Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2441083

EP2441083 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR HEATING A TIP APEX OF A CHARGED PARTICLE SOURCE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  13.01.2014
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.11.2019New entry: Invitation to file observations in an appeal + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Carl Zeiss Microscopy, LLC
One Zeiss Drive
Thornwood, NY 10594 / US
[2013/34]
Former [2012/16]For all designated states
Carl Zeiss NTS, LLC.
One Corporation Way
Peabody, MA 01960 / US
Inventor(s)01 / NOTTE IV, John A.
18 Lawndale Circle
Gloucester Massachusetts 01930 / US
02 / PERCIVAL, Randy
5 Randy Lane
Raymond New Hampshire 03077 / US
03 / RAHMAN, Milton
24 Royal Crest Dr. Apt 5
North Andover, MA 01845 / US
04 / BARRISS, Louise
330 Park Street
North Reading Massachusetts 01864 / US
05 / MELLO, Russ
3 Adele Circle
Wakefield Massachusetts 01880 / US
06 / DIMANNA, Mark D.
59 Deer Run
Fremont New Hampshire 03044 / US
 [2012/16]
Representative(s)Gnatzig, Klaus
Carl Zeiss AG
Patentabteilung
73446 Oberkochen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/16]Gnatzig, Klaus
Carl Zeiss AG, Patentabteilung
73446 Oberkochen / DE
Application number, filing date10737667.528.05.2010
WO2010US36527
Priority number, dateUS20090186521P12.06.2009         Original published format: US 186521 P
[2012/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2010144267
Date:16.12.2010
Language:EN
[2010/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2441083
Date:18.04.2012
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.12.2010
[2012/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP16.12.2010
ClassificationInternational:H01J1/15, G05D23/27
[2012/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/16]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR ERHITZUNG DES SPITZENAPEX EINER QUELLE FÜR GELADENE PARTIKEL[2012/16]
English:METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR HEATING A TIP APEX OF A CHARGED PARTICLE SOURCE[2012/16]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE CHAUFFAGE DE L'EXTRÉMITÉ DE POINTE D'UNE SOURCE DE PARTICULES CHARGÉES[2012/16]
Entry into regional phase19.12.2011National basic fee paid 
19.12.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
19.12.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.12.2011Examination requested  [2012/16]
25.07.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.07.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.01.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.05.2015Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination28.07.2015Appeal received No.  T1994/15
02.10.2015Statement of grounds filed
22.11.2019Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M04) [2019/47]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  01.07.2013
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.05.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
27.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
27.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
21.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
20.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
23.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
25.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 09
23.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 10
Cited inInternational search[XAYI]GB1196103  (ASS ELECT IND [GB]) [X] 1-10,14-16 * the whole document * [A] 21 [Y] 22,23 [I] 11-13,17-20;
 [XDAYI]US2007158558  (WARD BILLY W [US] ET AL WARD BILLY W [US] ET AL) [XD] 1-7,10,14,15,21 * paragraphs [0174] , [0175] , [0179] , [0211] - [0218] - [0237] - [0241] - [0257]; figures 1,2,10,11 * [A] 16-20 [Y] 22,23 [I] 8,9,11-13
 [XI]  - ISLAM A ET AL, "Digital control system for the thermionic cathode in an electron gun", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SOUTHEAST CONFERENCE (SOUTHEASTCON). BIRMINGHAM, ALABAMA, APR. 12 - 15, 1992; [PROCEEDINGS OF THE SOUTHEAST CONFERENCE (SOUTHEASTCON)], NEW YORK, IEEE, US LNKD- DOI:10.1109/SECON.1992.202423, (19920412), vol. -, ISBN 978-0-7803-0494-9, pages 720 - 723, XP010057118 [X] 1,14-16,21 * the whole document * [I] 2-13,17-20,22,23

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/SECON.1992.202423