Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2443806


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
22.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.07.2018 [2018/30]
13.10.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.11.2017  [2017/46]
01.09.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.10.2017  [2017/40]
18.08.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.09.2017  [2017/38]
16.12.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.01.2017  [2017/03]
29.01.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  02.03.2016  [2016/09]
06.11.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  09.12.2015  [2015/50]
03.07.2015 No opposition filed within time limit published on  05.08.2015  [2015/32]
08.05.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.06.2015  [2015/24]
01.05.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  03.06.2015  [2015/23]
24.04.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.05.2015  [2015/22]
13.03.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.04.2015  [2015/16]
13.02.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.03.2015  [2015/12]
06.02.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.03.2015  [2015/11]
30.01.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.03.2015  [2015/10]
23.01.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.02.2015  [2015/09]
16.01.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.02.2015  [2015/08]
25.07.2014 (Expected) grant published on  27.08.2014  [2014/35]
23.07.2014 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
11.06.2014 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
11.06.2014 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
11.06.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
25.04.2014 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
17.04.2014 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
28.01.2014 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
27.05.2013 New entry: Renewal fee paid
17.05.2013 New entry: Reply to examination report
15.01.2013 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
11.01.2013 First examination report published on  13.02.2013  [2013/07]
23.10.2012 Amendment by applicant
27.08.2012 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee
27.08.2012 New entry: Renewal fee paid
24.08.2012 Change - extension states published on  26.09.2012  [2012/39]
30.07.2012 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
30.03.2012 Change - request for examination published on  02.05.2012  [2012/18]
23.03.2012 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  25.04.2012  [2012/17]
23.03.2012 Request for examination filed published on  25.04.2012  [2012/17]
31.01.2012 PCT data prior to European publication
30.12.2011 PCT data prior to European publication
15.12.2011 PCT data prior to European publication
07.01.2011 PCT data prior to European publication
24.12.2010 PCT data prior to European publication
13.08.2010 PCT data prior to European publication
21.07.2010 PCT data prior to European publication