Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2437691

EP2437691 - SCREW THREAD PLACEMENT IN A POROUS MEDICAL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  16.03.2012
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.03.2012Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 18.04.2012  [2012/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Zimmer, Inc.
P.O. Box 708 345 East Main Street
Warsaw, IN 46580 / US
[2012/15]
Inventor(s)01 / MOHAMMED, Mobarakh
3985 Gouverneur Avenue Apt. 8F
Bronx, NY 10463-2951 / US
 [2012/15]
Representative(s)Mays, Julie
Barker Brettell LLP
First Floor, Atrium Court
15-17 Jockey's Fields
London WC1R 4BW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2012/15]Mays, Julie
Barker Brettell LLP 10-12 Priests Bridge London
SW15 5JE / GB
Application number, filing date10731670.529.06.2010
WO2010US40415
Priority number, dateUS20090221614P30.06.2009         Original published format: US 221614 P
[2012/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2011002781
Date:06.01.2011
Language:EN
[2011/01]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2437691
Date:11.04.2012
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.01.2011
[2012/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP17.03.2011
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/34, A61F2/38, A61F2/44, A61B17/68
[2012/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/15]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:SCHRAUBENGEWINDE-PLATZIERUNG IN EINER PORÖSEN MEDIZINISCHEN VORRICHTUNG[2012/15]
English:SCREW THREAD PLACEMENT IN A POROUS MEDICAL DEVICE[2012/15]
French:MISE EN PLACE D'UN FILETAGE DANS UN DISPOSITIF MÉDICAL POREUX[2012/15]
Entry into regional phase28.10.2011National basic fee paid 
06.01.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
06.01.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.01.2012Examination requested  [2012/15]
13.03.2012Application withdrawn by applicant  [2012/16]
Divisional application(s)EP12152927.5  / EP2457540
Cited inInternational search[X]WO2007016796  (SYNTHES GMBH [CH], et al) [X] 1,2,5-8,10,12-14 * figures 4-6 *;
 [X]US2007173948  (MERIDEW JASON D [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-8,10-13 * paragraph [0057]; figure 4 *;
 [X]WO2009023182  (ANGLEFIX TECH LLC [US], et al) [X] 1,2,7,13 * figure 7 *;
 [X]US2009088807  (CASTANEDA JAVIER E [US], et al) [X] 1,2,7,13 * paragraph [0025]; figures 3,4 *;
 [X]US5769897  (HAERLE ANTON [DE]) [X] 1,2,7,13 * figure 12 *
by applicantUS2008046091
 US5282861
 US2008195222
 US2005184134
 US20140612216