blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2464625 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2464625



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 186
21.12.2016 Closing of application Search / examination 1
06.10.2016 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
21.09.2016 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
27.07.2016 Confirmation of revocation of automatic debit order Search / examination 1
21.07.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
21.07.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
21.07.2016 Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure Search / examination 1
28.06.2016 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
23.06.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
23.06.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
23.06.2016 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
03.03.2016 CDS Clean up - amended applicant details Search / examination 1
03.03.2016 Request for change of address - applicant Search / examination 3
15.02.2016 Annex to a communication Search / examination 1
15.02.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
15.02.2016 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
23.04.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
23.04.2015 Claims Search / examination 1
23.04.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
23.04.2015 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
16.12.2014 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
16.12.2014 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
16.05.2014 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
17.02.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
17.02.2014 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 2
17.02.2014 Description Search / examination 2
17.02.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
17.02.2014 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
07.02.2014 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
07.02.2014 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
04.02.2014 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
30.01.2014 Document concerning representation Search / examination 14
30.01.2014 Document concerning representation Search / examination 14
05.09.2012 Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure Search / examination 1
31.08.2012 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
14.08.2012 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
27.07.2012 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 2
19.07.2012 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
23.05.2012 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
12.04.2012 Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
04.04.2012 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
08.03.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
08.03.2012 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 1
08.03.2012 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 1
08.03.2012 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 1
08.03.2012 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
22.02.2012 Annexes to the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 1
22.02.2012 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 6
21.12.2011 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
04.10.2011 Annex to International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
04.10.2011 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
04.10.2011 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
04.10.2011 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
04.10.2011 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
04.10.2011 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
04.10.2011 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
04.10.2011 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
04.10.2011 Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
11.07.2011 Notification of election of EPO Search / examination 1
17.06.2011 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
17.06.2011 Notification of receipt of demand PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
10.06.2011 Document concerning representation PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
10.06.2011 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
10.06.2011 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
10.06.2011 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
09.06.2011 Document concerning fees and payments PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
09.06.2011 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
09.06.2011 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
21.04.2011 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
21.04.2011 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
21.04.2011 International publication of the international search report Search / examination 1
10.03.2011 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 11
17.02.2011 International publication of the A2 Pamphlet Search / examination 8
08.02.2011 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
08.02.2011 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
08.02.2011 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
02.11.2010 Notification of the recording of a change PCT receiving Office 1
10.08.2010 (Electronic) Receipt PCT receiving Office 2
10.08.2010 Abstract PCT receiving Office 1
10.08.2010 Claims PCT receiving Office 2
10.08.2010 Description PCT receiving Office 5
10.08.2010 Priority document (RO-procedure) PCT receiving Office 10