Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2464625

EP2464625 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING DIISOCYANATES BY GAS-PHASE PHOSGENATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  23.12.2016
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.12.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 25.01.2017  [2017/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BASF SE
Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/25]For all designated states
BASF SE
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / MATTKE, Torsten
Reiboldstraße 14D
67251 Freinsheim / DE
02 / OLBERT, Gerhard
Frankenweg 11
69221 Dossenheim / DE
03 / KNÖSCHE, Carsten
Am Gutenbrunnen 25
67150 Niederkirchen / DE
04 / SCHELLING, Heiner
Weisenheimer Str. 1
67281 Kirchheim / DE
 [2012/25]
Representative(s)Reitstötter Kinzebach
Patentanwälte
Im Zollhof 1
67061 Ludwigshafen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/10]Reitstötter - Kinzebach
Patentanwälte
Im Zollhof 1
67061 Ludwigshafen / DE
Former [2012/40]Kern, Hedwig
RKP
Ludwigsplatz 4
67059 Ludwigshafen / DE
Former [2012/25]Kern, Hedwig
Ellwanger und Kern Patentanwälte Friedrichsplatz 9
68165 Mannheim / DE
Application number, filing date10742484.810.08.2010
WO2010EP61574
Priority number, dateEP2009016760411.08.2009         Original published format: EP 09167604
[2012/25]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2011018443
Date:17.02.2011
Language:DE
[2011/07]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2464625
Date:20.06.2012
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.02.2011
[2012/25]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.04.2011
ClassificationInternational:C07C263/10
[2012/25]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/25]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON DIISOCYANATEN DURCH GASPHASENPHOSGENIERUNG[2012/25]
English:METHOD FOR PRODUCING DIISOCYANATES BY GAS-PHASE PHOSGENATION[2012/25]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE DIISOCYANATES PAR PHOSGÉNATION EN PHASE GAZEUSE[2012/25]
Entry into regional phase08.03.2012National basic fee paid 
08.03.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
08.03.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.06.2011Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
08.03.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.03.2012Examination requested  [2012/25]
07.02.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.02.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.12.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.04.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.02.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.08.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/04]
21.09.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2017/04]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  07.02.2014
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
01.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
31.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.201203   M06   Fee paid on   07.09.2012
31.08.201607   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[Y]EP1935875  (BAYER MATERIALSCIENCE AG [DE]) [Y] 1-8 * Anspruch 1; Absatz [0001], [0027]- [0032], Beispiele 1,2 *;
 [Y]WO2008125236  (BAYER MATERIALSCIENCE AG [DE], et al) [Y] 1-8 * Seite 3, Zeile 30 - Seite 4, Zeile 9; Seite 5, Zeile 18 - Seite 7, Zeile 31; Fig. 1, Beispiel 1 *;
 [Y]WO9711026  (UNIV SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA [US], et al) [Y] 1-8 * Ansprüche 1,3; Seite 4, Zeile 27 - Seite 5, Zeile 2; Seite 6, Zeile 34 - Seite 7, Zeile 4; Fig. 3 *;
 [Y]WO2007085476  (BASF AG [DE], et al) [Y] 1-8 * Seite 13, Zeilen 15-21; Fig. 1 *;
 [Y]US4959202  (MINET RONALD G [US], et al) [Y] 1-8 * Spalte 3, Zeilen 26-34; Fig. 1 *;
 [A]WO2008055899  (BASF SE [DE], et al) [A] 1-8 * Anspruch 1; Seite 5, Zeilen 14-19 *
by applicantEP1935875
 WO2008125236
 WO9711026
 WO2007085476
 US4959202