Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2399023


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
17.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.12.2017 [2017/51]
20.10.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.11.2017 [2017/47]
13.10.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.11.2017  [2017/46]
06.10.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.11.2017  [2017/45]
29.09.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.11.2017  [2017/44]
22.09.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.10.2017  [2017/43]
15.09.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.10.2017  [2017/42]
15.09.2017 No opposition filed within time limit published on  18.10.2017  [2017/42]
08.09.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.10.2017  [2017/41]
11.08.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.09.2017  [2017/37]
04.08.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.09.2017  [2017/36]
28.07.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  30.08.2017  [2017/35]
14.07.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.08.2017  [2017/33]
07.07.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  09.08.2017  [2017/32]
30.06.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  02.08.2017  [2017/31]
23.06.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.07.2017  [2017/30]
26.05.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.06.2017  [2017/26]
17.02.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.03.2017  [2017/12]
28.10.2016 Change - divisional application(s) published on  30.11.2016  [2016/48]
07.10.2016 (Expected) grant published on  09.11.2016  [2016/45]
30.09.2016 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
23.09.2016 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
23.09.2016 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
16.05.2016 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
29.04.2016 Change - classification published on  01.06.2016  [2016/22]
29.04.2016 Change - classification published on  01.06.2016  [2016/22]
12.04.2016 Change - representative
01.03.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
11.12.2015 New entry: Reply to examination report
04.09.2015 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
06.06.2015 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
29.05.2015 First examination report published on  01.07.2015  [2015/27]
10.04.2015 Change - applicant published on  13.05.2015  [2015/20]
03.03.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
05.03.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
08.10.2013 Amendment by applicant
08.03.2013 Supplementary search report published on  10.04.2013  [2013/15]
08.03.2013 Change - classification published on  10.04.2013  [2013/15]
08.03.2013 Change - classification published on  10.04.2013  [2013/15]
01.03.2013 New entry: Renewal fee paid
27.04.2012 Change - extension states published on  30.05.2012  [2012/22]
28.02.2012 New entry: Renewal fee paid
25.11.2011 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  28.12.2011  [2011/52]
25.11.2011 Request for examination filed published on  28.12.2011  [2011/52]
30.09.2011 PCT data prior to European publication
07.09.2011 PCT data prior to European publication
10.09.2010 PCT data prior to European publication
27.08.2010 PCT data prior to European publication