blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2464625 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201080035435 EP10742484



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US8716517Global Dossier 06.05.2014B2
US2012142959 07.06.2012A1
Priority number Date
EP09167604 11.08.2009
WO2010EP61574 10.08.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP5666584BGlobal Dossier 12.02.2015B2
JP2013501747 17.01.2013A
Priority number Date
EP09167604 11.08.2009
WO2010EP61574 10.08.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN102471243Global Dossier 23.05.2012A
Priority number Date
EP09167604 11.08.2009
WO2010EP61574 10.08.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2464625Global Dossier 20.06.2012A2
Priority number Date
EP09167604 11.08.2009
EP10742484 10.08.2010
WO2010EP61574 10.08.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BR112012002910 05.04.2016A2
Priority number Date
EP09167604 11.08.2009
WO2010EP61574 10.08.2010
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2011018443Global Dossier 21.04.2011A3
WO2011018443 17.02.2011A2
Priority number Date
EP09167604 11.08.2009
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
KR20120041257Global Dossier 30.04.2012A
Priority number Date
EP09167604 11.08.2009