
MT30.05.2012
RO30.05.2012
SI30.05.2012
SK30.05.2012
SM30.05.2012
TR30.05.2012
IE05.07.2012
LU05.07.2012
MC31.07.2012
BG30.08.2012
NO30.08.2012
GR31.08.2012
IS30.09.2012
PT01.10.2012
Former [2014/21]AL30.05.2012
CY30.05.2012
CZ30.05.2012
DK30.05.2012
EE30.05.2012
FI30.05.2012
HR30.05.2012
LT30.05.2012
LV30.05.2012
MK30.05.2012
MT30.05.2012
RO30.05.2012
SI30.05.2012
SK30.05.2012
TR30.05.2012
IE05.07.2012
MC31.07.2012
BG30.08.2012
NO30.08.2012
GR31.08.2012
IS30.09.2012
PT01.10.2012
Former [2013/51]AL30.05.2012
CY30.05.2012
CZ30.05.2012
DK30.05.2012
EE30.05.2012
FI30.05.2012
HR30.05.2012
LT30.05.2012
LV30.05.2012
MK30.05.2012
MT30.05.2012
RO30.05.2012
SI30.05.2012
SK30.05.2012
IE05.07.2012
MC31.07.2012
BG30.08.2012
NO30.08.2012
GR31.08.2012
IS30.09.2012
PT01.10.2012
Former [2013/34]CY30.05.2012
CZ30.05.2012
DK30.05.2012
EE30.05.2012
FI30.05.2012
HR30.05.2012
LT30.05.2012
LV30.05.2012
MK30.05.2012
MT30.05.2012
RO30.05.2012
SI30.05.2012
SK30.05.2012
IE05.07.2012
MC31.07.2012
BG30.08.2012
NO30.08.2012
GR31.08.2012
IS30.09.2012
PT01.10.2012
Former [2013/33]CY30.05.2012
CZ30.05.2012
DK30.05.2012
EE30.05.2012
FI30.05.2012
HR30.05.2012
LT30.05.2012
LV30.05.2012
MK30.05.2012
RO30.05.2012
SI30.05.2012
SK30.05.2012
IE05.07.2012
MC31.07.2012
NO30.08.2012
GR31.08.2012
IS30.09.2012
PT01.10.2012
Former [2013/13]CY30.05.2012
CZ30.05.2012
DK30.05.2012
EE30.05.2012
FI30.05.2012
HR30.05.2012
LT30.05.2012
LV30.05.2012
MK30.05.2012
RO30.05.2012
SI30.05.2012
SK30.05.2012
MC31.07.2012
NO30.08.2012
GR31.08.2012
IS30.09.2012
PT01.10.2012
Former [2013/12]CY30.05.2012
CZ30.05.2012
DK30.05.2012
EE30.05.2012
FI30.05.2012
HR30.05.2012
LT30.05.2012
LV30.05.2012
MK30.05.2012
RO30.05.2012
SI30.05.2012
SK30.05.2012
MC31.07.2012
NO30.08.2012
GR31.08.2012
IS30.09.2012
Former [2013/11]CY30.05.2012
CZ30.05.2012
DK30.05.2012
EE30.05.2012
FI30.05.2012
HR30.05.2012
LT30.05.2012
LV30.05.2012
RO30.05.2012
SI30.05.2012
SK30.05.2012
MC31.07.2012
NO30.08.2012
GR31.08.2012
IS30.09.2012
Former [2013/10]CY30.05.2012
CZ30.05.2012
DK30.05.2012
EE30.05.2012
FI30.05.2012
HR30.05.2012
LT30.05.2012
LV30.05.2012
RO30.05.2012
SI30.05.2012
SK30.05.2012
NO30.08.2012
GR31.08.2012
IS30.09.2012
Former [2013/09]CY30.05.2012
DK30.05.2012
EE30.05.2012
FI30.05.2012
HR30.05.2012
LT30.05.2012
LV30.05.2012
SI30.05.2012
NO30.08.2012
GR31.08.2012
IS30.09.2012
Former [2013/08]CY30.05.2012
DK30.05.2012
FI30.05.2012
HR30.05.2012
LT30.05.2012
LV30.05.2012
SI30.05.2012
NO30.08.2012
GR31.08.2012
IS30.09.2012
Former [2012/51]CY30.05.2012
FI30.05.2012
HR30.05.2012
LT30.05.2012
LV30.05.2012
SI30.05.2012
NO30.08.2012
GR31.08.2012
IS30.09.2012
Former [2012/50]CY30.05.2012
FI30.05.2012
HR30.05.2012
LT30.05.2012
LV30.05.2012
NO30.08.2012
GR31.08.2012
IS30.09.2012
Former [2012/49]CY30.05.2012
FI30.05.2012
LT30.05.2012
NO30.08.2012
IS30.09.2012
Former [2012/48]FI30.05.2012
LT30.05.2012
NO30.08.2012
Former [2012/47]LT30.05.2012
NO30.08.2012
Cited inInternational search[A]DE4332143  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-22 * column 1, line 37 - column 2, line 48 * * column 3, line 3 - column 4, line 47 * * column 5, line 11 - line 27 * * column 5, line 54 - column 6, line 49 * * figures 1,2 *;
 [A]EP0856792  (ALSTHOM CGE ALCATEL [FR]) [A] 1-22 * column 1, line 1 - line 21 * * column 1, line 53 - column 2, line 35 * * column 3, line 1 - column 7, line 41 * * figures 1,2 *
by applicantDE4332143
 EP0856792
 DE102004039498