Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2443806

EP2443806 - GENERIC SMART USSD CLIENT MODULE EMBARKED IN A TELECOMMUNICATION TERMINAL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.07.2015
Database last updated on 18.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip13.10.2017Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU, SM, TR
published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Opencode Systems O.O.D.
J.K.Hippodruma Bl.1, Ap.4
1612 Sofia / BG
[2012/17]
Inventor(s)01 / STAYKOFF, Constantin
J.K. Hippodruma
BL.1 Ap.4
1612 Sofia / BG
 [2012/17]
Application number, filing date10730542.715.06.2010
WO2010IB52686
Priority number, dateFR2009000293317.06.2009         Original published format: FR 0902933
[2012/17]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2010146541
Date:23.12.2010
Language:FR
[2010/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2443806
Date:25.04.2012
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.2010
[2012/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2443806
Date:27.08.2014
Language:FR
[2014/35]
Search report(s)International search reportEP23.12.2010
ClassificationInternational:H04L29/06, H04L29/08, H04W4/14, G06F3/048
[2012/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/17]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:IN EIN TELEKOMMUNIKATIONSENDGERÄT EINGEBETTETES GENERISCHES INTELLIGENTES USSD-CLIENT-MODUL[2012/17]
English:GENERIC SMART USSD CLIENT MODULE EMBARKED IN A TELECOMMUNICATION TERMINAL[2012/17]
French:MODULE CLIENT USSD GENERIQUE INTELLIGENT EMBARQUE DANS UN TERMINAL DE TELECOMMUNICATIONS[2012/17]
Entry into regional phase12.12.2011National basic fee paid 
12.12.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
23.01.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.12.2011Examination requested  [2012/18]
11.01.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.01.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.05.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.04.2014Date of oral proceedings
17.04.2014Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
25.04.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.06.2014Fee for grant paid
05.06.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
18.07.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  16.01.2013
Opposition(s)28.05.2015No opposition filed within time limit [2015/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.08.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
22.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
05.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.201203   M06   Fee paid on   22.08.2012
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU15.06.2010
AT27.08.2014
CY27.08.2014
CZ27.08.2014
DK27.08.2014
EE27.08.2014
ES27.08.2014
FI27.08.2014
HR27.08.2014
IT27.08.2014
LT27.08.2014
LV27.08.2014
MC27.08.2014
MT27.08.2014
NL27.08.2014
PL27.08.2014
RO27.08.2014
SI27.08.2014
SK27.08.2014
SM27.08.2014
TR27.08.2014
BG27.11.2014
NO27.11.2014
GR28.11.2014
IS27.12.2014
PT29.12.2014
[2017/38]
Former [2017/03]AT27.08.2014
CY27.08.2014
CZ27.08.2014
DK27.08.2014
EE27.08.2014
ES27.08.2014
FI27.08.2014
HR27.08.2014
IT27.08.2014
LT27.08.2014
LV27.08.2014
MC27.08.2014
MT27.08.2014
NL27.08.2014
PL27.08.2014
RO27.08.2014
SI27.08.2014
SK27.08.2014
BG27.11.2014
NO27.11.2014
GR28.11.2014
IS27.12.2014
PT29.12.2014
Former [2016/09]AT27.08.2014
CY27.08.2014
CZ27.08.2014
DK27.08.2014
EE27.08.2014
ES27.08.2014
FI27.08.2014
HR27.08.2014
IT27.08.2014
LT27.08.2014
LV27.08.2014
MC27.08.2014
NL27.08.2014
PL27.08.2014
RO27.08.2014
SI27.08.2014
SK27.08.2014
BG27.11.2014
NO27.11.2014
GR28.11.2014
IS27.12.2014
PT29.12.2014
Former [2015/50]AT27.08.2014
CY27.08.2014
CZ27.08.2014
DK27.08.2014
EE27.08.2014
ES27.08.2014
FI27.08.2014
HR27.08.2014
IT27.08.2014
LT27.08.2014
LV27.08.2014
NL27.08.2014
PL27.08.2014
RO27.08.2014
SI27.08.2014
SK27.08.2014
BG27.11.2014
NO27.11.2014
GR28.11.2014
IS27.12.2014
PT29.12.2014
Former [2015/24]AT27.08.2014
CY27.08.2014
CZ27.08.2014
DK27.08.2014
EE27.08.2014
ES27.08.2014
FI27.08.2014
HR27.08.2014
IT27.08.2014
LT27.08.2014
LV27.08.2014
NL27.08.2014
PL27.08.2014
RO27.08.2014
SK27.08.2014
BG27.11.2014
NO27.11.2014
GR28.11.2014
IS27.12.2014
PT29.12.2014
Former [2015/23]AT27.08.2014
CY27.08.2014
CZ27.08.2014
DK27.08.2014
EE27.08.2014
ES27.08.2014
FI27.08.2014
HR27.08.2014
IT27.08.2014
LT27.08.2014
LV27.08.2014
NL27.08.2014
RO27.08.2014
SK27.08.2014
BG27.11.2014
NO27.11.2014
GR28.11.2014
IS27.12.2014
PT29.12.2014
Former [2015/22]AT27.08.2014
CY27.08.2014
DK27.08.2014
ES27.08.2014
FI27.08.2014
HR27.08.2014
IT27.08.2014
LT27.08.2014
LV27.08.2014
NL27.08.2014
RO27.08.2014
BG27.11.2014
NO27.11.2014
GR28.11.2014
IS27.12.2014
PT29.12.2014
Former [2015/16]AT27.08.2014
CY27.08.2014
ES27.08.2014
FI27.08.2014
HR27.08.2014
LT27.08.2014
LV27.08.2014
NL27.08.2014
BG27.11.2014
NO27.11.2014
GR28.11.2014
IS27.12.2014
PT29.12.2014
Former [2015/12]AT27.08.2014
CY27.08.2014
ES27.08.2014
FI27.08.2014
HR27.08.2014
LT27.08.2014
LV27.08.2014
BG27.11.2014
NO27.11.2014
GR28.11.2014
IS27.12.2014
PT29.12.2014
Former [2015/11]CY27.08.2014
ES27.08.2014
FI27.08.2014
LT27.08.2014
BG27.11.2014
NO27.11.2014
GR28.11.2014
PT29.12.2014
Former [2015/10]ES27.08.2014
FI27.08.2014
LT27.08.2014
BG27.11.2014
NO27.11.2014
Former [2015/09]FI27.08.2014
LT27.08.2014
Former [2015/08]LT27.08.2014
Cited inInternational search[XI]KR100628769B  ;
 [XI]US2009011745  (CHA DU-JIN [KR]) [X] 1,8 * figure 1 * * paragraphs [0032] - [0039] * [I] 2-7,9-22;
 [XI]WO2005079084  (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al) [X] 1,8 * figures 3,4 * * page 7, line 30 - page 9, line 2 * [I] 2-7,9-22;
 [XI]  - ANONYMOUS, "USSD Services for Interactive Mobile Users - Building User-Friendly Mobile Telephony Applications Using Dialogic TM Distributed Signaling Interface Components", INTERNET CITATION, (20080831), pages 1 - 17, URL: http://www.dialogic.com/products/docs/appnotes/11038_USSD_an.pdf, (20080511), XP002528245 [X] 1,8 * figures 1-4 * * paragraphs [EXECUTIVE] , [SUMMARY] * * paragraph [INTRODUCTION] - paragraphs [0HOW] , [00TO] , [FORMAT] , [USSD] , [TEXT] * [I] 2-7,9-22
 [XI]  - 0, vol. 2007, no. 31, Database accession no. 2007-319858, XP002575155 [X] 1,8 * abstract * * figures 3-5 * * paragraphs [PURPOSE] , [00OF] , [0THE] , [INVENTION] * * paragraphs [STRUCTURE] , [OPERATION] , [00OF] , [0THE] , [INVENTION] * * paragraphs [EFFECTS] , [00OF] , [0THE] , [INVENTION] * [I] 2-7,9-22
 [A]  - DEC_XM, "USSD Menu Browser", (20070801), pages 1 - 3, URL: http://www.rentacoder.com/RentACoder/misc/BidRequests/ShowBidRequest.asp?lngBidRequestId=738186, (20100325), XP002575162 [A] 1-22 * the whole document *
ExaminationKR100628769B
by applicantUS7103018
 WO03030026
 EP1874018