Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2396024

EP2396024 - USE OF ANTISECRETORY FACTORS (AF) FOR OPTIMIZING CELLULAR UPTAKE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  26.07.2016
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.06.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
25.06.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Lantmännen AS-Faktor AB
Box 30192
10425 Stockholm / SE
[2011/51]
Inventor(s)01 / JENNISCHE, Eva
Nedre Fogelbergsgatan 9b
S-411 28 Göteborg / SE
02 / LANGE, Stefan
Nedre Fogelbergsgatan 9b
S-411 28 Göteborg / SE
03 / HANSSON, Hans-Arne
Doteviksvägen 8
S-436 58 Hovås / SE
 [2011/51]
Representative(s)Aera A/S
Gammel Kongevej 60, 18th floor
1850 Frederiksberg C / DK
[N/P]
Former [2011/51]VALEA AB
Box 7086
103 87 Stockholm / SE
Application number, filing date10741487.211.02.2010
WO2010SE50165
Priority number, dateSE2009000017011.02.2009         Original published format: SE 0900170
[2011/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2010093324
Date:19.08.2010
Language:EN
[2010/33]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2396024
Date:21.12.2011
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.08.2010
[2011/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE19.08.2010
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.01.2013
ClassificationInternational:A61K38/17, A61P35/00, G01N33/574
[2011/51]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/51]
TitleGerman:VERWENDUNG VON ANTISEKRETORISCHEN FAKTOREN (AF) FÜR OPTMIERTE ZELLULÄRE AUFNAHME[2011/51]
English:USE OF ANTISECRETORY FACTORS (AF) FOR OPTIMIZING CELLULAR UPTAKE[2011/51]
French:UTILISATION DE FACTEURS ANTISÉCRÉTOIRES (AF) POUR OPTIMISATION DE L'ABSORPTION CELLULAIRE[2011/51]
Entry into regional phase09.09.2011National basic fee paid 
09.09.2011Search fee paid 
09.09.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
09.09.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.10.2010Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE
09.09.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.09.2011Examination requested  [2011/51]
27.01.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.07.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.05.2017Date of oral proceedings
29.05.2017Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
29.05.2017Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination20.07.2017Appeal received No.  T2408/17
09.10.2017Statement of grounds filed
17.01.2020Date of oral proceedings
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  27.01.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
21.02.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
24.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
19.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
16.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
21.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
15.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 09
18.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:Search[XI]WO2007126363  (LANTMAANNEN AS FAKTOR [SE]; JENNISCHE EVA [SE]; HANSSON HANS-ARNE [SE]) [X] 1-13,16 * page 7, lines 12-23,32 - page 8, line 5 * * examples 2,13 * * sequences 1,4 * [I] 1-13,16;
 [XI]WO2007126364  (LANTMAENNEN AS FAKTOR [SE]; HANSSON HANS-ARNE [SE]; LANGE STEFAN [SE];) [X] 1-13,16 * page 9, paragraph 2 * * page 15, lines 10-12 * * page 1; sequences 1,4 * [I] 1-13,16;
 [XI]WO2007126365  (LANTMAENNEN AS FAKTOR [SE]; HANSSON HANS-ARNE [SE]; LANGE STEFAN [SE]) [X] 1-13,16 * page 4, paragraph 3 * * page 7, paragraph 2 * * page 8, paragraph l * * pages 34-35; example 12 * * sequences 1,4 * [I] 1-13,16;
 [XI]  - WALLGREN A C ET AL, "AF-16 a peptide derived from the endogenous protein antisecretory factor, decreases tumor interstital fluid pressure. (abstract 289)", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR MEDICINE, SPANDIDOS PUBLICATIONS, GR, (20090101), vol. 24, no. SUP.1, ISSN 1107-3756, page S52, XP003025669 [X] 1-13,16 * abstract * [I] 1-13,16
 [I]  - Lange, Stefan, "The AF proteinA clinical innovation ofendogenous origin", (20040830), AS-Faktor AB, URL: http://www.as-faktor.se/aciro/bilddb/objektvisa.asp?new=true&SidObj=if8j40A5LvRLG2xMpGB2Og4TfFOUNnJE63CQd7KYGbp0LpCQNceFGlG1NB77&ext=.pdf, (20130110), XP002690300 [I] 1-13,16 * the whole document *
International search[X]WO2007126363  (LANTMÄNNEN AS-FAKTOR);
 [X]US2008255243  (E.F. PETRICOIN ET AL);
 [X]WO2008069608  (SEOUL NATIONALUNIVERSITY INDUSTRY FOUNDATION ET AL);
 [Y]WO2007126365  (LANTMANNEN AS-FAKTOR);
 [A]WO03087840  (OXFORD GLYCOSCIENCES (UK) LTD);
 [A]WO9821978  (RURAL PATENT SVENSKA AB);
 [A]WO2007126364  (LANTMANNEN AS-FAKTOR);
 [A]WO2005030246  (AS-FAKTOR AB);
 [X]  - WALLGREN AC ET AL., "AF-16 a peptide derived from the endogenous protein antisecretory factor, decreases tumor interstital fluid pressure. (abstract 289)", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR MEDICINE, (2009), vol. 24, no. SUP.1, page S52, XP003025669