Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2454331

EP2454331 - BINDING AGENT FOR PRODUCING ROAD MARKINGS READY QUICKLY FOR TRAFFIC [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  29.08.2014
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.12.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
02.12.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Röhm GmbH
Dolivostrasse 17
64293 Darmstadt / DE
[2019/42]
Former [2012/21]For all designated states
Evonik Röhm GmbH
Kirschenallee 45
64293 Darmstadt / DE
Inventor(s)01 / NEUGEBAUER, Peter
Kurtrierische Straße 17
65552 Limburg / DE
02 / HEEB, Heike
Waldstraße 15
64404 Bickenbach / DE
03 / KIZEWSKI, Ingrid
Vor der Pulvermühle 4c
63457 Hanau / DE
 [2012/21]
Representative(s)Röhm Patent Association
IP Management
Dolivostraße 17
64293 Darmstadt / DE
[N/P]
Application number, filing date10731499.901.07.2010
WO2010EP59381
Priority number, dateDE2009102776716.07.2009         Original published format: DE102009027767
[2012/21]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2011006767
Date:20.01.2011
Language:DE
[2011/03]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2454331
Date:23.05.2012
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.01.2011
[2012/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2454331
Date:01.10.2014
Language:DE
[2014/40]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP20.01.2011
ClassificationInternational:C08G18/67, C08G18/75, C08F222/10, C09D175/16, C08F220/18
[2014/21]
Former International [2012/21]C09D4/06, C09D133/06, C09D175/16, C08F220/18
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/21]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:BINDEMITTEL ZUR HERSTELLUNG SCHNELL ÜBERROLLBARER FAHRBAHNMARKIERUNGEN[2012/21]
English:BINDING AGENT FOR PRODUCING ROAD MARKINGS READY QUICKLY FOR TRAFFIC[2012/21]
French:LIANT POUR LA CONFECTION DE MARQUAGE ROUTIER POUVANT ÊTRE RENDU RAPIDEMENT À LA CIRCULATION[2012/21]
Entry into regional phase16.12.2011National basic fee paid 
16.12.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
16.12.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.12.2011Examination requested  [2012/21]
11.04.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.06.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.08.2014Fee for grant paid
25.08.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
25.08.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  04.06.2014
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  29.06.2015   
ARKEMA FRANCE
Département Propriété Industrielle
420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves
92700 Colombes / FR
Opponent's representative
Killis, Andréas
ARKEMA France
Département Propriété Industrielle
420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves
92705 Colombes Cedex / FR
 [N/P]
Former [2015/32]
Opponent(s)01  29.06.2015   
ARKEMA FRANCE
Département Propriété Industrielle
420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves
92700 Colombes / FR
Opponent's representative
Killis, Andréas
ARKEMA France
DRD/DPI
420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves
92705 Colombes Cedex / FR
05.08.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
09.02.2016Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
23.05.2017Date of oral proceedings
22.06.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
23.06.2017Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M01)
17.10.2017Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
Appeal following opposition13.12.2017Appeal received No.  T2724/17
16.02.2018Statement of grounds filed
04.09.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
22.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
23.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU01.07.2010
AL01.10.2014
BG01.10.2014
CY01.10.2014
CZ01.10.2014
DK01.10.2014
EE01.10.2014
FI01.10.2014
HR01.10.2014
LT01.10.2014
LV01.10.2014
MC01.10.2014
MK01.10.2014
MT01.10.2014
RO01.10.2014
SE01.10.2014
SK01.10.2014
SM01.10.2014
NO01.01.2015
GR02.01.2015
IS01.02.2015
PT02.02.2015
GB01.07.2015
IE01.07.2015
LU01.07.2015
BE31.07.2015
[2018/46]
Former [2018/30]HU01.07.2010
BG01.10.2014
CY01.10.2014
CZ01.10.2014
DK01.10.2014
EE01.10.2014
FI01.10.2014
HR01.10.2014
LT01.10.2014
LV01.10.2014
MC01.10.2014
MK01.10.2014
MT01.10.2014
RO01.10.2014
SE01.10.2014
SK01.10.2014
SM01.10.2014
NO01.01.2015
GR02.01.2015
IS01.02.2015
PT02.02.2015
GB01.07.2015
IE01.07.2015
LU01.07.2015
BE31.07.2015
Former [2017/38]HU01.07.2010
BG01.10.2014
CY01.10.2014
CZ01.10.2014
DK01.10.2014
EE01.10.2014
FI01.10.2014
HR01.10.2014
LT01.10.2014
LV01.10.2014
MC01.10.2014
MT01.10.2014
RO01.10.2014
SE01.10.2014
SK01.10.2014
SM01.10.2014
NO01.01.2015
GR02.01.2015
IS01.02.2015
PT02.02.2015
GB01.07.2015
IE01.07.2015
LU01.07.2015
BE31.07.2015
Former [2017/21]CY01.10.2014
CZ01.10.2014
DK01.10.2014
EE01.10.2014
FI01.10.2014
HR01.10.2014
LT01.10.2014
LV01.10.2014
MC01.10.2014
MT01.10.2014
RO01.10.2014
SE01.10.2014
SK01.10.2014
NO01.01.2015
GR02.01.2015
IS01.02.2015
PT02.02.2015
GB01.07.2015
IE01.07.2015
LU01.07.2015
Former [2016/33]CY01.10.2014
CZ01.10.2014
DK01.10.2014
EE01.10.2014
FI01.10.2014
HR01.10.2014
LT01.10.2014
LV01.10.2014
MC01.10.2014
RO01.10.2014
SE01.10.2014
SK01.10.2014
NO01.01.2015
GR02.01.2015
IS01.02.2015
PT02.02.2015
GB01.07.2015
IE01.07.2015
LU01.07.2015
Former [2016/23]CY01.10.2014
CZ01.10.2014
DK01.10.2014
EE01.10.2014
FI01.10.2014
HR01.10.2014
LT01.10.2014
LV01.10.2014
MC01.10.2014
RO01.10.2014
SE01.10.2014
SK01.10.2014
NO01.01.2015
GR02.01.2015
IS01.02.2015
PT02.02.2015
GB01.07.2015
LU01.07.2015
Former [2016/15]CY01.10.2014
CZ01.10.2014
DK01.10.2014
EE01.10.2014
FI01.10.2014
HR01.10.2014
LT01.10.2014
LV01.10.2014
MC01.10.2014
RO01.10.2014
SE01.10.2014
SK01.10.2014
NO01.01.2015
GR02.01.2015
IS01.02.2015
PT02.02.2015
LU01.07.2015
Former [2016/13]CY01.10.2014
CZ01.10.2014
DK01.10.2014
EE01.10.2014
FI01.10.2014
HR01.10.2014
LT01.10.2014
LV01.10.2014
MC01.10.2014
RO01.10.2014
SE01.10.2014
SK01.10.2014
NO01.01.2015
GR02.01.2015
IS01.02.2015
PT02.02.2015
Former [2015/37]CY01.10.2014
CZ01.10.2014
DK01.10.2014
EE01.10.2014
FI01.10.2014
HR01.10.2014
LT01.10.2014
LV01.10.2014
RO01.10.2014
SE01.10.2014
SK01.10.2014
NO01.01.2015
GR02.01.2015
IS01.02.2015
PT02.02.2015
Former [2015/36]CY01.10.2014
CZ01.10.2014
DK01.10.2014
EE01.10.2014
FI01.10.2014
HR01.10.2014
LT01.10.2014
LV01.10.2014
RO01.10.2014
SE01.10.2014
NO01.01.2015
GR02.01.2015
IS01.02.2015
PT02.02.2015
Former [2015/35]CY01.10.2014
CZ01.10.2014
DK01.10.2014
EE01.10.2014
FI01.10.2014
HR01.10.2014
LT01.10.2014
LV01.10.2014
SE01.10.2014
NO01.01.2015
GR02.01.2015
IS01.02.2015
PT02.02.2015
Former [2015/26]CY01.10.2014
CZ01.10.2014
FI01.10.2014
HR01.10.2014
LT01.10.2014
LV01.10.2014
SE01.10.2014
NO01.01.2015
GR02.01.2015
IS01.02.2015
PT02.02.2015
Former [2015/24]CZ01.10.2014
FI01.10.2014
HR01.10.2014
LT01.10.2014
LV01.10.2014
SE01.10.2014
NO01.01.2015
GR02.01.2015
IS01.02.2015
PT02.02.2015
Former [2015/23]CZ01.10.2014
FI01.10.2014
LT01.10.2014
NO01.01.2015
IS01.02.2015
PT02.02.2015
Former [2015/22]LT01.10.2014
NO01.01.2015
PT02.02.2015
Former [2015/21]LT01.10.2014
NO01.01.2015
Former [2015/20]LT01.10.2014
Cited inInternational search[AD]WO2008022861  (EVONIK ROEHM GMBH [DE], et al) [AD] 1-11 * pages 2-3; examples 1,2; claim - *;
 [A]WO02085638  (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) [A] 1-11 * Ink 1,;; examples 1-3; tables C, D *;
 [A]US2003099819  (SCHRODER AXEL [DE], et al) [A] 1-11 * paragraphs [0036] , [ 101] - [0144] - [ 221] - [0230]; example 5 *