Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2454476

EP2454476 - BRAKING DEVICE FOR A WIND POWER PLANT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  22.03.2013
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): ES
published on 20.11.2019  [2019/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Pintsch Bubenzer GmbH
Friedrichshüttenstrasse 1
57548 Kirchen-Wehbach / DE
[2012/21]
Inventor(s)01 / SCHNEIDER, Andreas
Zur Bäckerschule 3
57462 Olpe / DE
 [2012/21]
Representative(s)Gerhard, Till
MFG Patentanwälte
Meyer-Wildhagen Meggle-Freund
Gerhard PartG mbB
Amalienstraße 62
80799 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/21]Gerhard, Till
MFG Patentanwälte
Partnerschaft
Amalienstrasse 62
80799 München / DE
Application number, filing date10734687.613.07.2010
WO2010EP04255
Priority number, dateDE2009103287313.07.2009         Original published format: DE102009032873
[2012/21]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2011006636
Date:20.01.2011
Language:DE
[2011/03]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2454476
Date:23.05.2012
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.01.2011
[2012/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2454476
Date:24.04.2013
Language:DE
[2013/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.09.2011
ClassificationInternational:F03D11/00, F03D7/02
[2012/51]
Former International [2012/21]F03D7/02
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/21]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:BREMSEINRICHTUNG FÜR WINDENERGIEANLAGE[2012/21]
English:BRAKING DEVICE FOR A WIND POWER PLANT[2012/21]
French:SYSTÈME DE FREIN POUR ÉOLIENNE[2012/21]
Entry into regional phase06.02.2012National basic fee paid 
06.02.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
06.02.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.02.2012Examination requested  [2012/21]
16.07.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.01.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.03.2013Fee for grant paid
07.03.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.01.2013
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  07.01.2014  11.02.2014  INADMISSIBLE
Staude & Company Unternehmensberatung
Schevenhofer Weg 44i
42111 Wuppertal / DE
 [2017/22]
Former [2014/08]
Opponent(s)01  07.01.2014   
Staude & Company Unternehmensberatung
Schevenhofer Weg 44i
42111 Wuppertal / DE
05.03.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
14.07.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
26.01.2015Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02)
10.02.2015Reply to a communication from the opposition division
15.10.2015Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 04.11.2015
04.11.2015Date of oral proceedings
07.03.2016Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02)
25.04.2016Reply to a communication from the opposition division
14.03.2017Date of oral proceedings
03.05.2017Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: opposition inadmissible 01
03.05.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition14.06.2017Appeal received No.  T1393/17
27.04.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU13.07.2010
AL24.04.2013
CY24.04.2013
CZ24.04.2013
EE24.04.2013
FI24.04.2013
HR24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
LV24.04.2013
MC24.04.2013
MK24.04.2013
MT24.04.2013
NL24.04.2013
PL24.04.2013
RO24.04.2013
SI24.04.2013
SK24.04.2013
SM24.04.2013
TR24.04.2013
IE13.07.2013
LU13.07.2013
BG24.07.2013
NO24.07.2013
GR25.07.2013
BE31.07.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
CH31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
AT13.07.2015
GB13.07.2018
IT13.07.2018
ES14.07.2018
SE14.07.2018
DK31.07.2018
FR31.07.2018
DE01.02.2019
[2019/47]
Former [2019/34]HU13.07.2010
AL24.04.2013
CY24.04.2013
CZ24.04.2013
EE24.04.2013
FI24.04.2013
HR24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
LV24.04.2013
MC24.04.2013
MK24.04.2013
MT24.04.2013
NL24.04.2013
PL24.04.2013
RO24.04.2013
SI24.04.2013
SK24.04.2013
SM24.04.2013
TR24.04.2013
IE13.07.2013
LU13.07.2013
BG24.07.2013
NO24.07.2013
GR25.07.2013
BE31.07.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
CH31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
AT13.07.2015
GB13.07.2018
IT13.07.2018
SE14.07.2018
DK31.07.2018
FR31.07.2018
DE01.02.2019
Former [2019/23]HU13.07.2010
AL24.04.2013
CY24.04.2013
CZ24.04.2013
EE24.04.2013
FI24.04.2013
HR24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
LV24.04.2013
MC24.04.2013
MK24.04.2013
MT24.04.2013
NL24.04.2013
PL24.04.2013
RO24.04.2013
SI24.04.2013
SK24.04.2013
SM24.04.2013
TR24.04.2013
IE13.07.2013
LU13.07.2013
BG24.07.2013
NO24.07.2013
GR25.07.2013
BE31.07.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
CH31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
AT13.07.2015
GB13.07.2018
SE14.07.2018
FR31.07.2018
DE01.02.2019
Former [2019/21]HU13.07.2010
AL24.04.2013
CY24.04.2013
CZ24.04.2013
EE24.04.2013
FI24.04.2013
HR24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
LV24.04.2013
MC24.04.2013
MK24.04.2013
MT24.04.2013
NL24.04.2013
PL24.04.2013
RO24.04.2013
SI24.04.2013
SK24.04.2013
SM24.04.2013
TR24.04.2013
IE13.07.2013
LU13.07.2013
BG24.07.2013
NO24.07.2013
GR25.07.2013
BE31.07.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
CH31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
AT13.07.2015
GB13.07.2018
DE01.02.2019
Former [2018/46]HU13.07.2010
AL24.04.2013
CY24.04.2013
CZ24.04.2013
EE24.04.2013
FI24.04.2013
HR24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
LV24.04.2013
MC24.04.2013
MK24.04.2013
MT24.04.2013
NL24.04.2013
PL24.04.2013
RO24.04.2013
SI24.04.2013
SK24.04.2013
SM24.04.2013
TR24.04.2013
IE13.07.2013
LU13.07.2013
BG24.07.2013
NO24.07.2013
GR25.07.2013
BE31.07.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
CH31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
AT13.07.2015
Former [2016/50]HU13.07.2010
CY24.04.2013
CZ24.04.2013
EE24.04.2013
FI24.04.2013
HR24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
LV24.04.2013
MC24.04.2013
MK24.04.2013
MT24.04.2013
NL24.04.2013
PL24.04.2013
RO24.04.2013
SI24.04.2013
SK24.04.2013
SM24.04.2013
TR24.04.2013
IE13.07.2013
LU13.07.2013
BG24.07.2013
NO24.07.2013
GR25.07.2013
BE31.07.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
CH31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
AT13.07.2015
Former [2015/34]HU13.07.2010
CY24.04.2013
CZ24.04.2013
EE24.04.2013
FI24.04.2013
HR24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
LV24.04.2013
MC24.04.2013
MK24.04.2013
MT24.04.2013
NL24.04.2013
PL24.04.2013
RO24.04.2013
SI24.04.2013
SK24.04.2013
SM24.04.2013
TR24.04.2013
IE13.07.2013
LU13.07.2013
BG24.07.2013
NO24.07.2013
GR25.07.2013
BE31.07.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
CH31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
Former [2015/32]CY24.04.2013
CZ24.04.2013
EE24.04.2013
FI24.04.2013
HR24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
LV24.04.2013
MC24.04.2013
MK24.04.2013
MT24.04.2013
NL24.04.2013
PL24.04.2013
RO24.04.2013
SI24.04.2013
SK24.04.2013
SM24.04.2013
TR24.04.2013
IE13.07.2013
BG24.07.2013
NO24.07.2013
GR25.07.2013
BE31.07.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
CH31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
Former [2015/24]CY24.04.2013
CZ24.04.2013
EE24.04.2013
FI24.04.2013
HR24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
LV24.04.2013
MC24.04.2013
NL24.04.2013
PL24.04.2013
RO24.04.2013
SI24.04.2013
SK24.04.2013
SM24.04.2013
IE13.07.2013
BG24.07.2013
NO24.07.2013
GR25.07.2013
BE31.07.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
CH31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
Former [2015/20]CY24.04.2013
CZ24.04.2013
EE24.04.2013
FI24.04.2013
HR24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
LV24.04.2013
MC24.04.2013
NL24.04.2013
PL24.04.2013
RO24.04.2013
SI24.04.2013
SK24.04.2013
IE13.07.2013
BG24.07.2013
NO24.07.2013
GR25.07.2013
BE31.07.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
CH31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
Former [2014/33]CY24.04.2013
CZ24.04.2013
EE24.04.2013
FI24.04.2013
HR24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
LV24.04.2013
MC24.04.2013
NL24.04.2013
PL24.04.2013
RO24.04.2013
SI24.04.2013
SK24.04.2013
IE13.07.2013
BG24.07.2013
NO24.07.2013
GR25.07.2013
BE31.07.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
Former [2014/23]CY24.04.2013
CZ24.04.2013
EE24.04.2013
FI24.04.2013
HR24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
LV24.04.2013
MC24.04.2013
NL24.04.2013
PL24.04.2013
RO24.04.2013
SI24.04.2013
SK24.04.2013
BG24.07.2013
NO24.07.2013
GR25.07.2013
BE31.07.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
Former [2014/14]CY24.04.2013
CZ24.04.2013
EE24.04.2013
FI24.04.2013
HR24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
LV24.04.2013
MC24.04.2013
NL24.04.2013
PL24.04.2013
RO24.04.2013
SI24.04.2013
SK24.04.2013
BG24.07.2013
NO24.07.2013
GR25.07.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
Former [2014/11]CY24.04.2013
CZ24.04.2013
EE24.04.2013
FI24.04.2013
HR24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
LV24.04.2013
PL24.04.2013
RO24.04.2013
SI24.04.2013
SK24.04.2013
BG24.07.2013
NO24.07.2013
GR25.07.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
Former [2014/10]CY24.04.2013
CZ24.04.2013
EE24.04.2013
FI24.04.2013
HR24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
LV24.04.2013
PL24.04.2013
SI24.04.2013
SK24.04.2013
BG24.07.2013
NO24.07.2013
GR25.07.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
Former [2013/52]CY24.04.2013
FI24.04.2013
HR24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
LV24.04.2013
PL24.04.2013
SI24.04.2013
BG24.07.2013
NO24.07.2013
GR25.07.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
Former [2013/51]FI24.04.2013
HR24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
LV24.04.2013
PL24.04.2013
SI24.04.2013
BG24.07.2013
NO24.07.2013
GR25.07.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
Former [2013/50]FI24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
LV24.04.2013
PL24.04.2013
SI24.04.2013
BG24.07.2013
NO24.07.2013
GR25.07.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
Former [2013/49]FI24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
SI24.04.2013
NO24.07.2013
GR25.07.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
Former [2013/48]LT24.04.2013
NO24.07.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
Former [2013/47]LT24.04.2013
NO24.07.2013
PT26.08.2013
Cited inInternational search[A]US3835964  (MARGETTS H) [A] 1-13 * column 1, lines 57-63; figure 1 *;
 [A]DE19906798  (CONTINENTAL TEVES AG & CO OHG [DE]) [A] 1-13 * abstract *;
 [A]DE1206223  (ROY S SANFORD, et al) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *;
 [A]FR1001749  (FOUETILLOU, M. JEAN) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *
by applicantDE3714859
 DE19906798