blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2464625


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
23.12.2016 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  25.01.2017  [2017/04]
08.10.2016 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
20.09.2016 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
24.06.2016 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
19.02.2016 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
04.09.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
24.04.2015 New entry: Reply to examination report
26.12.2014 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
04.09.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
20.02.2014 New entry: Reply to examination report
07.02.2014 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
07.02.2014 First examination report
31.01.2014 Change - representative published on  05.03.2014  [2014/10]
06.09.2013 New entry: Renewal fee paid
12.10.2012 Change - extension states published on  14.11.2012  [2012/46]
11.09.2012 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
11.09.2012 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee
31.08.2012 Change - representative published on  03.10.2012  [2012/40]
18.05.2012 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  20.06.2012  [2012/25]
18.05.2012 Request for examination filed published on  20.06.2012  [2012/25]
19.03.2012 PCT data prior to European publication
19.03.2012 Amendment by applicant
01.07.2011 PCT data prior to European publication
22.04.2011 PCT data prior to European publication
02.03.2011 PCT data prior to European publication
18.02.2011 PCT data prior to European publication
24.08.2010 PCT data prior to European publication