Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2589004

EP2589004 - METHOD FOR SELECTIVELY DISTRIBUTING INFORMATION IN A COMPUTER OR COMMUNICATION NETWORK, AND PHYSICAL ENTITIES THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  01.12.2017
Database last updated on 12.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip01.12.2017Refusal of applicationpublished on 03.01.2018  [2018/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
For all designated states
Universidad Politécnica De Madrid
Ramiro de Maeztu 7
28040 Madrid / ES
[N/P]
Former [2013/19]For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
For all designated states
Universidad Politécnica De Madrid
Ramiro de Maeztu 7
28040 Madrid / ES
Inventor(s)01 / MONJAS LLORENTE, Miguel Angel
c/o Edificio Ericsson Milenium
Via de los Poblados, 13
E-28033 Madrid / ES
02 / DEL ÁLAMO RAMIRO, José María
Rio Tajo 6 10B
E-28923 Alcorcón (Madrid) / ES
03 / SAN MIGUEL GONZÁLEZ, Beatríz
Plaza Puerto de la Cruz 2, 11-5
E-28029 Madrid / ES
04 / TRAPERO BURGOS, Rubén
Porto Lagos 5
E-28924 Alcorcón (Madrid) / ES
05 / YELMO GARCÍA, Juan Carlos
Hortensia 8
E-28933 Móstoles (Madrid) / ES
 [2013/21]
Former [2013/19]01 / MONJAS LLORENTE, Miguel Angel
C/Embajadores
177 esc. F
4 Grad D
E-28045 Madrid / ES
02 / DEL ÁLAMO RAMIRO, José María
Rio Tajo 6 10B
E-28923 Alcorcón (Madrid) / ES
03 / SAN MIGUEL GONZÁLEZ, Beatríz
Plaza Puerto de la Cruz 2, 11-5
E-28029 Madrid / ES
04 / TRAPERO BURGOS, Rubén
Porto Lagos 5
E-28924 Alcorcón (Madrid) / ES
05 / YELMO GARCÍA, Juan Carlos
Hortensia 8
E-28933 Móstoles (Madrid) / ES
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/19]HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date10737799.630.06.2010
WO2010EP59264
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2012000543
Date:05.01.2012
Language:EN
[2012/01]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2589004
Date:08.05.2013
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.01.2012
[2013/19]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP05.01.2012
ClassificationInternational:G06Q30/00
[2013/19]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/19]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR SELEKTIVEN VERTEILUNG VON INFORMATIONEN IN EINEM COMPUTER ODER KOMMUNIKATIONSNETZWERK UND PHYSISCHE EINHEITEN DAFÜR[2013/19]
English:METHOD FOR SELECTIVELY DISTRIBUTING INFORMATION IN A COMPUTER OR COMMUNICATION NETWORK, AND PHYSICAL ENTITIES THEREFOR[2013/19]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE DISTRIBUTION SÉLECTIVE D'INFORMATIONS DANS UN ORDINATEUR OU DANS UN RÉSEAU DE COMMUNICATION, ET ENTITÉS PHYSIQUES PERMETTANT D'APPLIQUER LEDIT PROCÉDÉ[2013/19]
Entry into regional phase11.12.2012National basic fee paid 
11.12.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
11.12.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.04.2012Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
11.12.2012Examination requested  [2013/19]
26.07.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.02.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.05.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.06.2017Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 18.07.2017
18.07.2017Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
24.07.2017Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2018/01]
03.08.2017Application refused, date of legal effect [2018/01]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  19.02.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
27.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
30.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
29.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
27.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
27.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
Cited inInternational search[I]US2008195466  (WRIGHT STEVEN ALLAN [US]) [I] 1-20 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0030] *;
 [I]  - "OAuth core 1.0 Revision A", INTERNET CITATION, (20090624), pages 1 - 27, XP002570263 [I] 1-20 * the whole document *
 [I]  - MATTHIAS HÃ SEL ET AL, Security in OpenSocial-Instrumented Social Networking Services, COMMUNICATIONS AND MULTIMEDIA SECURITY, SPRINGER BERLIN HEIDELBERG, BERLIN, HEIDELBERG, PAGE(S) 40 - 52, (20100531), ISBN 978-3-642-13240-7, XP019142837 [I] 1-20 * the whole document *
 [A]  - TED J, "OAuth project review", INTERNET CITATION, (20090129), pages 1 - 15, URL: http://www.w3.org/2009/01/29-oauth-minutes, (20100304), XP002570264 [A] 1-20 * the whole document *
by applicant   - ERAN HAMMER-LAHAV, EXPLAINING OAUTH, (20070905), URL: http://hueniverse.com/2007/09/explaining-oauth,
    - ATWOOD, M. ET AL., OAUTH CORE 1.0 REVISION A, (20090624), URL: http://oa.uth.net/core/l.Oa,
    - ERAN HAMMER-LAHAV, BEGINNER'S GUIDE TO OAUTH - PART II: PROTOCOL WORKFLOW, (20071015), URL: http://hueniverse.com/2007/10/beginners-guide-to-oauth-part-ii-protocol- workflow,
    - E. HAMMER-LAHAV ET AL., "The OAuth 2.0 Protocol, draft-ietf-oauth-v2-09", INTERNET-DRAFT, NETWORK WORKING GROUP, (20100629),
    - "OpenSocial Specification version 0.9", OPENSOCIAL AND GADGETS SPECIFICATION GROUP, (20090415),