Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2464601

EP2464601 - PROCESS FOR REVAMPING AN AMMONIA PLANT WITH NITROGEN-BASED WASHING OF A PURGE STREAM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  04.10.2017
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CASALE SA
Via Giulio Pocobelli 6
6900 Lugano / CH
[2014/43]
Former [2012/25]For all designated states
Ammonia Casale S.A.
Via Giulio Pocobelli, 6
6900 Lugano-Besso / CH
Inventor(s)01 / PANZA, Sergio
Via Borgovico 14
I-22100 Como / IT
02 / MOREO, Pietro
Via Besso 41
CH-6900 Lugano / CH
03 / STREPPAROLA, Elio
Via Ganna 10
I-21039 Bedero Valcuvia (VA) / IT
 [2015/13]
Former [2012/25]01 / PANZA, Sergio
Viale Varese 53
I-22100 Como / IT
02 / MOREO, Pietro
Via Besso 41
CH-6900 Lugano / CH
03 / STREPPAROLA, Elio
Via Ganna 10
I-21039 Bedero Valcuvia (VA) / IT
Representative(s)Zardi, Marco
M. Zardi & Co. SA
Via Pioda 6
6900 Lugano / CH
[2015/13]
Former [2012/25]Zardi, Marco
M. Zardi & Co. S.A. Via Pioda 6
6900 Lugano / CH
Application number, filing date10741934.303.08.2010
WO2010EP61249
Priority number, dateEP2009016784913.08.2009         Original published format: EP 09167849
[2012/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2011018388
Date:17.02.2011
Language:EN
[2011/07]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2464601
Date:20.06.2012
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.02.2011
[2012/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2464601
Date:25.03.2015
Language:EN
[2015/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.04.2011
ClassificationInternational:C01C1/04, C01B3/02
[2012/25]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/25]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Modernisierung eines Ammoniakwerks mit stickstoffbasierter Wäsche eines Spülstroms[2014/38]
English:PROCESS FOR REVAMPING AN AMMONIA PLANT WITH NITROGEN-BASED WASHING OF A PURGE STREAM[2012/25]
French:Procédé de remaniement d'une d'installation de fabrication d'ammoniac avec lavage à base d'azote d'un flux de purge[2014/38]
Former [2012/25]VERFAHREN ZUR MODERNISIERUNG EINES AMMONIAKWERKS MIT STICKSTOFFBASIERTER WÄSCHE EINES SPÜLSTROMS
Former [2012/25]PROCÉDÉ DE RECONDITIONNEMENT D'UNE INSTALLATION DE PRODUCTION D AMMONIAC PAR LAVAGE À BASE D'AZOTE D'UN ÉCOULEMENT DE PURGE
Entry into regional phase25.11.2011National basic fee paid 
25.11.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
25.11.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.03.2011Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
25.11.2011Examination requested  [2012/25]
22.10.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.03.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.05.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.10.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.02.2015Fee for grant paid
10.02.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
10.02.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  07.03.2013
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  18.12.2015  26.01.2016  ADMISSIBLE
L'AIR LIQUIDE, SOCIETE ANONYME POUR L'ETUDE ET L'EXPLOITATION DES PROCEDES GEORGES CLAUDE
75 Quai d'Orsay
75007 Paris / FR
Opponent's representative
Debecker, Isabelle Virginie, et al
Air Liquide
Direction de la Propriete Intellectuelle
75, Quai d'Orsay
75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR
 [2018/09]
Former [2016/04]
Opponent(s)01  18.12.2015   
L'AIR LIQUIDE, SOCIETE ANONYME POUR L'ETUDE ET L'EXPLOITATION DES PROCEDES GEORGES CLAUDE
75 Quai d'Orsay
75007 Paris / FR
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
03.02.2016Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
16.08.2016Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
15.09.2017Date of oral proceedings
05.10.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
05.10.2017Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition04.12.2017Appeal received No.  T2646/17
05.02.2018Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.08.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
22.08.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
26.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU03.08.2010
AL25.03.2015
AT25.03.2015
BE25.03.2015
BG25.03.2015
CY25.03.2015
CZ25.03.2015
EE25.03.2015
ES25.03.2015
FI25.03.2015
HR25.03.2015
IT25.03.2015
LT25.03.2015
LV25.03.2015
MC25.03.2015
MK25.03.2015
MT25.03.2015
NL25.03.2015
PL25.03.2015
RO25.03.2015
SE25.03.2015
SI25.03.2015
SK25.03.2015
SM25.03.2015
TR25.03.2015
NO25.06.2015
GR26.06.2015
IS25.07.2015
PT27.07.2015
IE03.08.2015
LU03.08.2015
CH31.08.2015
FR31.08.2015
LI31.08.2015
[2018/46]
Former [2018/30]HU03.08.2010
AT25.03.2015
BE25.03.2015
BG25.03.2015
CY25.03.2015
CZ25.03.2015
EE25.03.2015
ES25.03.2015
FI25.03.2015
HR25.03.2015
IT25.03.2015
LT25.03.2015
LV25.03.2015
MC25.03.2015
MK25.03.2015
MT25.03.2015
NL25.03.2015
PL25.03.2015
RO25.03.2015
SE25.03.2015
SI25.03.2015
SK25.03.2015
SM25.03.2015
TR25.03.2015
NO25.06.2015
GR26.06.2015
IS25.07.2015
PT27.07.2015
IE03.08.2015
LU03.08.2015
CH31.08.2015
FR31.08.2015
LI31.08.2015
Former [2017/38]HU03.08.2010
AT25.03.2015
BE25.03.2015
BG25.03.2015
CY25.03.2015
CZ25.03.2015
EE25.03.2015
ES25.03.2015
FI25.03.2015
HR25.03.2015
IT25.03.2015
LT25.03.2015
LV25.03.2015
MC25.03.2015
MT25.03.2015
NL25.03.2015
PL25.03.2015
RO25.03.2015
SE25.03.2015
SI25.03.2015
SK25.03.2015
SM25.03.2015
TR25.03.2015
NO25.06.2015
GR26.06.2015
IS25.07.2015
PT27.07.2015
IE03.08.2015
LU03.08.2015
CH31.08.2015
FR31.08.2015
LI31.08.2015
Former [2017/21]AT25.03.2015
BE25.03.2015
CZ25.03.2015
EE25.03.2015
ES25.03.2015
FI25.03.2015
HR25.03.2015
IT25.03.2015
LT25.03.2015
LV25.03.2015
MC25.03.2015
MT25.03.2015
NL25.03.2015
PL25.03.2015
RO25.03.2015
SE25.03.2015
SI25.03.2015
SK25.03.2015
GR26.06.2015
IS25.07.2015
PT27.07.2015
IE03.08.2015
LU03.08.2015
CH31.08.2015
FR31.08.2015
LI31.08.2015
Former [2016/36]AT25.03.2015
BE25.03.2015
CZ25.03.2015
EE25.03.2015
ES25.03.2015
FI25.03.2015
HR25.03.2015
IT25.03.2015
LT25.03.2015
LV25.03.2015
MC25.03.2015
NL25.03.2015
PL25.03.2015
RO25.03.2015
SE25.03.2015
SI25.03.2015
SK25.03.2015
GR26.06.2015
IS25.07.2015
PT27.07.2015
IE03.08.2015
LU03.08.2015
CH31.08.2015
FR31.08.2015
LI31.08.2015
Former [2016/33]AT25.03.2015
CZ25.03.2015
EE25.03.2015
ES25.03.2015
FI25.03.2015
HR25.03.2015
IT25.03.2015
LT25.03.2015
LV25.03.2015
MC25.03.2015
NL25.03.2015
PL25.03.2015
RO25.03.2015
SE25.03.2015
SI25.03.2015
SK25.03.2015
GR26.06.2015
IS25.07.2015
PT27.07.2015
IE03.08.2015
LU03.08.2015
CH31.08.2015
LI31.08.2015
Former [2016/24]AT25.03.2015
CZ25.03.2015
EE25.03.2015
ES25.03.2015
FI25.03.2015
HR25.03.2015
IT25.03.2015
LT25.03.2015
LV25.03.2015
MC25.03.2015
NL25.03.2015
PL25.03.2015
RO25.03.2015
SE25.03.2015
SI25.03.2015
SK25.03.2015
GR26.06.2015
IS25.07.2015
PT27.07.2015
LU03.08.2015
CH31.08.2015
LI31.08.2015
Former [2016/22]AT25.03.2015
CZ25.03.2015
EE25.03.2015
ES25.03.2015
FI25.03.2015
HR25.03.2015
IT25.03.2015
LT25.03.2015
LV25.03.2015
MC25.03.2015
NL25.03.2015
PL25.03.2015
RO25.03.2015
SE25.03.2015
SK25.03.2015
GR26.06.2015
IS25.07.2015
PT27.07.2015
LU03.08.2015
CH31.08.2015
LI31.08.2015
Former [2016/21]AT25.03.2015
CZ25.03.2015
EE25.03.2015
ES25.03.2015
FI25.03.2015
HR25.03.2015
IT25.03.2015
LT25.03.2015
LV25.03.2015
MC25.03.2015
NL25.03.2015
PL25.03.2015
RO25.03.2015
SE25.03.2015
SK25.03.2015
GR26.06.2015
IS25.07.2015
PT27.07.2015
LU03.08.2015
Former [2016/18]AT25.03.2015
CZ25.03.2015
EE25.03.2015
ES25.03.2015
FI25.03.2015
HR25.03.2015
LT25.03.2015
LV25.03.2015
MC25.03.2015
NL25.03.2015
PL25.03.2015
RO25.03.2015
SE25.03.2015
SK25.03.2015
GR26.06.2015
IS25.07.2015
PT27.07.2015
LU03.08.2015
Former [2016/17]AT25.03.2015
CZ25.03.2015
EE25.03.2015
ES25.03.2015
FI25.03.2015
HR25.03.2015
LT25.03.2015
LV25.03.2015
NL25.03.2015
PL25.03.2015
RO25.03.2015
SE25.03.2015
SK25.03.2015
GR26.06.2015
IS25.07.2015
PT27.07.2015
LU03.08.2015
Former [2015/51]AT25.03.2015
CZ25.03.2015
EE25.03.2015
ES25.03.2015
FI25.03.2015
HR25.03.2015
LT25.03.2015
LV25.03.2015
NL25.03.2015
PL25.03.2015
RO25.03.2015
SE25.03.2015
SK25.03.2015
GR26.06.2015
IS25.07.2015
PT27.07.2015
Former [2015/50]CZ25.03.2015
EE25.03.2015
ES25.03.2015
FI25.03.2015
HR25.03.2015
LT25.03.2015
LV25.03.2015
NL25.03.2015
PL25.03.2015
RO25.03.2015
SE25.03.2015
SK25.03.2015
GR26.06.2015
IS25.07.2015
PT27.07.2015
Former [2015/49]CZ25.03.2015
EE25.03.2015
ES25.03.2015
FI25.03.2015
HR25.03.2015
LT25.03.2015
LV25.03.2015
NL25.03.2015
RO25.03.2015
SE25.03.2015
SK25.03.2015
GR26.06.2015
PT27.07.2015
Former [2015/41]FI25.03.2015
HR25.03.2015
LT25.03.2015
LV25.03.2015
NL25.03.2015
SE25.03.2015
GR26.06.2015
Former [2015/39]FI25.03.2015
HR25.03.2015
LT25.03.2015
LV25.03.2015
SE25.03.2015
GR26.06.2015
Former [2015/37]FI25.03.2015
HR25.03.2015
LT25.03.2015
SE25.03.2015
GR26.06.2015
Former [2015/36]FI25.03.2015
HR25.03.2015
LT25.03.2015
SE25.03.2015
Former [2015/35]LT25.03.2015
Cited inInternational search[X]US2004234426  (REDDY SATISH [US], et al) [X] 1-3,8,9,12,14 * paragraphs [0026] - [0028]; figures 3,5 *;
 [A]US4524056  (BANQUY DAVID [FR]) [A] 1-14 * column 8, line 4 - line 16; figure 2c; claim - *;
 [A]EP0282165  (AIR PROD & CHEM [US]) [A] 1-14 * claims 1,7 *;
 [A]EP1700823  (AMMONIA CASALE SA [CH]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *;
 [AD]EP0770578  (KELLOGG M W CO [US]) [AD] 1-14 * the whole document *
by applicantUS2004234426
 US4524056
OppositionEP2284125
 US4479925
 US4548618
 US5736116
 US2004234426
 FR1274934
 US5180570
 US2865864
    - K. AIKA et al., Ammonia, Catalysis and Manufacture, (19950000), pages 202 - 304, XP055289243
    - J. E. ARREGGER, "Production and Purification of Argon", Chemical and Process Engineering, (19641000), pages 549 - 554, XP009122893
    - W. H. ISALSKI, Separation of gases, pages 81-101,1 - 176-183, XP055289897
    - H. SPRINGMANN, "Methods for argon recovery to meet increased demand on the argon market", Cryogenic Processes and Equipment, (19820000), pages 12 - 17, XP009122894