Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2454710

EP2454710 - AUTOMATIC INFORMATION SELECTION BASED ON INVOLVEMENT CLASSIFICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  07.06.2013
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.08.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FUNKE Digital TV Guide GmbH
Schiffbauerdamm 22
10117 Berlin / DE
[2014/32]
Former [2012/21]For all designated states
Axel Springer Digital TV Guide GmbH
Schiffbauerdamm 22
10117 Berlin / DE
Inventor(s)01 / PRONK, Serverius, Petrus, Paulus
Jan van Speykstraat 2
NL-5262 CN Vught / NL
02 / BARBIERI, Mauro
Gabriel Metsulaan 5
NL-5613 LC Eindhoven / NL
 [2012/21]
Representative(s)Eisenführ Speiser
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Anna-Louisa-Karsch-Strasse 2
10178 Berlin / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/21]Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner
Anna-Louisa-Karsch-Strasse 2
10178 Berlin / DE
Application number, filing date10735244.515.07.2010
WO2010EP60239
Priority number, dateEP2009016579017.07.2009         Original published format: EP 09165790
[2012/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2011006971
Date:20.01.2011
Language:EN
[2011/03]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2454710
Date:23.05.2012
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.01.2011
[2012/21]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP20.01.2011
ClassificationInternational:G06Q30/00
[2012/21]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/21]
TitleGerman:AUTOMATISCHE INFORMATIONSAUSWAHL JE NACH BETEILIGUNGSEINSTUFUNG[2012/21]
English:AUTOMATIC INFORMATION SELECTION BASED ON INVOLVEMENT CLASSIFICATION[2012/21]
French:SÉLECTION AUTOMATIQUE D INFORMATIONS EN FONCTION D UN CLASSEMENT DE NIVEAU DE PARTICIPATION[2012/21]
Entry into regional phase17.02.2012National basic fee paid 
17.02.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
17.02.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.02.2012Examination requested  [2012/21]
14.09.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.11.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.06.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.04.2014Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 29.04.2014
29.04.2014Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
15.05.2014Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination27.06.2014Appeal received No.  T2069/14
25.09.2014Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  26.11.2012
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
31.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
31.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
31.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
01.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
31.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
31.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 09
31.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 10
Cited inInternational search[IL]  - The only identifiable technical aspects of the claimed invention relate to the use of conventional, general-purpose data processing technology for processing data of an inherently non-technical nature. The notoriety of such prior art cannot reasonably be contested. cf. Official Journal 11/2007, 592., XP002456414 [I] 1-12 * the whole document * [L] 1-12