blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2467487 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

EP09167980 EP10742507



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US8975468Global Dossier 10.03.2015B2
US2012222151 30.08.2012A1
Priority number Date
EP09167980 17.08.2009
WO2010EP61858 13.08.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR20120060852Global Dossier 12.06.2012A
Priority number Date
EP09167980 17.08.2009
WO2010EP61858 13.08.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2013502210Global Dossier 24.01.2013A
Priority number Date
EP09167980 17.08.2009
WO2010EP61858 13.08.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2467487Global Dossier 31.07.2019B1
EP2467487 27.06.2012A2
Priority number Date
EP09167980 17.08.2009
WO2010EP61858 13.08.2010
EP10742507 13.08.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2010284996B 21.04.2016B2
AU2010284996 16.02.2012A1
Priority number Date
EP09167980 17.08.2009
WO2010EP61858 13.08.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2769493 24.02.2011A1
Priority number Date
EP09167980 17.08.2009
WO2010EP61858 13.08.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
MA33587 01.09.2012B1
Priority number Date
EP09167980 17.08.2009
WO2010EP61858 13.08.2010
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2011020797Global Dossier 14.04.2011A3
WO2011020797 24.02.2011A2
Priority number Date
EP09167980 17.08.2009
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP2292774Global Dossier 09.03.2011A1
Priority number Date
EP09167980 17.08.2009
TypeType Divisional application