Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2460282

EP2460282 - METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR BLIND INTERFERENCE REDUCTION TECHNIQUES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  16.05.2014
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.07.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Qualcomm Incorporated
Attn: International IP Administration 5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121 / US
[2012/23]
Inventor(s)01 / FAN, Zhifei
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego California 92121 / US
02 / XU, Hao
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego California 92121 / US
 [2012/23]
Representative(s)Wegner, Hans
Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte
Prinzregentenplatz 7
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/23]Wegner, Hans
Bardehle Pagenberg
Prinzregentenplatz 7
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date10742947.429.07.2010
WO2010US43797
Priority number, dateUS20090229699P29.07.2009         Original published format: US 229699 P
US2010084468227.07.2010         Original published format: US 844682
[2012/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2011014709
Date:03.02.2011
Language:EN
[2011/05]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2460282
Date:06.06.2012
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.02.2011
[2012/23]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP03.02.2011
ClassificationInternational:H04B1/707, H04L25/03
[2012/23]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/23]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG FÜR BLINDE NTEREFERENZREDUKTION[2012/23]
English:METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR BLIND INTERFERENCE REDUCTION TECHNIQUES[2012/23]
French:PROCÉDÉS ET APPAREIL POUR TECHNIQUES DE RÉDUCTION D INTERFÉRENCE AVEUGLE[2012/23]
Entry into regional phase31.01.2012National basic fee paid 
31.01.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
31.01.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure31.01.2012Examination requested  [2012/23]
17.08.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.01.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.05.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.11.2015Date of oral proceedings
26.11.2015Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
26.11.2015Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination21.01.2016Appeal received No.  T0733/16
07.03.2016Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  03.01.2014
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.06.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
08.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
08.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
09.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
11.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
10.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
09.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 09
09.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 10
Cited inInternational search[Y]US2002027957  (PAULRAJ AROGYASWAMI J [US] ET AL PAULRAJ AROGYASWAMI J [US] ET AL) [Y] 1-72 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0066] * * paragraph [0078] - paragraph [0086]; figure 7 *;
 [Y]  - BIN HU ET AL, "Time-and Frequency-Domain-Spread Generalized Multicarrier DS-CDMA Using Subspace-Based Blind and Group-Blind Spaceâ Time Multiuser Detection", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US LNKD- DOI:10.1109/TVT.2008.917231, (20080901), vol. 57, no. 5, ISSN 0018-9545, pages 3235 - 3241, XP011224868 [Y] 1-72 * sections I-IV *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TVT.2008.917231
 [I]  - Jae-Chon Yu, "Group-Blind Multiuser Detection for CDMA Systems", THE UNIVERSITY OF CALGARY, (20010101), Masters Thesis, DEPARTMENT OF ELECTRICAL AND COMPUTER ENGINEERING, CALGARY, ALBERTA, CANADA, URL: http://dspace1.acs.ucalgary.ca/bitstream/1880/40698/1/65014Yu.pdf, (20101007), XP002604526 [I] 1-72 * sections 2.4, 2.6, 3.1, 3.4, 3.5, 4.4, 4.5, 5.1-5.3 and 6.1;; figure 5.1 *