Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2456685


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
05.07.2019 Change: Date of oral proceedings
05.07.2019 Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
28.06.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
28.09.2018 Change - representative
03.07.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
05.07.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
17.03.2017 Change: Appeal number
03.03.2017 New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of appeal
09.01.2017 New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal
09.01.2017 New entry: Appeal number
01.11.2016 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
01.11.2016 New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused
01.07.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
20.03.2016 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
04.12.2015 New entry: Reply to examination report
04.11.2015 Change - divisional application(s) published on  02.12.2015  [2015/49]
04.11.2015 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
13.07.2015 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
03.07.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
15.04.2015 New entry: Observations by third parties
11.03.2015 New entry: Reply to examination report
13.11.2014 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
05.07.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
04.01.2014 New entry: Reply to examination report
21.12.2013 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
23.10.2013 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
04.07.2013 New entry: Renewal fee paid
21.06.2013 First examination report
18.06.2013 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
25.02.2013 New entry: Observations by third parties
28.09.2012 Change - extension states published on  31.10.2012  [2012/44]
11.09.2012 Amendment by applicant
29.06.2012 New entry: Renewal fee paid
27.04.2012 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  30.05.2012  [2012/22]
27.04.2012 Request for examination filed published on  30.05.2012  [2012/22]
01.02.2012 PCT data prior to European publication
01.02.2012 Amendment by applicant
08.02.2011 PCT data prior to European publication
28.01.2011 PCT data prior to European publication
28.07.2010 PCT data prior to European publication