Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2456685

EP2456685 - CIGARETTE PACK AND METHOD OF PRODUCING CIGARETTE PACKS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  04.12.2015
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.07.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
05.07.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Focke & Co. (GmbH & Co. KG)
Siemensstrasse 10
27283 Verden / DE
[2012/22]
Inventor(s)01 / SCHÖNBERGER, Hans
Kreienkamp 12
27283 Verden / DE
02 / BUSE, Henry
Dreessel Nr. 8
27374 Visselhövede / DE
 [2012/22]
Representative(s)Ellberg, Nils , et al
Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte
Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Hollerallee 73
28209 Bremen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/22]Bolte, Erich
Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Patentanwälte Hollerallee 73
28209 Bremen / DE
Application number, filing date10732286.923.06.2010
WO2010EP03831
Priority number, dateDE2009103470524.07.2009         Original published format: DE102009034705
[2012/22]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2011009520
Date:27.01.2011
Language:DE
[2011/04]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2456685
Date:30.05.2012
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.01.2011
[2012/22]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.01.2011
ClassificationInternational:B65D77/02, B65D77/30, B65D85/10
[2012/22]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/22]
TitleGerman:ZIGARETTENPACKUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN VON ZIGARETTENPACKUNGEN[2012/22]
English:CIGARETTE PACK AND METHOD OF PRODUCING CIGARETTE PACKS[2012/22]
French:PAQUET DE CIGARETTES, ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE PAQUETS DE CIGARETTES[2012/22]
Entry into regional phase07.01.2012National basic fee paid 
07.01.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
07.01.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.01.2012Examination requested  [2012/22]
11.09.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.02.2013Observations by third parties
19.06.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07)
02.01.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.11.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.03.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.04.2015Observations by third parties
02.07.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.12.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.10.2016Date of oral proceedings
02.11.2016Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
02.11.2016Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination04.01.2017Appeal received No.  T0641/17
01.03.2017Statement of grounds filed
06.03.2020Date of oral proceedings
Divisional application(s)EP15003037.7  / EP2993143
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  19.06.2013
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.06.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
25.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
30.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
25.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
22.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
28.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
29.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 09
25.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 10
Cited inInternational search[Y]GB2451180  (GD SPA [IT]) [Y] 1,3,6 * page 9, line 5 - page 10, line 22 * * page 13, line 2 - page 14, line 17; figures 1-26; claims 1,10,23,28, *;
 [Y]GB587956  (ALFRED GERMAN ROSE; ROSE BROTHERS LTD) [Y] 1,6 * page 2, line 64 - line 115; figures 1-4; claim 1 *;
 [Y]DE2420110  (MOLINS LTD) [Y] 1,3,6 * page 3, paragraph l - page 4, paragraph 2 * * page 5, paragraph 1; figures 1-7; claims 1,4 *
otherWO2009003581
 US4300676
 EP0942880
 EP1686060
 GB1471086
 EP1102712
 EP1449789
 WO2005123535
 EP1939107