Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2582575

EP2582575 - APPARATUS FOR MOVING AN OUTBOARD MOTOR INSTALLED ON A BOAT AND BOAT WITH FOLDAWAY OUTBOARD MOTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  25.03.2016
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.10.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
16.10.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Siner "G" S.r.l.
Via dei Fabbri 6
48011 Alfonsine / IT
[2013/17]
Inventor(s)01 / ORSELLI, Andrea
Via A. Samaritani 27
I-48121 Ravenna / IT
 [2013/17]
Representative(s)Modiano, Micaela Nadia
Modiano & Partners
Via Meravigli, 16
20123 Milano / IT
[2016/17]
Former [2013/17]Modiano, Micaela Nadia
Modiano & Partners (IT)
Via Meravigli, 16
20123 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date10737118.917.06.2010
[2016/17]
WO2010IT00271
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2011158263
Date:22.12.2011
Language:EN
[2011/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2582575
Date:24.04.2013
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.12.2011
[2013/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2582575
Date:27.04.2016
Language:EN
[2016/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.12.2011
ClassificationInternational:B63H20/02, B63H20/06, B63H20/08, B63H20/36, B63B7/08
[2015/35]
Former International [2013/17]B63H20/08
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/17]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUR BEWEGUNG EINES AUF EINEM BOOT INSTALLIERTEN AUSSENBORDMOTORS UND BOOT MIT EINEM VERSENKBAREN AUSSENBORDMOTOR[2013/17]
English:APPARATUS FOR MOVING AN OUTBOARD MOTOR INSTALLED ON A BOAT AND BOAT WITH FOLDAWAY OUTBOARD MOTOR[2013/17]
French:DISPOSITIF POUR DÉPLACER UN MOTEUR HORS-BORD MONTÉ SUR UN BATEAU ET BATEAU ÉQUIPÉ D'UN MOTEUR HORS-BORD ESCAMOTABLE[2013/17]
Entry into regional phase17.12.2012National basic fee paid 
17.12.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
17.12.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.12.2012Examination requested  [2013/17]
24.07.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.02.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.06.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.08.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.12.2015Fee for grant paid
02.12.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
02.12.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
11.12.2015Observations by third parties
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  26.02.2015
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  24.01.2017  02.02.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Atmosphère S.r.l.
Via Silicella 51
00169 Roma / IT
Opponent's representative
Leone, Mario
Cantaluppi & Partners S.r.l.
Via XX Settembre, 98g
00187 Roma / IT
 [N/P]
Former [2018/25]
Opponent(s)01  24.01.2017  02.02.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Atmosphère S.r.l.
Via Silicella 51
00169 Roma / IT
Opponent's representative
Leone, Mario
Cantaluppi & Partners S.r.l.
Viale della Tecnica, 205
00144 Roma / IT
Former [2018/16]
Opponent(s)01  24.01.2017  02.02.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Atmosphère S.r.l.
Via Silicella 51
00169 Roma / IT
Former [2017/10]
Opponent(s)01  24.01.2017  02.02.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Atmosphère S.r.l.
Via Silicella 51
00169 Roma / IT
Opponent's representative
Galluppi, Massimo
Kirchenstraße 91
81675 München / DE
06.03.2017Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
13.07.2017Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
16.05.2018Date of oral proceedings
06.06.2018Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
06.06.2018Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition09.08.2018Appeal received No.  T2067/18
16.10.2018Statement of grounds filed
24.03.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
29.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
22.05.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
18.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU17.06.2010
AL27.04.2016
AT27.04.2016
BE27.04.2016
BG27.04.2016
CY27.04.2016
CZ27.04.2016
DK27.04.2016
EE27.04.2016
FI27.04.2016
HR27.04.2016
IS27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
LV27.04.2016
MC27.04.2016
MK27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
RO27.04.2016
SE27.04.2016
SI27.04.2016
SK27.04.2016
SM27.04.2016
TR27.04.2016
IE17.06.2016
LU17.06.2016
CH30.06.2016
LI30.06.2016
MT30.06.2016
NO27.07.2016
GR28.07.2016
PT29.08.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/38]HU17.06.2010
AT27.04.2016
BE27.04.2016
BG27.04.2016
CY27.04.2016
CZ27.04.2016
DK27.04.2016
EE27.04.2016
FI27.04.2016
HR27.04.2016
IS27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
LV27.04.2016
MC27.04.2016
MK27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
RO27.04.2016
SE27.04.2016
SI27.04.2016
SK27.04.2016
SM27.04.2016
TR27.04.2016
IE17.06.2016
LU17.06.2016
CH30.06.2016
LI30.06.2016
MT30.06.2016
NO27.07.2016
GR28.07.2016
PT29.08.2016
Former [2018/32]HU17.06.2010
AT27.04.2016
BE27.04.2016
CY27.04.2016
CZ27.04.2016
DK27.04.2016
EE27.04.2016
FI27.04.2016
HR27.04.2016
IS27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
LV27.04.2016
MC27.04.2016
MK27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
RO27.04.2016
SE27.04.2016
SI27.04.2016
SK27.04.2016
SM27.04.2016
TR27.04.2016
IE17.06.2016
LU17.06.2016
CH30.06.2016
LI30.06.2016
MT30.06.2016
NO27.07.2016
GR28.07.2016
PT29.08.2016
Former [2018/30]HU17.06.2010
AT27.04.2016
BE27.04.2016
CY27.04.2016
CZ27.04.2016
DK27.04.2016
EE27.04.2016
FI27.04.2016
HR27.04.2016
IS27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
LV27.04.2016
MC27.04.2016
MK27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
RO27.04.2016
SE27.04.2016
SI27.04.2016
SK27.04.2016
SM27.04.2016
TR27.04.2016
IE17.06.2016
LU17.06.2016
CH30.06.2016
LI30.06.2016
NO27.07.2016
GR28.07.2016
PT29.08.2016
Former [2018/29]HU17.06.2010
AT27.04.2016
BE27.04.2016
CY27.04.2016
CZ27.04.2016
DK27.04.2016
EE27.04.2016
FI27.04.2016
HR27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
LV27.04.2016
MC27.04.2016
MK27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
RO27.04.2016
SE27.04.2016
SI27.04.2016
SK27.04.2016
SM27.04.2016
TR27.04.2016
IE17.06.2016
LU17.06.2016
CH30.06.2016
LI30.06.2016
NO27.07.2016
GR28.07.2016
PT29.08.2016
Former [2018/28]HU17.06.2010
AT27.04.2016
BE27.04.2016
CY27.04.2016
CZ27.04.2016
DK27.04.2016
EE27.04.2016
FI27.04.2016
HR27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
LV27.04.2016
MC27.04.2016
MK27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
RO27.04.2016
SE27.04.2016
SI27.04.2016
SK27.04.2016
SM27.04.2016
IE17.06.2016
CH30.06.2016
LI30.06.2016
NO27.07.2016
GR28.07.2016
PT29.08.2016
Former [2017/25]AT27.04.2016
BE27.04.2016
CZ27.04.2016
DK27.04.2016
EE27.04.2016
FI27.04.2016
HR27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
LV27.04.2016
MC27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
RO27.04.2016
SE27.04.2016
SI27.04.2016
SK27.04.2016
SM27.04.2016
IE17.06.2016
CH30.06.2016
LI30.06.2016
NO27.07.2016
GR28.07.2016
PT29.08.2016
Former [2017/11]AT27.04.2016
BE27.04.2016
CZ27.04.2016
DK27.04.2016
EE27.04.2016
FI27.04.2016
HR27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
LV27.04.2016
MC27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
RO27.04.2016
SE27.04.2016
SK27.04.2016
SM27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
GR28.07.2016
PT29.08.2016
Former [2017/10]AT27.04.2016
BE27.04.2016
CZ27.04.2016
DK27.04.2016
EE27.04.2016
FI27.04.2016
HR27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
LV27.04.2016
MC27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
RO27.04.2016
SE27.04.2016
SK27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
GR28.07.2016
PT29.08.2016
Former [2017/09]AT27.04.2016
BE27.04.2016
CZ27.04.2016
DK27.04.2016
EE27.04.2016
FI27.04.2016
HR27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
LV27.04.2016
MC27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
RO27.04.2016
SE27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
GR28.07.2016
PT29.08.2016
Former [2017/07]AT27.04.2016
BE27.04.2016
DK27.04.2016
FI27.04.2016
HR27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
LV27.04.2016
MC27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
SE27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
GR28.07.2016
PT29.08.2016
Former [2017/03]AT27.04.2016
BE27.04.2016
FI27.04.2016
HR27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
LV27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
SE27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
GR28.07.2016
PT29.08.2016
Former [2016/52]AT27.04.2016
FI27.04.2016
HR27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
LV27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
SE27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
GR28.07.2016
PT29.08.2016
Former [2016/51]AT27.04.2016
FI27.04.2016
HR27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
LV27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
GR28.07.2016
PT29.08.2016
Former [2016/50]AT27.04.2016
FI27.04.2016
HR27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
LV27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
Former [2016/49]FI27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
Former [2016/46]LT27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
Former [2016/44]NL27.04.2016
Cited inInternational search[X]AU2009225271  (BERG JOHN) [X] 1,9 * abstract * * page 1, line 1 - page 3, line 10 * * figures 1.1, 1.2, 1.3 *;
 [X]US7244152  (UPPGARD DARIN C [US]) [X] 1,6-9 * abstract * * figures 1, 2 *;
 [A]US6254441  (KNIGHT STEVEN J [US] ET AL) [A] 1,2,9,10 * figures 1, 2 *;
 [A]US6007391  (EILERT JOHN R [US]) [A] 1,9 * figures 1, 9 *
ExaminationUS3342156
OppositionGB1129478
 US4279602
 GB919895
 US2905132
 AU2009225271
 US6007391
 US6273771
 US5329871
 US6513876