blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2443126 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2443126



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 2263
16.04.2019 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
10.04.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
10.04.2019 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
10.04.2019 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
10.04.2019 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
10.04.2019 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
10.04.2019 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
10.04.2019 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
10.04.2019 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
10.04.2019 Citation for the examination procedure Appeal 2
10.04.2019 Citation for the examination procedure Appeal 3
10.04.2019 Citation for the examination procedure Appeal 2
10.04.2019 Claims Appeal 2
10.04.2019 Claims Appeal 2
10.04.2019 Claims Appeal 2
10.04.2019 Claims Appeal 2
10.04.2019 Claims Appeal 2
10.04.2019 Claims Appeal 2
10.04.2019 Claims Appeal 2
10.04.2019 Claims Appeal 1
10.04.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
10.04.2019 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 29
11.02.2019 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
13.12.2018 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
11.12.2018 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 31
11.12.2018 Non-scannable object Appeal 1
11.12.2018 Non-scannable object Appeal 6
07.12.2018 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 37
18.10.2018 Refund of fees Appeal 1
16.10.2018 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
16.10.2018 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
08.10.2018 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
05.10.2018 Declaration for SMEs Appeal 2
05.10.2018 Letter concerning fees and payments Appeal 2
05.10.2018 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
20.08.2018 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
13.08.2018 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
07.08.2018 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
06.08.2018 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
30.07.2018 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
30.07.2018 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
30.07.2018 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 7
30.07.2018 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
30.07.2018 Decision rejecting the opposition Opposition 2
30.07.2018 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 24
30.07.2018 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
30.07.2018 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
30.07.2018 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
30.07.2018 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
30.07.2018 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
30.07.2018 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
30.07.2018 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 6
21.02.2018 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
09.02.2018 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 1
09.02.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.02.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.01.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.01.2018 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
12.01.2018 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 4
12.01.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
12.01.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
12.01.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
12.01.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
12.01.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
12.01.2018 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 4
04.01.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.01.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.01.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.12.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
20.12.2017 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
20.12.2017 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
20.12.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
20.12.2017 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 10
19.12.2017 Document concerning representation Opposition 1
19.12.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 18
19.12.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
19.12.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
19.12.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
19.12.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
19.12.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
19.12.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
19.12.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
19.12.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
19.12.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 26
19.12.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 26
19.12.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 20
19.12.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 18
19.12.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
19.12.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 26
19.12.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
19.12.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 24
19.12.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
19.12.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 129
19.12.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 32
19.12.2017 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 55
08.08.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
03.08.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
01.08.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
01.08.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
24.07.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
24.07.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
24.07.2017 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 11
24.07.2017 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
24.07.2017 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
24.07.2017 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 5
24.07.2017 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
24.07.2017 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
06.12.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.11.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
30.11.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
30.11.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
30.11.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
30.11.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
30.11.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
30.11.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 39
30.11.2016 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 14
12.09.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.09.2016 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
07.09.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
07.09.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
07.09.2016 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
12.07.2016 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
09.07.2016 Request for change of applicant's representative Opposition 1
07.07.2016 Request for change of applicant's representative Opposition 2
30.05.2016 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
30.05.2016 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
17.05.2016 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
17.05.2016 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 3
17.05.2016 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
17.05.2016 Notice of opposition Opposition 10
04.05.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.05.2016 Communication concerning signing of documents Opposition 1
22.04.2016 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Opposition 1
14.01.2016 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
11.01.2016 Request for change of applicant's representative Opposition 1
08.01.2016 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 14
07.01.2016 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 17
19.11.2015 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 3
19.11.2015 Reply to the communication concerning admissibility of an opposition Opposition 1
17.11.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
17.11.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
17.11.2015 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
11.11.2015 Communication indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition which may be remedied Opposition 2
11.11.2015 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
10.11.2015 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
06.11.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Opposition 2
05.11.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Opposition 2
23.10.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 3
23.10.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
23.10.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 23
23.10.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
23.10.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
23.10.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
23.10.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
23.10.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
23.10.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 17
23.10.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
23.10.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
23.10.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
23.10.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 20
23.10.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
23.10.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 25
23.10.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 32
23.10.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
23.10.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
23.10.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
23.10.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 30
23.10.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
23.10.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 60
23.10.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
23.10.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
23.10.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
23.10.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 18
23.10.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 26
23.10.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 37
23.10.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
23.10.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 212
23.10.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 240
23.10.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
23.10.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
23.10.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
23.10.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 43
23.10.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 22
23.10.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
23.10.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
23.10.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 24
23.10.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
23.10.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
23.10.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
23.10.2015 Notice of opposition Opposition 10
23.10.2015 Notice of opposition Opposition 76
04.03.2015 Transmission of the certificate Opposition 1
05.02.2015 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
22.01.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
22.01.2015 English translation of the claims Search / examination 2
22.01.2015 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 2
22.01.2015 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
22.01.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
22.01.2015 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
01.10.2014 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
01.10.2014 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
01.10.2014 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
01.10.2014 Text intended for grant Search / examination 27
22.09.2014 Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) Search / examination 2
08.09.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
08.09.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
08.09.2014 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 Search / examination 1
10.07.2014 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
10.07.2014 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
10.07.2014 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
10.07.2014 Text intended for grant Search / examination 27
30.04.2014 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
25.04.2014 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
25.04.2014 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
02.05.2013 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 2
24.04.2013 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
24.04.2013 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
26.06.2012 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
24.05.2012 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
23.05.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
23.05.2012 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
28.03.2012 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
27.03.2012 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
20.03.2012 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
20.02.2012 Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
02.02.2012 Republication of front page of international application with corrected bibliographic data Search / examination 1
11.01.2012 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
09.01.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
09.01.2012 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
09.01.2012 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
29.12.2011 Communication in cases for which no other form is applicable International Searching Authority 1
28.10.2011 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
14.01.2011 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 31
23.12.2010 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 1
23.12.2010 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 1
23.12.2010 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 28
18.11.2010 Document concerning representation International Searching Authority 7
12.10.2010 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
12.10.2010 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
12.10.2010 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
22.07.2010 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
22.07.2010 Claims International Searching Authority 2
22.07.2010 Description International Searching Authority 19
22.07.2010 Drawings International Searching Authority 6