Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2456685 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2456685



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 613
15.01.2020 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 2
18.12.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
18.12.2019 Claims Appeal 3
18.12.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
18.12.2019 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
20.09.2019 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 1
20.09.2019 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 10
16.07.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
12.07.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
10.07.2019 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
05.07.2019 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
28.06.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
28.06.2019 General enquiry Appeal 1
28.06.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
27.05.2019 F3303.17 Change of the composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member Appeal 1
02.10.2018 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
18.09.2018 Request for change of applicant's representative Appeal 2
05.02.2018 F3303.14 Composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member Appeal 1
21.03.2017 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
10.03.2017 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
01.03.2017 Claims Appeal 3
01.03.2017 Claims Appeal 3
01.03.2017 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 7
12.01.2017 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
09.01.2017 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
09.01.2017 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
04.01.2017 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
04.01.2017 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
04.01.2017 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
08.11.2016 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
02.11.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
02.11.2016 Annex to a communication Search / examination 4
02.11.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
02.11.2016 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
02.11.2016 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 2
02.11.2016 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 6
02.11.2016 Means of redress Search / examination 2
02.11.2016 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
02.11.2016 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
02.11.2016 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
06.10.2016 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 4
05.10.2016 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 4
22.06.2016 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
23.03.2016 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
22.03.2016 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
21.03.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
21.03.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
21.03.2016 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
14.03.2016 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
03.12.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
03.12.2015 Claims Search / examination 4
03.12.2015 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
02.12.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
02.12.2015 Claims Search / examination 4
02.12.2015 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
06.11.2015 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
04.11.2015 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
02.11.2015 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
02.07.2015 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
02.07.2015 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
25.06.2015 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
25.06.2015 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
17.04.2015 Transmittal of third party observations to applicant Search / examination 3
09.04.2015 Reply to communication to third party Search / examination 2
07.03.2015 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
06.03.2015 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
03.11.2014 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
03.11.2014 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
30.06.2014 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
07.01.2014 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
03.01.2014 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
03.01.2014 Claims Search / examination 3
03.01.2014 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
02.01.2014 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
02.01.2014 Claims Search / examination 3
02.01.2014 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
24.12.2013 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
20.12.2013 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
28.10.2013 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
23.10.2013 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
22.10.2013 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
19.06.2013 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
19.06.2013 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
28.02.2013 Acknowledgement of receipt of third party observations Search / examination 1
28.02.2013 Transmittal of third party observations to applicant Search / examination 96
26.02.2013 Observations by third parties Search / examination 3
26.02.2013 Patent document filed by a Third party Search / examination 14
26.02.2013 Patent document filed by a Third party Search / examination 23
26.02.2013 Patent document filed by a Third party Search / examination 4
26.02.2013 Patent document filed by a Third party Search / examination 33
26.02.2013 Patent document filed by a Third party Search / examination 12
26.02.2013 Patent document filed by a Third party Search / examination 6
25.02.2013 Observations by third parties Search / examination 3
25.02.2013 Patent document filed by a Third party Search / examination 23
25.02.2013 Patent document filed by a Third party Search / examination 6
25.02.2013 Patent document filed by a Third party Search / examination 33
25.02.2013 Patent document filed by a Third party Search / examination 12
25.02.2013 Patent document filed by a Third party Search / examination 4
25.02.2013 Patent document filed by a Third party Search / examination 14
12.09.2012 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 1
12.09.2012 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
11.09.2012 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 1
11.09.2012 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
04.05.2012 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
06.03.2012 Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
07.02.2012 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
07.01.2012 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
07.01.2012 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 8
07.01.2012 Priority search results Search / examination 4
07.01.2012 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 8
02.12.2011 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
22.02.2011 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 29
27.01.2011 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
27.01.2011 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
27.01.2011 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 30
20.08.2010 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
20.08.2010 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
20.08.2010 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
23.06.2010 Abstract PCT receiving Office 1
23.06.2010 Claims PCT receiving Office 4
23.06.2010 Description PCT receiving Office 11
23.06.2010 Drawings PCT receiving Office 13