blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2571785 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2571785



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 119
13.05.2015 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
09.07.2014 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
13.06.2014 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
02.06.2014 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
16.05.2014 Invitation to pay the shortfall after fee increase Search / examination 1
16.05.2014 Invitation to pay the shortfall after fee increase Search / examination 1
13.05.2014 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
13.05.2014 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
13.05.2014 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
17.01.2014 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
17.01.2014 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
17.01.2014 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
17.01.2014 Text intended for grant Search / examination 9
20.11.2013 Examination started Search / examination 1
04.09.2013 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
01.03.2013 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
27.02.2013 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
20.02.2013 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
07.02.2013 Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
01.02.2013 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
23.01.2013 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
14.01.2013 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
02.01.2013 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
02.01.2013 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
02.01.2013 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
02.01.2013 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
17.12.2012 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
17.12.2012 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
05.12.2012 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 5
29.11.2012 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
27.11.2012 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
27.11.2012 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
19.11.2012 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
19.11.2012 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 2
19.11.2012 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
19.11.2012 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 8
15.11.2012 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
28.09.2012 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
12.12.2011 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 12
24.11.2011 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
24.11.2011 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 11
09.02.2011 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
09.02.2011 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
09.02.2011 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
28.10.2010 Notification of the recording of a change International Searching Authority 1
28.10.2010 Notification of the recording of a change International Searching Authority 1
28.10.2010 Notification of the recording of a change International Searching Authority 1
28.10.2010 Notification of the recording of a change International Searching Authority 1
28.10.2010 Notification relating to declaration under Rule 4.17 PCT (copy for ISA/EP) International Searching Authority 1
14.07.2010 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
14.07.2010 Claims International Searching Authority 2
14.07.2010 Description International Searching Authority 5
14.07.2010 Document concerning representation International Searching Authority 2
14.07.2010 Drawings International Searching Authority 2