Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2449080

EP2449080 - AMINOSILICONE CONTAINING DETERGENT COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS OF USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  29.03.2013
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2019New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Procter & Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
[2012/19]
Inventor(s)01 / PANANDIKER, Rajan, Keshav
4360 Tylers Estates Drive
West Chester, Ohio 45069 / US
02 / VETTER, Kerry, Andrew
2769 Mahoning Court
Cincinnati, Ohio 45233 / US
03 / JOHNSON, Lenae, Virginia
3309 Harvey Avenue
Cincinnati, Ohio 45229 / US
04 / MENKHAUS, Julie, Ann
3730 Bremen Pass
Cleves, Ohio 45002 / US
05 / BAKER, Keith, Homer
10083 Bennington Drive
Cincinnati, Ohio 45241 / US
06 / PONDER, Jennifer, Beth
11892 Lick Road
Cincinnati, Ohio 45251 / US
07 / DE NIES, Peter
Leuvensebaan 98
B-2580 Putte / BE
 [2012/19]
Representative(s)Mathys & Squire
The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/14]Siddiquee, Sanaul Kabir , et al
N.V. Procter & Gamble
Services Company S.A.
Temselaan 100
1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE
Former [2013/40]Pickford, James Lawrence , et al
Procter & Gamble
Technical Centres Limited
Whitley Road
Longbenton
Newcastle upon Tyne NE12 9TS / GB
Former [2012/19]Mather, Peter Geoffrey
NV Procter & Gamble Services Company SA 100 Temselaan
1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE
Application number, filing date10731679.630.06.2010
WO2010US40567
Priority number, dateUS20090221632P30.06.2009         Original published format: US 221632 P
[2012/19]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2011002864
Date:06.01.2011
Language:EN
[2011/01]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2449080
Date:09.05.2012
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.01.2011
[2012/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2449080
Date:01.05.2013
Language:EN
[2013/18]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP06.01.2011
ClassificationInternational:C11D3/37, C11D1/02, C11D1/37, C11D1/65, A61K8/81, A61K8/895, A61Q5/00, A61Q19/00, C11D1/88, C11D1/94, C11D3/22, C11D11/00, C11D17/00
[2012/50]
Former International [2012/19]C11D3/37, C11D1/02, C11D1/37, C11D1/65, A61K8/81, A61K8/895, A61Q5/00, A61Q19/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/19]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:AMINOSILIKONHALTIGE WASCHMITTELZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER VERWENDUNG[2012/19]
English:AMINOSILICONE CONTAINING DETERGENT COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS OF USING SAME[2012/19]
French:COMPOSITIONS DE DÉTERGENT CONTENANT UN AMINOSILICONE ET LEURS PROCÉDÉS D'UTILISATION[2012/19]
Entry into regional phase30.11.2011National basic fee paid 
30.11.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
30.11.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.11.2011Examination requested  [2012/19]
04.07.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.11.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.03.2013Fee for grant paid
12.03.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  29.11.2012
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  30.01.2014  17.02.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA
Henkelstrasse 67
40589 Düsseldorf / DE
Opponent's representative
LKGLOBAL Lorenz & Kopf PartG mbB Patentanwälte
Brienner Straße 11
80333 München / DE
 02  31.01.2014  03.02.2014  ADMISSIBLE
L'Oréal
14, rue Royale
75008 Paris / FR
Opponent's representative
L'Oreal
Service D.I.P.I.
9, rue Pierre Dreyfus
92110 Clichy / FR
 [2019/50]
Former [2019/45]
Opponent(s)01  30.01.2014  17.02.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA
Henkelstrasse 67
40589 Düsseldorf / DE
Opponent's representative
LKGLOBAL Lorenz & Kopf PartG mbB Patentanwälte
Brienner Straße 11
80333 München / DE
 02  31.01.2014  03.02.2014  ADMISSIBLE
L'Oréal
14, rue Royale
75008 Paris / FR
Opponent's representative
Dodin, Catherine
L'Oréal
Service DIPI
9 Rue Pierre Dreyfus
92110 Clichy / FR
Former [2019/40]
Opponent(s)01  30.01.2014  17.02.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA
Henkelstrasse 67
40589 Düsseldorf / DE
 02  31.01.2014  03.02.2014  ADMISSIBLE
L'Oréal
14, rue Royale
75008 Paris / FR
Opponent's representative
Dodin, Catherine
L'Oréal
Service DIPI
9 Rue Pierre Dreyfus
92110 Clichy / FR
Former [2016/44]
Opponent(s)01  30.01.2014  17.02.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA
Henkelstrasse 67
40589 Düsseldorf / DE
 02  31.01.2014  28.09.2016  WITHDRAWN
L'Oréal
14, rue Royale
75008 Paris / FR
Opponent's representative
Dodin, Catherine
L'Oréal
Service DIPI
9 Rue Pierre Dreyfus
92110 Clichy / FR
Former [2014/11]
Opponent(s)01  30.01.2014   
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA
Henkelstrasse 67
40589 Düsseldorf / DE
 02  31.01.2014  05.02.2014  ADMISSIBLE
L'Oréal
14, rue Royale
75008 Paris / FR
Opponent's representative
Dodin, Catherine
L'Oréal
D.I.P.I.
25-29 Quai Aulagnier
92665 Asnières sur Seine Cedex / FR
12.03.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
16.09.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
24.02.2016Date of oral proceedings
18.05.2016Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
18.05.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition14.07.2016Appeal received No.  T1714/16
27.09.2016Statement of grounds filed
27.11.2019Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
25.07.2016Appeal received No.  T1714/16
27.11.2019Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
27.11.2019Date of oral proceedings
06.12.2019Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU30.06.2010
AL01.05.2013
AT01.05.2013
BE01.05.2013
CY01.05.2013
CZ01.05.2013
DK01.05.2013
EE01.05.2013
FI01.05.2013
HR01.05.2013
IT01.05.2013
LT01.05.2013
LV01.05.2013
MC01.05.2013
MK01.05.2013
MT01.05.2013
NL01.05.2013
PL01.05.2013
RO01.05.2013
SE01.05.2013
SI01.05.2013
SK01.05.2013
SM01.05.2013
TR01.05.2013
IE30.06.2013
LU30.06.2013
FR01.07.2013
BG01.08.2013
NO01.08.2013
GR02.08.2013
ES12.08.2013
IS01.09.2013
PT02.09.2013
CH30.06.2014
LI30.06.2014
[2018/46]
Former [2015/34]HU30.06.2010
AT01.05.2013
BE01.05.2013
CY01.05.2013
CZ01.05.2013
DK01.05.2013
EE01.05.2013
FI01.05.2013
HR01.05.2013
IT01.05.2013
LT01.05.2013
LV01.05.2013
MC01.05.2013
MK01.05.2013
MT01.05.2013
NL01.05.2013
PL01.05.2013
RO01.05.2013
SE01.05.2013
SI01.05.2013
SK01.05.2013
SM01.05.2013
TR01.05.2013
IE30.06.2013
LU30.06.2013
FR01.07.2013
BG01.08.2013
NO01.08.2013
GR02.08.2013
ES12.08.2013
IS01.09.2013
PT02.09.2013
CH30.06.2014
LI30.06.2014
Former [2015/32]AT01.05.2013
BE01.05.2013
CY01.05.2013
CZ01.05.2013
DK01.05.2013
EE01.05.2013
FI01.05.2013
HR01.05.2013
IT01.05.2013
LT01.05.2013
LV01.05.2013
MC01.05.2013
MK01.05.2013
MT01.05.2013
NL01.05.2013
PL01.05.2013
RO01.05.2013
SE01.05.2013
SI01.05.2013
SK01.05.2013
SM01.05.2013
TR01.05.2013
IE30.06.2013
FR01.07.2013
BG01.08.2013
NO01.08.2013
GR02.08.2013
ES12.08.2013
IS01.09.2013
PT02.09.2013
CH30.06.2014
LI30.06.2014
Former [2015/24]AT01.05.2013
BE01.05.2013
CY01.05.2013
CZ01.05.2013
DK01.05.2013
EE01.05.2013
FI01.05.2013
HR01.05.2013
IT01.05.2013
LT01.05.2013
LV01.05.2013
MC01.05.2013
MT01.05.2013
NL01.05.2013
PL01.05.2013
RO01.05.2013
SE01.05.2013
SI01.05.2013
SK01.05.2013
SM01.05.2013
IE30.06.2013
FR01.07.2013
BG01.08.2013
NO01.08.2013
GR02.08.2013
ES12.08.2013
IS01.09.2013
PT02.09.2013
CH30.06.2014
LI30.06.2014
Former [2015/20]AT01.05.2013
BE01.05.2013
CY01.05.2013
CZ01.05.2013
DK01.05.2013
EE01.05.2013
FI01.05.2013
HR01.05.2013
IT01.05.2013
LT01.05.2013
LV01.05.2013
MC01.05.2013
MT01.05.2013
NL01.05.2013
PL01.05.2013
RO01.05.2013
SE01.05.2013
SI01.05.2013
SK01.05.2013
IE30.06.2013
FR01.07.2013
BG01.08.2013
NO01.08.2013
GR02.08.2013
ES12.08.2013
IS01.09.2013
PT02.09.2013
CH30.06.2014
LI30.06.2014
Former [2015/13]AT01.05.2013
BE01.05.2013
CY01.05.2013
CZ01.05.2013
DK01.05.2013
EE01.05.2013
FI01.05.2013
HR01.05.2013
IT01.05.2013
LT01.05.2013
LV01.05.2013
MC01.05.2013
MT01.05.2013
NL01.05.2013
PL01.05.2013
RO01.05.2013
SE01.05.2013
SI01.05.2013
SK01.05.2013
IE30.06.2013
FR01.07.2013
BG01.08.2013
NO01.08.2013
GR02.08.2013
ES12.08.2013
IS01.09.2013
PT02.09.2013
Former [2014/24]AT01.05.2013
BE01.05.2013
CY01.05.2013
CZ01.05.2013
DK01.05.2013
EE01.05.2013
FI01.05.2013
HR01.05.2013
IT01.05.2013
LT01.05.2013
LV01.05.2013
MC01.05.2013
NL01.05.2013
PL01.05.2013
RO01.05.2013
SE01.05.2013
SI01.05.2013
SK01.05.2013
IE30.06.2013
FR01.07.2013
BG01.08.2013
NO01.08.2013
GR02.08.2013
ES12.08.2013
IS01.09.2013
PT02.09.2013
Former [2014/20]AT01.05.2013
BE01.05.2013
CY01.05.2013
CZ01.05.2013
DK01.05.2013
EE01.05.2013
FI01.05.2013
HR01.05.2013
IT01.05.2013
LT01.05.2013
LV01.05.2013
MC01.05.2013
NL01.05.2013
PL01.05.2013
RO01.05.2013
SE01.05.2013
SI01.05.2013
SK01.05.2013
IE30.06.2013
BG01.08.2013
NO01.08.2013
GR02.08.2013
ES12.08.2013
IS01.09.2013
PT02.09.2013
Former [2014/14]AT01.05.2013
BE01.05.2013
CY01.05.2013
CZ01.05.2013
DK01.05.2013
EE01.05.2013
FI01.05.2013
HR01.05.2013
IT01.05.2013
LT01.05.2013
LV01.05.2013
MC01.05.2013
NL01.05.2013
PL01.05.2013
RO01.05.2013
SE01.05.2013
SI01.05.2013
SK01.05.2013
BG01.08.2013
NO01.08.2013
GR02.08.2013
ES12.08.2013
IS01.09.2013
PT02.09.2013
Former [2014/11]AT01.05.2013
BE01.05.2013
CY01.05.2013
CZ01.05.2013
DK01.05.2013
EE01.05.2013
FI01.05.2013
HR01.05.2013
IT01.05.2013
LT01.05.2013
LV01.05.2013
MC01.05.2013
PL01.05.2013
RO01.05.2013
SE01.05.2013
SI01.05.2013
SK01.05.2013
BG01.08.2013
NO01.08.2013
GR02.08.2013
ES12.08.2013
IS01.09.2013
PT02.09.2013
Former [2014/10]AT01.05.2013
BE01.05.2013
CY01.05.2013
CZ01.05.2013
DK01.05.2013
EE01.05.2013
FI01.05.2013
HR01.05.2013
LT01.05.2013
LV01.05.2013
MC01.05.2013
PL01.05.2013
SE01.05.2013
SI01.05.2013
SK01.05.2013
BG01.08.2013
NO01.08.2013
GR02.08.2013
ES12.08.2013
IS01.09.2013
PT02.09.2013
Former [2014/09]AT01.05.2013
BE01.05.2013
CY01.05.2013
DK01.05.2013
EE01.05.2013
FI01.05.2013
HR01.05.2013
LT01.05.2013
LV01.05.2013
MC01.05.2013
PL01.05.2013
SE01.05.2013
SI01.05.2013
BG01.08.2013
NO01.08.2013
GR02.08.2013
ES12.08.2013
IS01.09.2013
PT02.09.2013
Former [2014/08]AT01.05.2013
BE01.05.2013
CY01.05.2013
FI01.05.2013
HR01.05.2013
LT01.05.2013
LV01.05.2013
MC01.05.2013
PL01.05.2013
SE01.05.2013
SI01.05.2013
BG01.08.2013
NO01.08.2013
GR02.08.2013
ES12.08.2013
IS01.09.2013
PT02.09.2013
Former [2014/06]AT01.05.2013
BE01.05.2013
CY01.05.2013
FI01.05.2013
HR01.05.2013
LT01.05.2013
LV01.05.2013
PL01.05.2013
SE01.05.2013
SI01.05.2013
BG01.08.2013
NO01.08.2013
GR02.08.2013
ES12.08.2013
IS01.09.2013
PT02.09.2013
Former [2014/02]AT01.05.2013
CY01.05.2013
FI01.05.2013
HR01.05.2013
LT01.05.2013
LV01.05.2013
PL01.05.2013
SE01.05.2013
SI01.05.2013
BG01.08.2013
NO01.08.2013
GR02.08.2013
ES12.08.2013
IS01.09.2013
PT02.09.2013
Former [2013/52]AT01.05.2013
CY01.05.2013
FI01.05.2013
HR01.05.2013
LT01.05.2013
PL01.05.2013
SE01.05.2013
SI01.05.2013
BG01.08.2013
NO01.08.2013
GR02.08.2013
ES12.08.2013
IS01.09.2013
PT02.09.2013
Former [2013/51]AT01.05.2013
FI01.05.2013
HR01.05.2013
LT01.05.2013
PL01.05.2013
SE01.05.2013
SI01.05.2013
BG01.08.2013
NO01.08.2013
GR02.08.2013
ES12.08.2013
IS01.09.2013
PT02.09.2013
Former [2013/50]AT01.05.2013
FI01.05.2013
LT01.05.2013
PL01.05.2013
SE01.05.2013
SI01.05.2013
BG01.08.2013
NO01.08.2013
GR02.08.2013
ES12.08.2013
IS01.09.2013
PT02.09.2013
Former [2013/49]AT01.05.2013
FI01.05.2013
LT01.05.2013
SE01.05.2013
SI01.05.2013
NO01.08.2013
GR02.08.2013
ES12.08.2013
IS01.09.2013
PT02.09.2013
Former [2013/48]AT01.05.2013
LT01.05.2013
NO01.08.2013
ES12.08.2013
IS01.09.2013
PT02.09.2013
Former [2013/47]LT01.05.2013
NO01.08.2013
PT02.09.2013
Cited inInternational search[A]US2008206176  (PEFFLY MARJORIE MOSSMAN [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0028] , [0038] - [0047]; example -; claim - *;
 [A]US6159914  (DECOSTER SANDRINE [FR], et al) [A] 1-10 * example -; claim - *;
 [A]EP1726293  (OREAL [FR]) [A] 1-10 * example -; claim - *;
 [A]US6221816  (KASUGA KENNICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * column 3, line 38 - line 47; example -; claim - *;
 [A]US2004092425  (BOUTIQUE JEAN-POL [BE], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0008] , [0122] - [0128]; example -; claim - *;
 [A]US2006030513  (BINDER DAVID A [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0068] - [0070]; example -; claim - *
by applicantUS6451749
 US3972131
 US4994593
 US6303565
 EP0288137
 WO0056849
 US6642200
 US2006252668
 US6551986
 US3664961
 US3919678
 US4222905
 US4239659
 US4285841
 US6136769
 US6020303
 US6060443
 WO9905243
 WO9905242
 WO9905082
 WO9905084
 WO9905241
 WO9907656
 WO0023549
 WO0023548
 US2220099
 US2477383
 US2008234165
 US5576282
 US6306812
 US6326348
 US4430243
 US5597936
 US5595967
 WO0032601
 US6225464
 US5879584
 US5691297
 US5574005
 US5569645
 US5565422
 US5516448
 US5489392
 US5486303