Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2429761

EP2429761 - PORTABLE SHAPENING MACHINE FOR SHAPENING WOOD DRILLS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  08.04.2016
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip08.04.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 11.05.2016  [2016/19]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nordutensili S.R.L.
Via Pramollo n. 2
33040 Povoletto (UD) / IT
For all designated states
RE.M.A. S.A.S. Di Pressato Emanuele & C.
Via Fermi n. 5
20060 Cassina de' Pecchi (MI) / IT
[2012/12]
Inventor(s)01 / DIPLOTTI, Nereo
Via Pramollo n. 2
I-33040 Povoletto (UD) / IT
02 / PRESSATO, Emanuele
Via Fermi n. 5
I-20060 Cassina de' Pecchi (MI) / IT
 [2012/12]
Representative(s)Cragnolini, Sergio
All Studio
Viale Venezia 277
I-33100 Udine / IT
[N/P]
Former [2012/12]Cragnolini, Sergio
All Studio Viale Venezia 277
I-33100 Udine / IT
Application number, filing date10730505.417.05.2010
WO2010IB01134
Priority number, dateIT2009UD0009515.05.2009         Original published format: IT UD20090095
[2012/12]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2010146422
Date:23.12.2010
Language:EN
[2010/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2429761
Date:21.03.2012
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.2010
[2012/12]
Search report(s)International search reportEP23.12.2010
ClassificationInternational:B24B23/00, B24B27/00, B24B41/06
[2012/12]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/12]
TitleGerman:TRAGBARE SCHÄRFMASCHINE ZUR SCHÄRFUNG VON HOLZBOHRERN[2012/12]
English:PORTABLE SHAPENING MACHINE FOR SHAPENING WOOD DRILLS[2012/12]
French:MACHINE D'AIGUISAGE PORTABLE POUR AIGUISER DES MÈCHES À BOIS[2012/12]
Entry into regional phase14.10.2011National basic fee paid 
14.10.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
14.10.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.10.2011Examination requested  [2012/12]
23.10.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.12.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.04.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.10.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.03.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.12.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/19]
08.01.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2016/19]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  05.12.2012
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
31.03.2014Request for further processing filed
31.03.2014Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
10.04.2014Decision despatched
23.10.2012Request for further processing filed
23.10.2012Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
12.11.2012Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.04.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
15.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
12.05.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.201506   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[A]DE202005005859U  (TAIWAN MORE CASH VILLAGER CORP [TW]) [A] 1-4,6-9 * figures 1-6 * * paragraphs [0002] , [0015] , [0017] , [0018] , [0021] , [0024] , [0026] *;
 [A]US2007243801  (LIAO MING-KO [TW]) [A] 1-4,6-9 * figures 1-6 * * paragraphs [0008] , [0010] , [0028] - [0030] *;
 [A]EP2006052  (TAIWAN MORE CASH VILLAGER CORP [CN]) [A] 1-4,6-9 * paragraph [0017]; figures 1-3,7,8 *;
 [A]US7473163  (LEE WANG-SHENG [TW]) [A] 1-4,6-9 * column 2, line 38 - column 3, line 26; figures 1,4,5,6,7,9,12,13 *;
 [A]US5400546  (CHRISTIAN WILLIAM C [US], et al) [A] 1-4,6-9 * column 3, line 24 - column 4, line 10; figure 1 *;
 [A]WO9801259  (DAREX CORP [US]) [A] 1-4,6-9 * page 5, line 8 - page 7, line 2; figures 5,6,7A,7B,8,9 *;
 [A]FR1020523  (M.JACQUES GRIVEAU) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]US4016680  (MOORES JR ROBERT GORDON, et al) [A] 5 * figures 1,3A * * column 2, line 51 - column 3, line 52 *