Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2460084

EP2460084 - ASYNCHRONOUS INTERFACE FOR MULTI-RADIO COEXISTENCE MANAGER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  12.08.2013
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.07.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121 / US
[2012/23]
Inventor(s)01 / GRUBER, Hans, Georg
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego CA 92121 / US
02 / WIETFELDT, Richard, D.
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego CA 92121 / US
03 / CHRISIKOS, George
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego CA 92121 / US
 [2012/23]
Representative(s)Wegner, Hans
Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte
Prinzregentenplatz 7
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/23]Wegner, Hans
Bardehle Pagenberg
Prinzregentenplatz 7
DE-81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date10740478.228.07.2010
WO2010US43589
Priority number, dateUS20090229626P29.07.2009         Original published format: US 229626 P
US2010074919529.03.2010         Original published format: US 749195
[2012/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2011014579
Date:03.02.2011
Language:EN
[2011/05]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2460084
Date:06.06.2012
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.02.2011
[2012/23]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP03.02.2011
ClassificationInternational:G06F13/38, H04W72/12, H04W88/06
[2012/23]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/23]
TitleGerman:ASYNCHRONE SCHNITTSTELLE FÜR MEHRFUNKKOEXISTENZMANAGER[2012/23]
English:ASYNCHRONOUS INTERFACE FOR MULTI-RADIO COEXISTENCE MANAGER[2012/23]
French:INTERFACE ASYNCHRONE POUR GESTIONNAIRE DE COEXISTENCE MULTIRADIO[2012/23]
Entry into regional phase01.02.2012National basic fee paid 
01.02.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
01.02.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.02.2012Examination requested  [2012/23]
10.09.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.06.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.08.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.05.2014Date of oral proceedings
14.07.2014Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
14.07.2014Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination26.08.2014Appeal received No.  T1967/14
15.09.2014Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  27.06.2013
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.06.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
08.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
08.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
09.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
11.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
10.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
09.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 09
09.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 10
Cited inInternational search[I]EP1959619  (NOKIA CORP [FI]) [I] 1-37 * paragraph [0084] - paragraph [0086] * * paragraph [0093] - paragraph [0095] * * figures 1,3,5,9A, 9B *;
 [A]US2003135675  (PONTIUS TIMOTHY A [US] ET AL) [A] 3,10,14,23,32 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0014] * * figure 1; claim 1 *
 [A]  - BACKMAN JUHA ET AL, "Slimbus: An Audio, Data And Control Interface For Mobile Devices", CONFERENCE: 29TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE: AUDIO FOR MOBILE AND HANDHELD DEVICES; SEPTEMBER 2006, AES, 60 EAST 42ND STREET, ROOM 2520 NEW YORK 10165-2520, USA, (20060901), XP040507958 [A] 1-37 * abstract *