Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2456994

EP2456994 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING A FRICTION LINING AND FRICTION LINING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  17.05.2013
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Schaeffler Technologies AG & Co. KG
Industriestrasse 1-3
91074 Herzogenaurach / DE
[2015/10]
Former [2014/12]For all designated states
Schaeffler Technologies GmbH & Co. KG
Industriestrasse 1-3
91074 Herzogenaurach / DE
Former [2012/22]For all designated states
Schaeffler Technologies AG & Co. KG
Industriestrasse 1-3
91074 Herzogenaurach / DE
Inventor(s)01 / RUNGE, Oliver
Burgkapelle 2
51570 Alt-Windeck / DE
02 / SPANDERN, Christian
Höhenweg 26d
57578 Elkenroth / DE
03 / WEYEL, Thorsten
Hofacker 8
56459 Willmenrod / DE
 [2012/22]
Representative(s)DTS Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schnekenbühl und Partner mbB
Marstallstrasse 8
80539 München / DE
[N/P]
Application number, filing date10742409.529.06.2010
WO2010DE00744
Priority number, dateDE2009103439523.07.2009         Original published format: DE102009034395
[2012/22]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2011009427
Date:27.01.2011
Language:DE
[2011/04]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2456994
Date:30.05.2012
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.01.2011
[2012/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2456994
Date:19.06.2013
Language:DE
[2013/25]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.01.2011
ClassificationInternational:F16D69/04, F16D13/64
[2012/22]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/22]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES REIBBELAGS UND REIBBELAG[2012/22]
English:METHOD FOR PRODUCING A FRICTION LINING AND FRICTION LINING[2012/22]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE RÉALISATION D'UNE GARNITURE DE FRICTION, ET GARNITURE DE FRICTION CORRESPONDANTE[2012/22]
Entry into regional phase23.02.2012National basic fee paid 
23.02.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
23.02.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.02.2012Examination requested  [2012/22]
16.07.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.02.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.05.2013Fee for grant paid
02.05.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  07.02.2013
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  19.03.2014  11.04.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Valeo Matériaux de Friction
Zone Industrielle Nord
Rue Thimonnier
87020 Limoges / FR
Opponent's representative
Cardon, Nicolas
Valeo Embrayages
Sce Propriété Intellectuelle
Le Delta
14, avenue des Béguines
95892 Cergy Pontoise Cedex / FR
 [N/P]
Former [2016/38]
Opponent(s)01  19.03.2014  11.04.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Valeo Matériaux de Friction
Zone Industrielle Nord
Rue Thimonier
87020 Limoges / FR
Opponent's representative
Cardon, Nicolas
Valeo Embrayages
Sce Propriété Intellectuelle
14 Avenue des Béguines
95892 Cergy Pontoise Cedex / FR
Former [2014/19]
Opponent(s)01  19.03.2014   
Valeo Matériaux de Friction
Zone Industrielle Nord
Rue Thimonier
87020 Limoges / FR
Opponent's representative
Tran, Chi-Hai
Valeo Transmissions
Service Propriété Intellectuelle
14 avenue des Béguines
Immeuble Le Delta
95892 Cergy Pontoise Cedex / FR
25.04.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
18.08.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
11.04.2016Date of oral proceedings
06.06.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
06.06.2016Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition27.06.2016Appeal received No.  T1509/16
16.09.2016Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU29.06.2010
AL19.06.2013
CY19.06.2013
CZ19.06.2013
DK19.06.2013
EE19.06.2013
FI19.06.2013
HR19.06.2013
IT19.06.2013
LT19.06.2013
LV19.06.2013
MC19.06.2013
MK19.06.2013
MT19.06.2013
NL19.06.2013
PL19.06.2013
RO19.06.2013
SE19.06.2013
SI19.06.2013
SK19.06.2013
SM19.06.2013
TR19.06.2013
IE29.06.2013
LU29.06.2013
BE30.06.2013
BG19.09.2013
NO19.09.2013
GR20.09.2013
ES30.09.2013
IS19.10.2013
PT21.10.2013
GB29.06.2014
CH30.06.2014
LI30.06.2014
AT29.06.2015
[2018/46]
Former [2016/50]HU29.06.2010
CY19.06.2013
CZ19.06.2013
DK19.06.2013
EE19.06.2013
FI19.06.2013
HR19.06.2013
IT19.06.2013
LT19.06.2013
LV19.06.2013
MC19.06.2013
MK19.06.2013
MT19.06.2013
NL19.06.2013
PL19.06.2013
RO19.06.2013
SE19.06.2013
SI19.06.2013
SK19.06.2013
SM19.06.2013
TR19.06.2013
IE29.06.2013
LU29.06.2013
BE30.06.2013
BG19.09.2013
NO19.09.2013
GR20.09.2013
ES30.09.2013
IS19.10.2013
PT21.10.2013
GB29.06.2014
CH30.06.2014
LI30.06.2014
AT29.06.2015
Former [2015/34]HU29.06.2010
CY19.06.2013
CZ19.06.2013
DK19.06.2013
EE19.06.2013
FI19.06.2013
HR19.06.2013
IT19.06.2013
LT19.06.2013
LV19.06.2013
MC19.06.2013
MK19.06.2013
MT19.06.2013
NL19.06.2013
PL19.06.2013
RO19.06.2013
SE19.06.2013
SI19.06.2013
SK19.06.2013
SM19.06.2013
TR19.06.2013
IE29.06.2013
LU29.06.2013
BE30.06.2013
BG19.09.2013
NO19.09.2013
GR20.09.2013
ES30.09.2013
IS19.10.2013
PT21.10.2013
GB29.06.2014
CH30.06.2014
LI30.06.2014
Former [2015/32]CY19.06.2013
CZ19.06.2013
DK19.06.2013
EE19.06.2013
FI19.06.2013
HR19.06.2013
IT19.06.2013
LT19.06.2013
LV19.06.2013
MC19.06.2013
MK19.06.2013
MT19.06.2013
NL19.06.2013
PL19.06.2013
RO19.06.2013
SE19.06.2013
SI19.06.2013
SK19.06.2013
SM19.06.2013
TR19.06.2013
IE29.06.2013
BE30.06.2013
BG19.09.2013
NO19.09.2013
GR20.09.2013
ES30.09.2013
IS19.10.2013
PT21.10.2013
GB29.06.2014
CH30.06.2014
LI30.06.2014
Former [2015/24]CY19.06.2013
CZ19.06.2013
DK19.06.2013
EE19.06.2013
FI19.06.2013
HR19.06.2013
IT19.06.2013
LT19.06.2013
LV19.06.2013
MC19.06.2013
MT19.06.2013
NL19.06.2013
PL19.06.2013
RO19.06.2013
SE19.06.2013
SI19.06.2013
SK19.06.2013
SM19.06.2013
IE29.06.2013
BE30.06.2013
BG19.09.2013
NO19.09.2013
GR20.09.2013
ES30.09.2013
IS19.10.2013
PT21.10.2013
GB29.06.2014
CH30.06.2014
LI30.06.2014
Former [2015/20]CY19.06.2013
CZ19.06.2013
DK19.06.2013
EE19.06.2013
FI19.06.2013
HR19.06.2013
IT19.06.2013
LT19.06.2013
LV19.06.2013
MC19.06.2013
MT19.06.2013
NL19.06.2013
PL19.06.2013
RO19.06.2013
SE19.06.2013
SI19.06.2013
SK19.06.2013
IE29.06.2013
BE30.06.2013
BG19.09.2013
NO19.09.2013
GR20.09.2013
ES30.09.2013
IS19.10.2013
PT21.10.2013
CH30.06.2014
LI30.06.2014
Former [2015/13]CY19.06.2013
CZ19.06.2013
DK19.06.2013
EE19.06.2013
FI19.06.2013
HR19.06.2013
IT19.06.2013
LT19.06.2013
LV19.06.2013
MC19.06.2013
MT19.06.2013
NL19.06.2013
PL19.06.2013
RO19.06.2013
SE19.06.2013
SI19.06.2013
SK19.06.2013
IE29.06.2013
BE30.06.2013
BG19.09.2013
NO19.09.2013
GR20.09.2013
ES30.09.2013
IS19.10.2013
PT21.10.2013
Former [2014/24]CY19.06.2013
CZ19.06.2013
DK19.06.2013
EE19.06.2013
FI19.06.2013
HR19.06.2013
IT19.06.2013
LT19.06.2013
LV19.06.2013
MC19.06.2013
NL19.06.2013
PL19.06.2013
RO19.06.2013
SE19.06.2013
SI19.06.2013
SK19.06.2013
IE29.06.2013
BE30.06.2013
BG19.09.2013
NO19.09.2013
GR20.09.2013
ES30.09.2013
IS19.10.2013
PT21.10.2013
Former [2014/21]CY19.06.2013
CZ19.06.2013
DK19.06.2013
EE19.06.2013
FI19.06.2013
HR19.06.2013
LT19.06.2013
LV19.06.2013
MC19.06.2013
NL19.06.2013
PL19.06.2013
RO19.06.2013
SE19.06.2013
SI19.06.2013
SK19.06.2013
IE29.06.2013
BE30.06.2013
BG19.09.2013
NO19.09.2013
GR20.09.2013
ES30.09.2013
IS19.10.2013
PT21.10.2013
Former [2014/20]CY19.06.2013
CZ19.06.2013
EE19.06.2013
FI19.06.2013
HR19.06.2013
LT19.06.2013
LV19.06.2013
MC19.06.2013
NL19.06.2013
PL19.06.2013
RO19.06.2013
SE19.06.2013
SI19.06.2013
SK19.06.2013
IE29.06.2013
BE30.06.2013
BG19.09.2013
NO19.09.2013
GR20.09.2013
ES30.09.2013
IS19.10.2013
PT21.10.2013
Former [2014/18]CY19.06.2013
CZ19.06.2013
EE19.06.2013
FI19.06.2013
HR19.06.2013
LT19.06.2013
LV19.06.2013
MC19.06.2013
NL19.06.2013
PL19.06.2013
RO19.06.2013
SE19.06.2013
SI19.06.2013
SK19.06.2013
BE30.06.2013
BG19.09.2013
NO19.09.2013
GR20.09.2013
ES30.09.2013
IS19.10.2013
PT21.10.2013
Former [2014/16]CZ19.06.2013
EE19.06.2013
FI19.06.2013
HR19.06.2013
LT19.06.2013
LV19.06.2013
MC19.06.2013
NL19.06.2013
PL19.06.2013
RO19.06.2013
SE19.06.2013
SI19.06.2013
SK19.06.2013
CY28.08.2013
BG19.09.2013
NO19.09.2013
GR20.09.2013
ES30.09.2013
IS19.10.2013
PT21.10.2013
Former [2014/14]CZ19.06.2013
EE19.06.2013
FI19.06.2013
HR19.06.2013
LT19.06.2013
LV19.06.2013
NL19.06.2013
PL19.06.2013
RO19.06.2013
SE19.06.2013
SI19.06.2013
SK19.06.2013
CY28.08.2013
BG19.09.2013
NO19.09.2013
GR20.09.2013
ES30.09.2013
IS19.10.2013
PT21.10.2013
Former [2014/11]CZ19.06.2013
EE19.06.2013
FI19.06.2013
HR19.06.2013
LT19.06.2013
LV19.06.2013
PL19.06.2013
RO19.06.2013
SE19.06.2013
SI19.06.2013
SK19.06.2013
CY28.08.2013
BG19.09.2013
NO19.09.2013
GR20.09.2013
ES30.09.2013
IS19.10.2013
PT21.10.2013
Former [2014/10]CZ19.06.2013
EE19.06.2013
FI19.06.2013
HR19.06.2013
LT19.06.2013
LV19.06.2013
SE19.06.2013
SI19.06.2013
SK19.06.2013
CY28.08.2013
BG19.09.2013
NO19.09.2013
GR20.09.2013
ES30.09.2013
IS19.10.2013
PT21.10.2013
Former [2014/08]FI19.06.2013
HR19.06.2013
LT19.06.2013
LV19.06.2013
SE19.06.2013
SI19.06.2013
BG19.09.2013
NO19.09.2013
GR20.09.2013
ES30.09.2013
PT21.10.2013
Former [2014/02]FI19.06.2013
HR19.06.2013
LT19.06.2013
LV19.06.2013
SE19.06.2013
SI19.06.2013
BG19.09.2013
NO19.09.2013
GR20.09.2013
ES30.09.2013
Former [2013/51]FI19.06.2013
HR19.06.2013
LT19.06.2013
SE19.06.2013
SI19.06.2013
BG19.09.2013
NO19.09.2013
GR20.09.2013
ES30.09.2013
Former [2013/50]FI19.06.2013
LT19.06.2013
SE19.06.2013
SI19.06.2013
BG19.09.2013
NO19.09.2013
GR20.09.2013
ES30.09.2013
Former [2013/49]FI19.06.2013
LT19.06.2013
SE19.06.2013
SI19.06.2013
NO19.09.2013
GR20.09.2013
ES30.09.2013
Former [2013/48]LT19.06.2013
NO19.09.2013
ES30.09.2013
Former [2013/47]LT19.06.2013
NO19.09.2013
Cited inInternational search[X]DE4431642  (LUK LAMELLEN & KUPPLUNGSBAU [DE]) [X] 1,3,4,11-13 * column 9, line 2 - line 43; figure 4 *;
 [X]DE19626688  (LUK LAMELLEN & KUPPLUNGSBAU [DE]) [X] 1,3,4,11-13 * claim 16 *;
 [AP]WO2009147332  (VALEO MATERIAUX DE FRICTION [FR], et al) [AP] 1,2,12,13 * page 1, line 16 - line 21; figure - * * page 4, line 6 - line 21 *
by applicantDE102005003507
OppositionDE4431642
 FR2736695
 WO2009147332
 US2002134770
 US6013696
 EP1319860
 US4920994
 DE102004049825
 US4898650
 WO9930844
 US4752668
 FR2907863
 FR2821398
 FR2772851
 DE3643274