blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2571785
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2013062369Global Dossier 14.03.2013A1
Priority number Date
EEU201000062 19.05.2010
WO2010EE00012 06.07.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2571785Global Dossier 09.07.2014B1
EP2571785 27.03.2013A1
Priority number Date
EEU201000062 19.05.2010
WO2010EE00012 06.07.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EA021388 30.06.2015B1
EA201290839 30.08.2013A1
Priority number Date
EEU201000062 19.05.2010
WO2010EE00012 06.07.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
UA103142 10.09.2013C2
Priority number Date
EEU201000062 19.05.2010
WO2010EE00012 06.07.2010
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2011144217Global Dossier 24.11.2011A1
Priority number Date
EEU201000062 19.05.2010
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EE01065U 16.01.2012U1
Priority number Date
EEU201000062 19.05.2010