Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2396430

EP2396430 - TEMPLATE-INDEPENDENT LIGATION OF SINGLE-STRANDED DNA [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  29.03.2013
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.06.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 25.07.2018  [2018/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Epicentre Technologies Corporation
9885 Towne Centre Dr.
San Diego, CA 92121 / US
[2012/02]
Former [2011/51]For all designated states
Epicentre Technologies Corporation
726 Post Road
Madison, WI 53713 / US
Inventor(s)01 / JENDRISAK, Jerome
487 County Road M
Middleton Wisconsin 53562-2345 / US
02 / DECKER, Joanne
W9108 Ripley Road
Cambridge Wisconsin 53523 / US
03 / DAHL, Gary
2131 Kendall Avenue
Madison Wisconsin 53726 / US
 [2013/28]
Former [2011/51]01 / JENDRISAK, Jerome
2721 Mason Street
Madison Wisconsin 53705 / US
02 / DECKER, Joanne
W9108 Ripley Road
Cambridge Wisconsin 53523 / US
03 / DAHL, Gary
2131 Kendall Avenue
Madison Wisconsin 53726 / US
Representative(s)Cooley (UK) LLP
Dashwood
69 Old Broad Street
London EC2M 1QS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/03]Murphy, Colm Damien , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London EC1A 4HD / GB
Former [2012/02]Murphy, Colm Damien , et al
Ipulse
Carrington House
123-130-Regent Street
London W1B 5SE / GB
Former [2011/51]Hart, Deborah Mary , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London
WC1R 4PJ / GB
Application number, filing date10741881.616.02.2010
WO2010US24319
Priority number, dateUS20090152868P16.02.2009         Original published format: US 152868 P
[2011/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2010094040
Date:19.08.2010
Language:EN
[2010/33]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2396430
Date:21.12.2011
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.08.2010
[2011/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2396430
Date:01.05.2013
Language:EN
[2013/18]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US19.08.2010
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.06.2012
ClassificationInternational:C12Q1/68, C12P19/34, A61K31/7105, C07H21/04
[2011/51]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/51]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORLAGENUNABHÄNGIGE LIGATION VON EINZELSTRANG-DNA[2011/51]
English:TEMPLATE-INDEPENDENT LIGATION OF SINGLE-STRANDED DNA[2011/51]
French:LIGATURE INDÉPENDANTE DE LA MATRICE D'UN ADN SIMPLE BRIN[2011/51]
Entry into regional phase16.09.2011National basic fee paid 
16.09.2011Search fee paid 
16.09.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
16.09.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.09.2011Examination requested  [2011/51]
28.02.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.09.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.01.2013Fee for grant paid
21.01.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP13155136.8  / EP2610352
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  21.09.2012
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  21.01.2014   
Kilger, Christian
Wachtelstr. 4
14195 Berlin / DE
Opponent's representative
CH Kilger Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB, et al
Fasanenstrasse 29
10719 Berlin / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2014/10]
Opponent(s)01  21.01.2014   
Kilger, Christian
Wachtelstr. 4
14195 Berlin / DE
Opponent's representative
Fanelli Haag Kilger PLLC, et al
Fasanenstrasse 29
10719 Berlin / DE
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
12.03.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
22.09.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
13.01.2016Date of oral proceedings
08.02.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
08.02.2016Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition14.04.2016Appeal received No.  T1007/16
18.05.2016Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
12.02.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU16.02.2010
AT01.05.2013
BE01.05.2013
CY01.05.2013
CZ01.05.2013
EE01.05.2013
FI01.05.2013
HR01.05.2013
IT01.05.2013
LT01.05.2013
LV01.05.2013
MC01.05.2013
MK01.05.2013
MT01.05.2013
PL01.05.2013
RO01.05.2013
SI01.05.2013
SK01.05.2013
SM01.05.2013
TR01.05.2013
BG01.08.2013
NO01.08.2013
GR02.08.2013
ES12.08.2013
IS01.09.2013
PT02.09.2013
IE16.02.2014
LU16.02.2014
CH28.02.2014
LI28.02.2014
[2018/30]
Former [2016/33]HU16.02.2010
AT01.05.2013
BE01.05.2013
CY01.05.2013
CZ01.05.2013
EE01.05.2013
FI01.05.2013
HR01.05.2013
IT01.05.2013
LT01.05.2013
LV01.05.2013
MC01.05.2013
MT01.05.2013
PL01.05.2013
RO01.05.2013
SI01.05.2013
SK01.05.2013
SM01.05.2013
TR01.05.2013
BG01.08.2013
NO01.08.2013
GR02.08.2013
ES12.08.2013
IS01.09.2013
PT02.09.2013
IE16.02.2014
LU16.02.2014
CH28.02.2014
LI28.02.2014
Former [2016/32]HU16.02.2010
AT01.05.2013
BE01.05.2013
CY01.05.2013
CZ01.05.2013
EE01.05.2013
FI01.05.2013
HR01.05.2013
IT01.05.2013
LT01.05.2013
LV01.05.2013
MC01.05.2013
MT01.05.2013
PL01.05.2013
RO01.05.2013
SI01.05.2013
SK01.05.2013
SM01.05.2013
BG01.08.2013
NO01.08.2013
GR02.08.2013
ES12.08.2013
IS01.09.2013
PT02.09.2013
IE16.02.2014
LU16.02.2014
CH28.02.2014
LI28.02.2014
Former [2016/22]AT01.05.2013
BE01.05.2013
CY01.05.2013
CZ01.05.2013
EE01.05.2013
FI01.05.2013
HR01.05.2013
IT01.05.2013
LT01.05.2013
LV01.05.2013
MC01.05.2013
MT01.05.2013
PL01.05.2013
RO01.05.2013
SI01.05.2013
SK01.05.2013
SM01.05.2013
BG01.08.2013
NO01.08.2013
GR02.08.2013
ES12.08.2013
IS01.09.2013
PT02.09.2013
IE16.02.2014
LU16.02.2014
CH28.02.2014
LI28.02.2014
Former [2016/12]AT01.05.2013
BE01.05.2013
CY01.05.2013
CZ01.05.2013
EE01.05.2013
FI01.05.2013
HR01.05.2013
IT01.05.2013
LT01.05.2013
LV01.05.2013
MC01.05.2013
MT01.05.2013
PL01.05.2013
RO01.05.2013
SI01.05.2013
SK01.05.2013
BG01.08.2013
NO01.08.2013
GR02.08.2013
ES12.08.2013
IS01.09.2013
PT02.09.2013
IE16.02.2014
LU16.02.2014
CH28.02.2014
LI28.02.2014
Former [2015/07]AT01.05.2013
BE01.05.2013
CY01.05.2013
CZ01.05.2013
EE01.05.2013
FI01.05.2013
HR01.05.2013
IT01.05.2013
LT01.05.2013
LV01.05.2013
MC01.05.2013
PL01.05.2013
RO01.05.2013
SI01.05.2013
SK01.05.2013
BG01.08.2013
NO01.08.2013
GR02.08.2013
ES12.08.2013
IS01.09.2013
PT02.09.2013
IE16.02.2014
LU16.02.2014
CH28.02.2014
LI28.02.2014
Former [2014/46]AT01.05.2013
BE01.05.2013
CY01.05.2013
CZ01.05.2013
EE01.05.2013
FI01.05.2013
HR01.05.2013
IT01.05.2013
LT01.05.2013
LV01.05.2013
MC01.05.2013
PL01.05.2013
RO01.05.2013
SI01.05.2013
SK01.05.2013
BG01.08.2013
NO01.08.2013
GR02.08.2013
ES12.08.2013
IS01.09.2013
PT02.09.2013
LU16.02.2014
CH28.02.2014
LI28.02.2014
Former [2014/44]AT01.05.2013
BE01.05.2013
CY01.05.2013
CZ01.05.2013
EE01.05.2013
FI01.05.2013
HR01.05.2013
IT01.05.2013
LT01.05.2013
LV01.05.2013
MC01.05.2013
PL01.05.2013
RO01.05.2013
SI01.05.2013
SK01.05.2013
BG01.08.2013
NO01.08.2013
GR02.08.2013
ES12.08.2013
IS01.09.2013
PT02.09.2013
LU16.02.2014
Former [2014/11]AT01.05.2013
BE01.05.2013
CY01.05.2013
CZ01.05.2013
EE01.05.2013
FI01.05.2013
HR01.05.2013
IT01.05.2013
LT01.05.2013
LV01.05.2013
PL01.05.2013
RO01.05.2013
SI01.05.2013
SK01.05.2013
BG01.08.2013
NO01.08.2013
GR02.08.2013
ES12.08.2013
IS01.09.2013
PT02.09.2013
Former [2014/10]AT01.05.2013
BE01.05.2013
CY01.05.2013
CZ01.05.2013
EE01.05.2013
FI01.05.2013
HR01.05.2013
LT01.05.2013
LV01.05.2013
PL01.05.2013
SI01.05.2013
SK01.05.2013
BG01.08.2013
NO01.08.2013
GR02.08.2013
ES12.08.2013
IS01.09.2013
PT02.09.2013
Former [2014/06]AT01.05.2013
BE01.05.2013
CY01.05.2013
FI01.05.2013
HR01.05.2013
LT01.05.2013
LV01.05.2013
PL01.05.2013
SI01.05.2013
BG01.08.2013
NO01.08.2013
GR02.08.2013
ES12.08.2013
IS01.09.2013
PT02.09.2013
Former [2014/02]AT01.05.2013
CY01.05.2013
FI01.05.2013
HR01.05.2013
LT01.05.2013
LV01.05.2013
PL01.05.2013
SI01.05.2013
BG01.08.2013
NO01.08.2013
GR02.08.2013
ES12.08.2013
IS01.09.2013
PT02.09.2013
Former [2013/52]AT01.05.2013
CY01.05.2013
FI01.05.2013
HR01.05.2013
LT01.05.2013
PL01.05.2013
SI01.05.2013
BG01.08.2013
NO01.08.2013
GR02.08.2013
ES12.08.2013
IS01.09.2013
PT02.09.2013
Former [2013/51]AT01.05.2013
FI01.05.2013
HR01.05.2013
LT01.05.2013
PL01.05.2013
SI01.05.2013
BG01.08.2013
NO01.08.2013
GR02.08.2013
ES12.08.2013
IS01.09.2013
PT02.09.2013
Former [2013/50]AT01.05.2013
FI01.05.2013
LT01.05.2013
PL01.05.2013
SI01.05.2013
BG01.08.2013
NO01.08.2013
GR02.08.2013
ES12.08.2013
IS01.09.2013
PT02.09.2013
Former [2013/49]AT01.05.2013
FI01.05.2013
LT01.05.2013
SI01.05.2013
NO01.08.2013
GR02.08.2013
ES12.08.2013
IS01.09.2013
PT02.09.2013
Former [2013/48]AT01.05.2013
LT01.05.2013
NO01.08.2013
ES12.08.2013
IS01.09.2013
PT02.09.2013
Former [2013/47]LT01.05.2013
NO01.08.2013
PT02.09.2013
Documents cited:Search[A]WO2007106509  (GENIZON BIOSCIENCES INC [CA], et al) [A] 1-14 * Examples *
 [A]  - WEISS B ET AL, "Ezymatic breakage and joining of deoxyribonucleic acid. VII. Properties of the enzyme-adenylate intermediate in the polynucleotide ligase reaction.", THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY 10 SEP 1968 LNKD- PUBMED:4879168, (19680910), vol. 243, no. 17, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 4556 - 4563, XP002677345 [A] 1-14 * abstract * * page 4559, column 1, paragraph 2 - page 4560, column 1, paragraph 2 *
International search[Y]US2006240451  (JENDRISAK JEROME [US], et al);
 [A]US2005266439  (HJORLEIFSDOTTIR SIGRIDUR [IS], et al)
 [Y]  - BLONDAL ET AL., "Isolation and characterization of a thermostable RNA ligase 1 from a Thermus scotoductus bacteriophage TS2126 with good single-stranded DNA ligation properties.", NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (20050107), vol. 33, no. 1, pages 135 - 142, XP003026551

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/NAR/GKI149
 [Y]  - NUNEZ ET AL., "Application of Circular Ligase to Provide Template for Rolling Circle Amplification of Low Amounts of Fragmented DNA.", GENETIC IDENTITY CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS - 19TH INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON HUMAN IDENTIFICATION - 2008, URL: URL:http://www.promega.com/geneticidproc/ussymp19proc/oralpresentations/Nunez.pdfviahttp://www.promega.com/geneticidproc/ussymp19proc/oralpresentations.htm, (20100331), XP008153466