Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2399023 RSS: dossier

Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 548
13.09.2017 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
09.11.2016 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
13.10.2016 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
20.09.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
20.09.2016 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
20.09.2016 French translation of claims Search / examination 7
20.09.2016 German translation of the claims Search / examination 4
20.09.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
17.05.2016 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
17.05.2016 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
17.05.2016 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
17.05.2016 Text intended for grant Search / examination 25
17.05.2016 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 25
15.04.2016 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
15.03.2016 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 28
07.12.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
07.12.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
07.12.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
07.12.2015 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 1
07.12.2015 Claims Search / examination 3
07.12.2015 Claims Search / examination 3
07.12.2015 Description Search / examination 1
07.12.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
07.12.2015 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
08.09.2015 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
03.09.2015 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
28.05.2015 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
28.05.2015 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
21.05.2015 Examination started Search / examination 1
14.04.2015 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
11.03.2015 Communication concerning corrected entries of the applicant Search / examination 1
11.12.2014 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 1
11.12.2014 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 9
11.12.2014 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 7
11.12.2014 Request for correction of errors in filed documents Search / examination 1
24.10.2014 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
22.08.2014 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 3
22.08.2014 Request for correction of errors in filed documents Search / examination 2
07.10.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
07.10.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
07.10.2013 Reply to Written Opinion prepared by the EPO Search / examination 3
26.03.2013 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
08.03.2013 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
08.03.2013 European search opinion Search / examination 2
08.03.2013 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
30.11.2011 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
14.10.2011 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
04.10.2011 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
07.09.2011 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 7
19.08.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
19.08.2011 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 9
01.07.2011 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
17.09.2010 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 324
26.08.2010 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 1
26.08.2010 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 26