Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP2399023

Designated contracting states ATLapse: 09.11.2016
 BELapse: 09.11.2016
 BGLapse: 09.02.2017
 CHLapse: 28.02.2017
CY 
 CZLapse: 09.11.2016
 DE 
 DKLapse: 09.11.2016
 EELapse: 09.11.2016
 ES 
 FILapse: 09.11.2016
 FR 
 GB 
 GRLapse: 10.02.2017
 HRLapse: 09.11.2016
 HU 
 IE 
 ISLapse: 09.03.2017
 ITLapse: 09.11.2016
LILapse: 28.02.2017
 LTLapse: 09.11.2016
 LU 
LVLapse: 09.11.2016
 MCLapse: 09.11.2016
 MK 
MT 
 NLLapse: 09.11.2016
 NO 
 PLLapse: 09.11.2016
 PT 
 ROLapse: 09.11.2016
 SELapse: 09.11.2016
 SILapse: 09.11.2016
 SKLapse: 09.11.2016
 SMLapse: 09.11.2016
 TR 
Examination procedure20.09.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Entry into regional phase19.08.2011National basic fee paid 
19.08.2011Search fee paid 
19.08.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
19.08.2011Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
27.02.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
27.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
26.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
26.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
European patent granted09.11.2016
Opposition procedure10.08.2017No opposition filed within time limit published on 18.10.2017 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:28.12.2011 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20110819
 
Event date:28.12.2011 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK SM TR
 
Event date:30.05.2012 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED
 
Event date:10.04.2013 
Event description:CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)
IPC CLASSIFICATION:F03B 13/12 20060101AFI20130304BHEP
 
Event date:10.04.2013 
Event description:DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT
Effective DATE:20130308
 
Event date:10.04.2013 
Event description:CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)
IPC CLASSIFICATION:F03B 13/20 20060101ALI20130304BHEP
 
Event date:13.05.2015 
Event description:TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION
Owner Name:COLUMBIA POWER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.
 
Event date:01.07.2015 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT
Effective DATE:20150528
 
Event date:01.06.2016 
Event description:CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)
IPC CLASSIFICATION:F03B 13/12 20060101AFI20160428BHEP
 
Event date:01.06.2016 
Event description:CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)
IPC CLASSIFICATION:F03B 13/20 20060101ALI20160428BHEP
 
Event date:01.06.2016 
Event description:CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)
IPC CLASSIFICATION:F03B 13/26 20060101ALI20160428BHEP
 
Event date:15.06.2016 
Event description:ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT
Effective DATE:20160517
 
Event date:09.11.2016 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK SM TR
 
Event date:09.11.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED
 
Event date:15.11.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG AT REF 844164 AT T
Code Expl.:+REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)
Effective DATE:20161115
 
Event date:15.11.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH EP
Code Expl.:+ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE
 
Event date:30.11.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG IE FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND
 
Event date:22.12.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R096 602010037843 DE
Code Expl.:+DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT
 
Event date:08.02.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG PT SC4A 2399023 PT 20170208 T
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE
Free Format Text:AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION
Effective DATE:20170130
 
Event date:23.02.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:8
 
Event date:28.02.2017 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:LV
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20161109
 
Event date:10.03.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG LT MG4D
Code Expl.:-INVALIDATED EUROPEAN PATENT
 
Event date:15.03.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NL MP
Code Expl.:-PATENT VOIDED (INVALID IN THE NETHERLANDS AS NO TRANSLATION HAS BEEN FILED)
Effective DATE:20161109
 
Event date:27.03.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NO T2
Code Expl.:+ENTRY OF EP PATENT INTO NATIONAL PHASE OF NORWAY
Effective DATE:20161109
 
Event date:15.04.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG AT MK05 844164 AT T
Code Expl.:-REVOCATION OF THE TRANSLATION OF THE EP PATENT
Effective DATE:20161109
 
Event date:28.04.2017 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:SE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20161109
 
Event date:28.04.2017 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:GR
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20170210
 
Event date:28.04.2017 
Event description:POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE
Ref Country Code:NO
Payment DATE:20170227
Year of Fee Payment:08
 
Event date:28.04.2017 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:NL
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20161109
 
Event date:28.04.2017 
Event description:POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:20170223
Year of Fee Payment:08
 
Event date:28.04.2017 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:LT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20161109
 
Event date:22.05.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES FG2A 2613040 ES T3
Code Expl.:+DEFINITIVE PROTECTION
Effective DATE:20170522
 
Event date:31.05.2017 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:IS
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20170309
 
Event date:31.05.2017 
Event description:POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20170227
Year of Fee Payment:08
 
Event date:31.05.2017 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:PL
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20161109
 
Event date:31.05.2017 
Event description:POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE
Ref Country Code:IE
Payment DATE:20170228
Year of Fee Payment:08
 
Event date:31.05.2017 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:BE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20170228
 
Event date:31.05.2017 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:HR
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20161109
 
Event date:31.05.2017 
Event description:POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE
Ref Country Code:PT
Payment DATE:20170223
Year of Fee Payment:08
 
Event date:31.05.2017 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:AT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20161109
 
Event date:31.05.2017 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:FI
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20161109
 
Event date:30.06.2017 
Event description:POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE
Ref Country Code:ES
Payment DATE:20170227
Year of Fee Payment:08
 
Event date:31.07.2017 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:SK
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20161109
 
Event date:31.07.2017 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:CZ
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20161109
 
Event date:31.07.2017 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:DK
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20161109
 
Event date:31.07.2017 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:EE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20161109
 
Event date:31.07.2017 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:RO
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20161109
 
Event date:10.08.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R097 602010037843 DE
Code Expl.:+NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION
 
Event date:31.08.2017 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:IT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20161109
 
Event date:31.08.2017 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:BG
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20170209
 
Event date:31.08.2017 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:BE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20161109
 
Event date:31.08.2017 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:SM
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20161109
 
Event date:01.09.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R119 602010037843 DE
Code Expl.:-APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE
 
Event date:29.09.2017 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:MC
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20161109
 
Event date:29.09.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH PL
Code Expl.:-PATENT CEASED
 
Event date:18.10.2017 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED
Effective DATE:20170810
 
Event date:31.10.2017 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:CH
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20170228
 
Event date:31.10.2017 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:LI
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20170228