Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2435059

EP2435059 - NOVEL PEPTIDES, PROCESS FOR PREPARATION THEREOF, AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  25.04.2014
Database last updated on 20.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip25.04.2014Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 28.05.2014  [2014/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Eötvös Loránd Tudományegyetem
Egyetem tér 1-3
1053 Budapest / HU
For all designated states
Magyar Tudományos Akadémia Szegedi Biológiai Központ Enzimológiai Intézete
Karolina út 29.
1113 Budapest / HU
[2012/14]
Inventor(s)01 / GÁL, Péter
Telepes u. 77 fsz.2.
H-1147 Budapest / HU
02 / PÁL, Gábor
Jávor utca 3.1. em. 15
H-1145 Budapest / HU
03 / PÁRISNÉ, Kocsis, Andrea
Somogyi Béla Utca 17
H-6600 Szentes / HU
04 / ZÁVODSKY, Péter
Csaba u. 36/b 1.em.2
H-1122 Budapest / HU
 [2012/14]
Representative(s)Kovári, Zoltan
Kovári & Partners
Patent and Trademark Attorneys LLC
Attila ut. 125.
H-10162 Budapest / HU
[N/P]
Former [2013/14]Kovari, Zoltan
Kovári & Partners
Patent and Trademark Attorneys LLC
Attila ut. 125.
H-10162 Budapest / HU
Former [2012/14]Kovari, Zoltan
Kovári & Partners
Patent and Trademark Attorneys LLC
Naphegy u. 32
H-1016 Budapest / HU
Application number, filing date10737624.625.05.2010
WO2010HU00061
Priority number, dateHU2009000031925.05.2009         Original published format: HU 0900319
[2012/14]
Filing languageHU
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2010136831
Date:02.12.2010
Language:EN
[2010/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2435059
Date:04.04.2012
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.12.2010
[2012/14]
Search report(s)International search reportEP02.12.2010
ClassificationInternational:A61K38/00, C07K7/08, C07K7/64
[2012/14]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/14]
TitleGerman:NEUARTIGE PEPTIDE, HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR UND IHRE VERWENDUNG[2012/14]
English:NOVEL PEPTIDES, PROCESS FOR PREPARATION THEREOF, AND USE THEREOF[2012/14]
French:NOUVEAUX PEPTIDES, PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION DE CEUX-CI, ET UTILISATION CORRESPONDANTE[2012/14]
Entry into regional phase21.12.2011National basic fee paid 
21.12.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
21.12.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.12.2011Examination requested  [2012/14]
23.07.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.03.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
29.05.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.07.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.12.2013Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2014/22]
13.01.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2014/22]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  20.03.2013
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
29.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.201203   M06   Fee paid on   28.11.2012
Cited inInternational search[A]US2006140939  (FUNG SEK C M [US]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document * * in particular [0037] and claim 35 *;
 [AP]US2009202437  (VAN WAMEL WILLEM JAN BASTIAAN [NL], et al) [AP] 1-16 * the whole document *
 [A]  LUCKETT S ET AL, "High-resolution structure of a potent, cyclic proteinase inhibitor from sunflower seeds", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, LONDON, GB LNKD- DOI:10.1006/JMBI.1999.2891, (19990709), vol. 290, no. 2, ISSN 0022-2836, pages 525 - 533, XP004462013 [A] 1-16 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/jmbi.1999.2891
 [A]  SCHNEIDER T D ET AL, "SEQUENCE LOGOS: A NEW WAY TO DISPLAY CONSENSUS SEQUENCES", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, SURREY, GB, (19901025), vol. 18, no. 20, ISSN 0305-1048, pages 6097 - 6100, XP000608250 [A] 1-16 * the whole document *
 [A]  CROOKS G E ET AL, "WebLogo: A sequence logo generator", GENOME RESEARCH, COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORY PRESS, WOODBURY, NY, US LNKD- DOI:10.1101/GR.849004, (20040601), vol. 14, no. 6, ISSN 1088-9051, pages 1188 - 1190, XP002408756 [A] 1-16 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1101/gr.849004
 [A]  WILLIAMS ANTHONY ET AL, "DX-88 and HAE: a developmental perspective.", TRANSFUSION AND APHERESIS SCIENCE : OFFICIAL JOURNAL OF THE WORLD APHERESIS ASSOCIATION : OFFICIAL JOURNAL OF THE EUROPEAN SOCIETY FOR HAEMAPHERESIS DEC 2003 LNKD- PUBMED:14572818, (200312), vol. 29, no. 3, ISSN 1473-0502, pages 255 - 258, XP002605070 [A] 1-16 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1473-0502(03)00170-8
 [A]  RICKLIN DANIEL ET AL, "Complement-targeted therapeutics", NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, NEW YORK, NY, US LNKD- DOI:10.1038/NBT1342, vol. 25, no. 11, ISSN 1087-0156, (20071101), pages 1265 - 1275, (20071107), XP002546813 [A] 1-16 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/NBT1342
 [A]  JORDAN JAMES E ET AL, "Inhibition of mannose-binding lectin reduces postischemic myocardial reperfusion injury", CIRCULATION, LIPPINCOTT WILLIAMS & WILKINS, US LNKD- DOI:10.1161/HC3601.095578, (20010918), vol. 104, no. 12, ISSN 0009-7322, pages 1413 - 1418, XP002529368 [A] 1-16 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1161/hc3601.095578
 [A]  BEINROHR L ET AL, "C1, MBL-MASPs and C1-inhibitor: novel approaches for targeting complement-mediated inflammation", TRENDS IN MOLECULAR MEDICINE, ELSEVIER CURRENT TRENDS, GB LNKD- DOI:10.1016/J.MOLMED.2008.09.009, vol. 14, no. 12, ISSN 1471-4914, (20081201), pages 511 - 521, (20081101), XP025691743 [A] 1-16 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.molmed.2008.09.009
 [T]  KOCSIS ANDREA ET AL, "Selective inhibition of the lectin pathway of the complement system", MOLECULAR IMMUNOLOGY, & 12TH EUROPEAN MEETING ON COMPLEMENT IN HUMAN DISEASE; VISEGRAD, HUNGARY; SEPTEMBER 05 -08, 2009, (200909), vol. 46, no. 14, Sp. Iss. SI, ISSN 0161-5890, page 2855, XP007915332 [T] * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.4049/jimmunol.1001819
by applicant   "Nomenclature of a-Amino Acids, Recommendations", BIOCHEMISTRY, (1974), vol. 14, no. 2, page 1975,
    AMBRUS, G.; GAL, P.; KOJIMA, M.; SZILÁGYI, K.; BALCZER, J.; ANTAL, J.; GRÁF, L.; LAICH, A.; MOFFATT, B.; SCHWAEBLE, W., "Natural substrates and inhibitors of mannan-binding lectin-associated serine protease-1 and -2: a study on recombinant catalytic fragments", J. IMMUNOL., (2003), vol. 170, pages 1374 - 1382, XP002314083
    ARLAUD, G.J.; GABORIAUD, C.; THIELENS, N.M.; BUDAYOVA-SPANO, M.; ROSSI, V.; FONTECILLA-CAMPS, J.C., "Structural biology of the Cl complex of complement unveils the mechanisms of its activation and proteolytic activity", MOL. IMMUNOL., (2002), vol. 39, pages 383 - 394,
    ATHERTON, E.; SHEPPARD, R.C., Solid Phase peptide synthesis: a practical approach, IRL PRESS,
    BEINROHR, L.; DOBO, J.; ZÁVODSZKY, P.; GAL, P., "MBL-MASPs and Cl-inhibitor: novel approaches for targeting complement-mediated inflammation", TRENDS IN MOLECULAR MEDICINE, (2008),
    BORA, N.S.; JHA, P.; BORA, P.S., "The role of complement in ocular pathology", SEMIN. IMMUNOPATHOL., (2008), vol. 30, pages 85 - 95, XP019625604
    CROOKS GE; HON G; CHANDONIA JM; BRENNER SE, "WebLogo: A sequence logo generator", GENOME RESEARCH, (2004), vol. 14, doi:doi:10.1101/gr.849004, pages 1188 - 1190, XP002408756

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1101/gr.849004
    DOBO, J.; HARMAT, V.; SEBESTYÉN, E.; EINROHR, L.; ZÁVODSZKY, P.; GAL, P., "Purification, crystallization and preliminary X-ray analysis of human mannose-binding lectin- associated serine protease-1 (MASP-1) catalytic region", ACTA CRYSTALLOGR SECT F STRUCT BIOL CRYST COMMUN, (2008), vol. 64, pages 781 - 4,
    EMPIE, M. W.; LASKOWSKI, M., JR., "Thermodynamics and kinetics of single residue replacements in avian ovomucoid third domains: effect on inhibitor interactions with serine proteinases", BIOCHEMISTRY, (1982), vol. 21, pages 2274 - 84,
    FUJITA, T.; MATSUSHITA, M.; ENDO, Y., "The lectin- complement pathway - its role in innate immunity and evolution", IMMUNOL. REV., (2004), vol. 198, pages 185 - 202, XP002600317
    GAL, P.; BARNA, L.; KOCSIS, A.; ZÁVODSZKY P., "Serine proteases of the classical and lectin pathways: Similarities and differences", IMMUNOBIOL., (2007), vol. 212, doi:doi:10.1016/j.imbio.2006.11.002, pages 267 - 277, XP022099016

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.imbio.2006.11.002
    GAL, P.; HARMAT, V.; KOCSIS, A.; BIÁN, T.; BARNA, L.; AMBRUS, G.; VEGH, B.; BALCZER, J.; SIM, R.B.; NARAY-SZABO, G., "A true autoactivating enzyme. Structural insights into mannose-binding lectin-associated serine protease-2 activation", J. BIOL. CHEM., (2005), vol. 280, pages 33435 - 33444,
    HAJELA, K.; KOJIMA, M.; AMBRUS, G.; WONG, K.H.N.; MOFFATT, B.E.; FERGULA, J.; HAJELA, S.; GAL, P.; SIM, R.B., "The biological functions of MBL-associated serine proteases (MASPs", IMMUNBIOL., (2002), vol. 205, doi:doi:10.1078/0171-2985-00147, pages 467 - 475, XP004954090

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1078/0171-2985-00147
    HARBOE, M; MOLLNES, T.E., "The alternative complement pathway revisited", J. CELL. MOL. MED., (2008), vol. 12, pages 1074 - 1084,
    HARMAT, V.; GAL, P.; KARDOS, J.; SZILÁGYI, K.; AMBRUS, G.; VEGH, B.; NARAY-SZABO, G.; ZÁVODSZKY, P., "The structure of MBL-associated serine protease-2 reveals that identical substrate specificities of Cls and MASP-2 are realized through different sets of enzyme-substrate interactions", J MOL BIOL, (2004), vol. 342, pages 1533 - 46,
    KORSINCZKY, M. L.; SCHIRRA, H. J.; ROSENGREN, K. J.; WEST, J.; CONDIE, B. A.; OTVOS, L.; ANDERSON, M. A.; CRAIK, D. J., "Solution structures by 1H NMR of the novel cyclic trypsin inhibitor SFTI-1 from sunflower seeds and an acyclic permutant", J MOL BIOL, (2001), vol. 311, doi:doi:10.1006/jmbi.2001.4887, pages 579 - 91, XP004472413

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/jmbi.2001.4887
    KRARUP, A; GULLA, K.C.; GAL, P.; HAJELA, K.; SIM R.B., "The action of MBL associated serine protease 1 (MASP1) on factor XIII and fibrinogen", BIOCHIM. BIOPHYS. ACTA, (2008), vol. 1784, doi:doi:10.1016/j.bbapap.2008.03.020, pages 1294 - 1300, XP025671878

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bbapap.2008.03.020
    KUNKEL, T. A.; BEBENEK, K.; MCCLARY, J., "Efficient Site-Directed Mutagenesis Using Uracil-Containing DNA", METHODS IN ENZYMOLOGY, (1991), vol. 204, doi:doi:10.1016/0076-6879(91)04008-C, pages 125 - 139, XP009073170

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0076-6879(91)04008-C
    LASKOWSKI, M., JR.; KATO, I., "Protein inhibitors of proteinases", ANNU REV BIOCHEM, (1980), vol. 49, pages 593 - 626,
    LUCKETT, S.; GARCIA, R. S.; BARKER, J. J.; KONAREV, A. V.; SHEWRY, P. R.; CLARKE, A. R.; BRADY, R. L., "High- resolution structure of a potent, cyclic proteinase inhibitor from sunflower seeds", J MOL BIOL, (1999), vol. 290, doi:doi:10.1006/jmbi.1999.2891, pages 525 - 33, XP004462013

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/jmbi.1999.2891
    MALIK, Z.; AMIR, S.; PAL, G.; BUZÁS, Z.; VÁRALLYAY, E.; ANTAL, J.; SZILÁGYI, Z.; VEKEY, K.; ASBOTH, B.; PATTHY, A., "Proteinase inhibitors from desert locust, Schistocerca gregaria: engineering of both P-1 and P-1 ' residues converts a potent chymotrypsin inhibitor to a potent trypsin", BIOCHIMICA ET BIOPHYSICA ACTA-PROTEIN STRUCTURE AND MOLECULAR ENZYMOLOGY, (1999), vol. 1434, doi:doi:10.1016/S0167-4838(99)00167-3, pages 143 - 150, XP004278782

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0167-4838(99)00167-3
    MARKIEWSKI, M.M.; LAMBRIS, J.D., "The role of complement in inflammatory diseases - from behind the scenes into the spotlight", AM J. PATHOL., (2007), vol. 171, pages 715 - 727,
    MOLLNES, T.E.; SONG, W.C.; LAMBRIS, J.D., "Complement in inflammatory tissue damage and disease", TRENDS IMMUNOL., (2002), vol. 23, doi:doi:10.1016/S1471-4906(01)02129-9, pages 61 - 64, XP004347849

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1471-4906(01)02129-9
    MORGAN, B.P.; MARCHBANK, K.J.; LONGHI, M.P.; HARRIS, C.L.; GALLIMORE, A.M., "Complement: central to innate immunity and bridging to adaptive responses", IMMUNOL. LETT., (2005), vol. 97, doi:doi:10.1016/j.imlet.2004.11.010, pages 171 - 179, XP004773494

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.imlet.2004.11.010
    MULVENNA, J. P.; FOLEY, F. M.; CRAIK, D. J., "Discovery, structural determination, and putative processing of the precursor protein that produces the cyclic trypsin inhibitor sunflower trypsin inhibitor 1", J BIOL CHEM, (2005), vol. 280, pages 32245 - 53,
    SCHNEIDER TD; STEPHENS RM, "Sequence Logos: A New Way to Display Consensus Sequences", NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1990), vol. 18, pages 6097 - 6100, XP000608250
    SCHWERTZ H; CARTER JM; RUSS M; SCHUBERT S; SCHLITT A; BUERKE U; SCHMIDT M; HILLEN H; WERDAN K; BUERKE M., "Serine protease inhibitor nafamostat given before reperfusion reduces inflammatory myocardial injury by complement and neutrophil inhibition", J CARDIOVASC PHARMACOL., (2008), vol. 52, no. 2, pages 151 - 60,
    SMITH, G. P., "Filamentous Fusion Phage - Novel Expression Vectors That Display Cloned Antigens on the Virion Surface", SCIENCE, (1985), vol. 228, doi:doi:10.1126/science.4001944, pages 1315 - 1317, XP002464311

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.4001944
    "The complement system", Novel roles in health and disease, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS,
    SZENTHE, B.; PATTHY, A.; GÁSPÁRI, Z.; KÉKESI, A. K.; GRÁF, L.; PAL, G., "When the surface tells what lies beneath: Combinatorial phage-display mutagenesis reveals complex networks of surface-core interactions in the pacifastin protease inhibitor family", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, (2007), vol. 370, doi:doi:10.1016/j.jmb.2007.04.029, pages 63 - 79, XP025323306

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jmb.2007.04.029
    WALPORT, M.J., "Complement. First of two parts", N. ENG. J. MED., (2001), vol. 344, pages 1058 - 1066,
    WALPORT, M.J., "Complement. Second of two parts", N. ENG. J. MED., (2001), vol. 344, pages 1140 - 1144,