Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2399023

EP2399023 - DIRECT DRIVE ROTARY WAVE ENERGY CONVERSION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  07.10.2016
Database last updated on 25.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip17.02.2017Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 22.03.2017  [2017/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Columbia Power Technologies, Inc.
236 East High Street
Charlottesville VA 22902 / US
[2015/20]
Former [2011/52]For all designated states
Columbia Power Technologies
236 East High Street
Charlottesville, VA 22902 / US
Inventor(s)01 / RHINEFRANK, Kenneth
7740 NW Hood View Circle
Corvalis, OR 97330 / US
02 / LAMB, Bradford
C/o Columbia Power Technologies
236 East High Street
Charlottesville, VA 22902 / US
03 / PRUDELL, Joseph
3060 NW Garfield Ave.
Corvalis, OR 97330 / US
04 / SCHACHER, Alphonse
2872 SE Park Place
Corvalis, OR 97333 / US
 [2011/52]
Representative(s)Studio Torta S.p.A.
Via Viotti, 9
10121 Torino / IT
[2016/45]
Former [2011/52]Bongiovanni, Simone , et al
Studio Torta S.p.A.
Via Viotti, 9
10121 Torino / IT
Application number, filing date10744077.822.02.2010
[2016/45]
WO2010US00505
Priority number, dateUS20090202351P20.02.2009         Original published format: US 202351 P
[2011/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2010096195
Date:26.08.2010
Language:EN
[2010/34]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2399023
Date:28.12.2011
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.08.2010
[2011/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2399023
Date:09.11.2016
Language:EN
[2016/45]
International and Supplementary
search report(s)
International search report -
published on:
US26.08.2010
Supplementary European search report -
dispatched on:
EP08.03.2013
ClassificationInternational:F03B13/12, F03B13/20, F03B13/26
[2016/22]
Former International [2013/15]F03B13/12, F03B13/20
Former International [2011/52]F03B13/12
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/52]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:UMWANDLUNG DER ENERGIE AUS DIREKTANTRIEBS-DREHWELLEN[2011/52]
English:DIRECT DRIVE ROTARY WAVE ENERGY CONVERSION[2011/52]
French:CONVERSION À ENTRAÎNEMENT DIRECT DE L'ÉNERGIE DES VAGUES EN ROTATION[2011/52]
Entry into regional phase19.08.2011National basic fee paid 
19.08.2011Search fee paid 
19.08.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
19.08.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.08.2011Examination requested  [2011/52]
07.10.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.05.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.12.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.05.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.09.2016Fee for grant paid
20.09.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
20.09.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP16195026.6  / EP3141741
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  28.05.2015
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
27.02.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
27.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
26.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
26.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipLV09.11.2016
[2017/12]
Documents cited:Search[I]WO2008063086  (IND RES LTD [NZ], et al) [I] 1-18 * the whole document *;
 [IA]JPH11187609  (TAKASAKI KATSUYA) [I] 1-8,12-18 * the whole document * [A] 9-11;
 [IA]JP2006226274  (FUJISATO TETSUHIKO, et al) [I] 1-9,12-18 * the whole document * [A] 10,11;
 [A]US4319454  (LUCIA LOUIS V) [A] 1-18 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2006208494  (COOK GLEN E [US]) [A] 1-18 * the whole document *
International search[Y]US4389843  (LAMBERTI JOHN [US]);
 [Y]US2007266704  (BULL DIANA [US], et al);
 [Y]WO2008014584  (CLEAN CURRENT POWER SYSTEMS INC [CA], et al);
 [Y]US4179886  (TSUBOTA JUNJIRO [JP]);
 [Y]US4608497  (BOYCE PETER F [US])
 [Y]  - SHRESTHA, G. ET AL., "Direct Drive Wind Turbine Generator with Magnetic Bearing", PROCEEDINGS OF THE EUROPEAN OFFSHORE WIND CONFERENCE AND EXHIBITION, BERLIN, GERMANY, (20071204), URL: http://www.eow2007proceedings.info/allfiles2/194_Eow2007fullpaper.pdf, (20100405),
by applicant   WO2008063086 A2 20080529