Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2443806 Dossier alert: RSS

Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 439
01.07.2015 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
29.08.2014 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
31.07.2014 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
18.07.2014 English translation of the claims Search / examination 8
18.07.2014 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
18.07.2014 German translation of the claims Search / examination 9
04.06.2014 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 2
25.04.2014 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
25.04.2014 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
25.04.2014 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
25.04.2014 Text intended for grant Search / examination 41
17.04.2014 Annex to a communication Search / examination 27
17.04.2014 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
17.04.2014 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
17.04.2014 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
17.04.2014 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
17.04.2014 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
19.03.2014 Annex Search / examination 10
19.03.2014 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 4
19.03.2014 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
14.03.2014 Claims Search / examination 6
14.03.2014 Claims Search / examination 6
14.03.2014 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
14.03.2014 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
14.03.2014 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 2
14.03.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 6
12.03.2014 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 6
12.03.2014 Claims Search / examination 6
12.03.2014 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
12.03.2014 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 1
12.03.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 7
11.03.2014 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
11.03.2014 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 13
28.02.2014 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
24.02.2014 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
13.02.2014 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
29.01.2014 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
29.01.2014 Annex to the communication Search / examination 6
29.01.2014 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
21.05.2013 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 3
15.05.2013 Claims Search / examination 5
15.05.2013 Claims Search / examination 1
15.05.2013 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 8
16.01.2013 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
16.01.2013 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
19.10.2012 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 18
19.10.2012 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
18.10.2012 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 6
18.10.2012 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 9
18.10.2012 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
03.08.2012 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
28.03.2012 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
06.02.2012 Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
11.01.2012 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 10
11.01.2012 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 8
28.12.2011 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
07.12.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 4
07.12.2011 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 2
07.12.2011 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
07.12.2011 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 8
28.10.2011 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
14.01.2011 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 43
23.12.2010 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
23.12.2010 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
23.12.2010 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 46
11.08.2010 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
11.08.2010 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
11.08.2010 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 4
13.07.2010 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
13.07.2010 Claims International Searching Authority 5
13.07.2010 Description International Searching Authority 29
13.07.2010 Document concerning representation International Searching Authority 2
13.07.2010 Drawings International Searching Authority 4