EP2445480 - EXTRACT OF WHOLE SEEDS OF MORINGA SP, AND USE THEREOF IN COSMETIC AND/OR DERMATOLOGICAL COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.05.2018 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.05.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.06.2018 [2018/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pierre Fabre Dermo-Cosmétique 45, place Abel Gance 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/18] | For all designated states Pierre Fabre Dermo-Cosmétique 45, place Abel-Gance 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MANDEAU, Anne 52 rue Chaussas F-31200 Toulouse / FR | 02 /
DUPLAN, Hélène Villa Les Cactées 51 Chemin de Mervilla F-31320 Auzeville Tolosan / FR | [2012/18] | Representative(s) | Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/18] | Rousseau, Pierrick Edouard Pierre Fabre SA Direction Propriété Intellectuelle 17, Avenue Jean Moulin F-81106 Castres Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 10734255.2 | 17.06.2010 | WO2010FR51207 | Priority number, date | FR20090054235 | 22.06.2009 Original published format: FR 0954235 | [2012/18] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010149895 | Date: | 29.12.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/52] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2445480 | Date: | 02.05.2012 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.12.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/97, A61Q19/08, A61K8/92 | [2012/18] | CPC: |
A61Q19/08 (EP,KR,US);
A61K8/9789 (EP,KR,US);
A61K8/922 (EP,KR,US);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61K2800/805 (KR);
A61K2800/92 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/18] | Title | German: | EXTRAKT AUS GANZEN MORINGA SP-SAMEN UND SEINE VERWENDUNG FÜR KOSMETISCHE UND/ODER DERMATOLOGISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [2012/18] | English: | EXTRACT OF WHOLE SEEDS OF MORINGA SP, AND USE THEREOF IN COSMETIC AND/OR DERMATOLOGICAL COMPOSITIONS | [2012/18] | French: | EXTRAIT DE GRAINES ENTIERES DE MORINGA SP ET SON UTILISATION DANS DES COMPOSITIONS COSMETIQUES ET/OU DERMATOLOGIQUES | [2012/18] | Entry into regional phase | 23.01.2012 | National basic fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.06.2012 | Examination requested [2012/31] | 04.01.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.01.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.05.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.09.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/24] | 30.01.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/24] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.01.2014 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 29.09.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 29.09.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 31.10.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2017 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US2004198669 (KHANUJA SUMAN PREET SINGH [IN], et al) [X] 1-5,9,10 * paragraph [0056] * * paragraph [0008] * * claims 16-23 * [Y] 1-13; | [X]KR20090046011 | [XY] - CHUANG ET AL, "Anti-fungal activity of crude extracts and essential oil of Moringa oleifera Lam", BIORESOURCE TECHNOLOGY, ELSEVIER BV, GB, (20070101), vol. 98, no. 1, ISSN 0960-8524, pages 232 - 236, XP005629884 [X] 6,7,11-13 * page 233, paragraph 2.4 * * table 2 * * page 232, column 2, paragraph 1 * [Y] 1-13 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.biortech.2005.11.003 | [XY] - KARTHY, E.S., RANJITHA P., MOHANJUMAR A., "Antimicrobial Potential of Plant Seed Extracts against Multidrug Resistant Methicillin Resistant Staphylococcus aureus (MDR-MRSA)", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF BIOLOGY, (200901), vol. 1, no. 1, pages 34 - 40, XP002568051 [X] 1-3 * page 35, paragraph 2.3 * * page 36, paragraph 3.3 * [Y] 1-13 | [XY] - TSAKNIS J ET AL, "CHARACTERIZATION OF MORINGA OLEIFERA VARIETY MBOLOLO SEED OIL OF KENYA", MEDICINAL & AROMATIC PLANTS ABSTRACTS, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, SCIENTIFIC PUBLISHERS, NEW DELHI - INDIA, (19991101), vol. 47, no. 11, ISSN 0021-8561, pages 4495 - 4499, XP000869027 [X] 1-3 * tables 1-6 * * page 4496, column 1, paragraph 4 - paragraph 5 * [Y] 1-13 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jf9904214 | [X] - Avon Howard, "Anti Aging Property of Moringa Oil", (20081226), URL: http://www.articlesbase.com/supplements-and-vitamins-articles/anti-aging-property-of-moringa-oil-697770.html, (20100210), XP002568052 [X] 7-13 * the whole document * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2009, no. 62, Database accession no. 2009-J77913, XP002568080 & KR20090046011 A 20090511 (THEFACESHOP KOREA CO LTD) [X] 1-13 * the whole document * | by applicant | US6500470 | US2006275247 | EP1064008 | US2006222682 | - THE INDIAN MATERIA MEDICA, pages 811 - 816 | - HUKKERI ET AL., INDIAN J. PHARM. SCI., (2006), vol. 68, pages 124 - 126 | - ELIAS PM, J INVEST DERMATOL, (2005), vol. 125, pages 183 - 200 | - HOUBEN E ET AL., SKIN PHARMACOL PHYSIOL., (2007), vol. 20, no. 3, pages 122 - 32 | - MIZUTANI Y. ET AL., FEBS LETT., (2004), vol. 563, page 93 | - FEINGOLD, K.R., J LIPID RES, (2007), vol. 48, pages 2531 - 2546 |