Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2571785

EP2571785 - HAND APPLICATOR TO BE FASTENED ONTO THE VALVE CONNECTION OF THE BOTTLE WITH THE ADAPTER OF THE GUN APPLICATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.05.2015
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
As Enko
Tulbiaia tee 3 Viimsi vald Harjumaa
74001 Viimsi alevik / EE
[2013/13]
Inventor(s)01 / ENGEL, Heino
22 Mündi road
Randvere village
Viimsi township 74016, Harju county / EE
02 / FEDEIKO, Nikolai
14 K. Kärberi street, 18 suite
EE13812 Tallinn / EE
03 / KONENKO, Sergei
18 Kotka, 11 suite
EE11312 Tallinn / EE
04 / TIMOFEJEV, Valentin
37 Sõle street, 47 suite
EE10321 Tallinn / EE
 [2013/14]
Former [2013/13]01 / ENGEL, Heino
22 Mündi road
Randvere village
Viimsi township 74016, Harju county / EE
02 / FEDEIKO, Nikolai
14 K. Kärberi street, 18 suite
EE13812 Tallinn / EE
03 / KONENKO, Sergei
19 Kotka, 11 suite
EE11312 Tallinn / EE
04 / TIMOFEJEV, Valentin
37 Sõle street, 47 suite
EE10321 Tallinn / EE
Representative(s)Maasikamäe, Reet
Patent Bureau Kaitsepurus
4 Mulla Street, Suite 3
10611 Tallinn / EE
[2013/13]
Application number, filing date10731710.906.07.2010
WO2010EE00012
Priority number, dateEE20100000062U19.05.2010         Original published format: EE 201000062 U
[2013/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2011144217
Date:24.11.2011
Language:EN
[2011/47]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2571785
Date:27.03.2013
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.11.2011
[2013/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2571785
Date:09.07.2014
Language:EN
[2014/28]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP24.11.2011
ClassificationInternational:B65D83/14, B65D83/16
[2013/13]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/13]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:HANDAPPLIKATOR ZUR BEFESTIGUNG AUF DEM VENTILANSCHLUSS EINER FLASCHE MIT DEM ADAPTER DES PISTOLENAPPLIKATORS[2013/13]
English:HAND APPLICATOR TO BE FASTENED ONTO THE VALVE CONNECTION OF THE BOTTLE WITH THE ADAPTER OF THE GUN APPLICATOR[2013/13]
French:APPLICATEUR À MAIN À FIXER SUR LE RACCORD DE ROBINET DE LA BOUTEILLE À L'AIDE DE L'ADAPTATEUR DU PISTOLET APPLICATEUR[2013/13]
Entry into regional phase13.11.2012National basic fee paid 
13.11.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
13.11.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.11.2012Examination requested  [2013/13]
17.01.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.05.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
26.05.2014Fee for grant paid
26.05.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  17.01.2014
Opposition(s)10.04.2015No opposition filed within time limit [2015/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
10.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
26.05.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
19.12.201203   M06   Fee paid on   25.01.2013
31.07.201304   M06   Fee paid on   10.09.2013
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU06.07.2010
AL09.07.2014
AT09.07.2014
CY09.07.2014
DK09.07.2014
EE09.07.2014
ES09.07.2014
FI09.07.2014
HR09.07.2014
IT09.07.2014
LT09.07.2014
LV09.07.2014
MC09.07.2014
MK09.07.2014
MT09.07.2014
NL09.07.2014
PL09.07.2014
RO09.07.2014
SE09.07.2014
SI09.07.2014
SK09.07.2014
SM09.07.2014
TR09.07.2014
BG09.10.2014
NO09.10.2014
GR10.10.2014
IS09.11.2014
PT10.11.2014
[2018/46]
Former [2018/30]HU06.07.2010
AT09.07.2014
CY09.07.2014
DK09.07.2014
EE09.07.2014
ES09.07.2014
FI09.07.2014
HR09.07.2014
IT09.07.2014
LT09.07.2014
LV09.07.2014
MC09.07.2014
MK09.07.2014
MT09.07.2014
NL09.07.2014
PL09.07.2014
RO09.07.2014
SE09.07.2014
SI09.07.2014
SK09.07.2014
SM09.07.2014
TR09.07.2014
BG09.10.2014
NO09.10.2014
GR10.10.2014
IS09.11.2014
PT10.11.2014
Former [2017/39]HU06.07.2010
AT09.07.2014
CY09.07.2014
DK09.07.2014
EE09.07.2014
ES09.07.2014
FI09.07.2014
HR09.07.2014
IT09.07.2014
LT09.07.2014
LV09.07.2014
MC09.07.2014
MT09.07.2014
NL09.07.2014
PL09.07.2014
RO09.07.2014
SE09.07.2014
SI09.07.2014
SK09.07.2014
SM09.07.2014
TR09.07.2014
BG09.10.2014
NO09.10.2014
GR10.10.2014
IS09.11.2014
PT10.11.2014
Former [2017/22]AT09.07.2014
CY09.07.2014
DK09.07.2014
EE09.07.2014
ES09.07.2014
FI09.07.2014
HR09.07.2014
IT09.07.2014
LT09.07.2014
LV09.07.2014
MC09.07.2014
MT09.07.2014
NL09.07.2014
PL09.07.2014
RO09.07.2014
SE09.07.2014
SI09.07.2014
SK09.07.2014
BG09.10.2014
NO09.10.2014
GR10.10.2014
IS09.11.2014
PT10.11.2014
Former [2016/13]AT09.07.2014
CY09.07.2014
DK09.07.2014
EE09.07.2014
ES09.07.2014
FI09.07.2014
HR09.07.2014
IT09.07.2014
LT09.07.2014
LV09.07.2014
MC09.07.2014
NL09.07.2014
PL09.07.2014
RO09.07.2014
SE09.07.2014
SI09.07.2014
SK09.07.2014
BG09.10.2014
NO09.10.2014
GR10.10.2014
IS09.11.2014
PT10.11.2014
Former [2015/50]AT09.07.2014
CY09.07.2014
DK09.07.2014
EE09.07.2014
ES09.07.2014
FI09.07.2014
HR09.07.2014
IT09.07.2014
LT09.07.2014
LV09.07.2014
NL09.07.2014
PL09.07.2014
RO09.07.2014
SE09.07.2014
SI09.07.2014
SK09.07.2014
BG09.10.2014
NO09.10.2014
GR10.10.2014
IS09.11.2014
PT10.11.2014
Former [2015/23]AT09.07.2014
CY09.07.2014
DK09.07.2014
EE09.07.2014
ES09.07.2014
FI09.07.2014
HR09.07.2014
IT09.07.2014
LT09.07.2014
LV09.07.2014
NL09.07.2014
PL09.07.2014
RO09.07.2014
SE09.07.2014
SK09.07.2014
BG09.10.2014
NO09.10.2014
GR10.10.2014
IS09.11.2014
PT10.11.2014
Former [2015/22]AT09.07.2014
CY09.07.2014
DK09.07.2014
ES09.07.2014
FI09.07.2014
HR09.07.2014
IT09.07.2014
LT09.07.2014
LV09.07.2014
NL09.07.2014
PL09.07.2014
RO09.07.2014
SE09.07.2014
BG09.10.2014
NO09.10.2014
GR10.10.2014
IS09.11.2014
PT10.11.2014
Former [2015/12]AT09.07.2014
CY09.07.2014
ES09.07.2014
FI09.07.2014
HR09.07.2014
LT09.07.2014
LV09.07.2014
NL09.07.2014
PL09.07.2014
SE09.07.2014
BG09.10.2014
NO09.10.2014
GR10.10.2014
IS09.11.2014
PT10.11.2014
Former [2015/11]CY09.07.2014
ES09.07.2014
FI09.07.2014
LT09.07.2014
PL09.07.2014
SE09.07.2014
BG09.10.2014
NO09.10.2014
GR10.10.2014
PT10.11.2014
Former [2015/10]ES09.07.2014
FI09.07.2014
LT09.07.2014
SE09.07.2014
BG09.10.2014
NO09.10.2014
Former [2015/09]FI09.07.2014
LT09.07.2014
SE09.07.2014
Former [2015/08]LT09.07.2014
Cited inInternational search[AP]EE200800059  (ENKO AS [EE]) [AP] 1-7 * abstract *;
 [A]EE200800050  (ENKO AS [EE]) [A] 1-7 * abstract *;
 [E]EE200900027  (ENKO AS [EE]) [E] 1-7 * abstract *;
 [A]WO2007149459  (SUMMIT PACKAGING SYST [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0059]; figures 5,10,12 *;
 [A]WO2005070787  (FAZEKAS GABOR [HU], et al) [A] 1-7 * abstract *;
 [A]WO2009004097  (DE SCHRIJVER ASTER [GB]) [A] 1-7 * page 5, line 1 - page 8, line 28; figure - *
by applicantEE05028
 EE200800050
 EE200800059