Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2480606

EP2480606 - PROPYLENE POLYMER COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  25.04.2014
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.07.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Basell Poliolefine Italia S.r.l.
Via Pontaccio 10
20121 Milano / IT
[2018/47]
Former [2013/14]For all designated states
Basell Poliolefine Italia S.r.l.
Via Soperga, 14/A
20127 Milano / IT
Former [2012/31]For all designated states
Basell Poliolefine Italia S.r.l.
Intellectual Property
Via Soperga 14/A
20127 Milano / IT
Inventor(s)01 / GALVAN, Monica
Viale della Stazione 61
I-45030 S. Maria Maddalna (RO) / IT
02 / CIARAFONI, Marco
Via Risorgimento 84
I-44100 Ferrara / IT
03 / COLLINA, Gianni
via XXI Aprile 1945 n° 3
loc. Cassana
I-44044 Ferrara / IT
04 / FUSCO, Ofelia
Via Eligio Mari 61/B
I-44100 Ferrara / IT
05 / PANTALEONI, Roberto
Via Nives Gessi 20
I-44100 Ferrara / IT
06 / MAZZUCCO, Antonio
Via Mac Allister 30
I-44100 Ferrara / IT
 [2012/31]
Representative(s)Sacco, Marco
Basell Poliolefine Italia S.r.l.
Intellectual Property
P.le Donegani, 12
44122 Ferrara / IT
[2014/22]
Former [2012/31]Sacco, Marco
Basell Poliolefine Italia S.r.l. Intellectual Property P.le Donegani, 12
44122 Ferrara / IT
Application number, filing date10745274.026.08.2010
WO2010EP62486
Priority number, dateEP2009017099022.09.2009         Original published format: EP 09170990
US20090277734P29.09.2009         Original published format: US 277734 P
EP2009017619117.11.2009         Original published format: EP 09176191
US20090283225P01.12.2009         Original published format: US 283225 P
[2012/31]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2011036021
Date:31.03.2011
Language:EN
[2011/13]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2480606
Date:01.08.2012
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.03.2011
[2012/31]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2480606
Date:28.05.2014
Language:EN
[2014/22]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP31.03.2011
ClassificationInternational:C08L23/12, C08F2/00
[2014/04]
Former International [2012/31]C08L23/12, C08F297/08
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/31]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:PROPYLENPOLYMERZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN[2012/31]
English:PROPYLENE POLYMER COMPOSITIONS[2012/31]
French:COMPOSITIONS DE POLYMÈRES DU PROPYLÈNE[2012/31]
Entry into regional phase12.03.2012National basic fee paid 
12.03.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
12.03.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.03.2012Examination requested  [2012/31]
27.11.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.01.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.04.2014Fee for grant paid
15.04.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
15.04.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  14.01.2014
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  16.02.2015  19.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Borealis AG
IZD Tower
Wagramerstrasse 17-19
1220 Wien / AT
Opponent's representative
Lux, Berthold, et al
Maiwald Patentanwalts- und
Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Elisenhof
Elisenstraße 3
80335 München / DE
 02  27.02.2015  05.03.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Total Research & Technology Feluy
Zone Industrielle C
7181 Seneffe / BE
Opponent's representative
Raboin, Jean-Christophe, et al
Total Research & Technology Feluy
Zone Industrielle C
7181 Seneffe / BE
 03  27.02.2015  05.03.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Lummus Novolen Technology GmbH
Gottlieb-Daimler-Str. 8
68165 Mannheim / DE
Opponent's representative
Best, Michael, et al
Lederer & Keller
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Unsöldstrasse 2
80538 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2016/08]
Opponent(s)01  16.02.2015  19.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Borealis AG
IZD Tower
Wagramerstrasse 17-19
1220 Wien / AT
Opponent's representative
Lux, Berthold, et al
Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH
Elisenhof
Elisenstraße 3
80335 München / DE
 02  27.02.2015  05.03.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Total Research & Technology Feluy
Zone Industrielle C
7181 Seneffe / BE
Opponent's representative
Raboin, Jean-Christophe, et al
Total Research & Technology Feluy
Zone Industrielle C
7181 Seneffe / BE
 03  27.02.2015  05.03.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Lummus Novolen Technology GmbH
Gottlieb-Daimler-Str. 8
68165 Mannheim / DE
Opponent's representative
Best, Michael, et al
Lederer & Keller
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Unsöldstrasse 2
80538 München / DE
Former [2015/47]
Opponent(s)01  16.02.2015  19.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Borealis AG
IZD Tower
Wagramerstrasse 17-19
1220 Wien / AT
Opponent's representative
Lux, Berthold, et al
Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH
Elisenhof
Elisenstraße 3
80335 München / DE
 02  27.02.2015  05.03.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Total Research & Technology Feluy
Zone Industrielle C
7181 Seneffe / BE
Opponent's representative
Leyder, Francis, et al
Total Research & Technology Feluy
Zone Industrielle C
7181 Seneffe / BE
 03  27.02.2015  05.03.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Lummus Novolen Technology GmbH
Gottlieb-Daimler-Str. 8
68165 Mannheim / DE
Opponent's representative
Best, Michael, et al
Lederer & Keller
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Unsöldstrasse 2
80538 München / DE
Former [2015/15]
Opponent(s)01  16.02.2015  19.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Borealis AG
IZD Tower
Wagramerstrasse 17-19
1220 Wien / AT
Opponent's representative
Lux, Berthold, et al
Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH
Elisenhof
Elisenstraße 3
80335 München / DE
 02  27.02.2015  05.03.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Total Research & Technology Feluy
Zone Industrielle C
7181 Seneffe / BE
Opponent's representative
Leyder, Francis, et al
Total Research & Technology Feluy
Zone Industrielle C
7181 Seneffe / BE
 03  27.02.2015  05.03.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Lummus Novolen Technology GmbH
Gottlieb-Daimler-Str. 8
68165 Mannheim / DE
Opponent's representative
Schiener, Jens, et al
Lederer & Keller
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Unsöldstrasse 2
80538 München / DE
Former [2015/13]
Opponent(s)01  16.02.2015  19.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Borealis AG
IZD Tower
Wagramerstrasse 17-19
1220 Wien / AT
Opponent's representative
Lux, Berthold, et al
Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH
Elisenhof
Elisenstraße 3
80335 München / DE
07.04.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
19.10.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
17.10.2016Date of oral proceedings
29.11.2016Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
29.11.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition02.02.2017Appeal received No.  T0150/17
07.04.2017Statement of grounds filed
18.01.2017Appeal received No.  T0150/17
07.04.2017Statement of grounds filed
17.01.2017Appeal received No.  T0150/17
07.04.2017Statement of grounds filed
16.01.2017Appeal received No.  T0150/17
07.04.2017Statement of grounds filed
06.03.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.08.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
07.08.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU26.08.2010
AL28.05.2014
AT28.05.2014
BE28.05.2014
BG28.05.2014
CY28.05.2014
CZ28.05.2014
DK28.05.2014
EE28.05.2014
ES28.05.2014
FI28.05.2014
GR28.05.2014
HR28.05.2014
IS28.05.2014
IT28.05.2014
LT28.05.2014
LV28.05.2014
MC28.05.2014
MK28.05.2014
MT28.05.2014
NL28.05.2014
PL28.05.2014
RO28.05.2014
SE28.05.2014
SI28.05.2014
SK28.05.2014
SM28.05.2014
TR28.05.2014
IE26.08.2014
LU26.08.2014
GB28.08.2014
NO28.08.2014
CH31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
PT29.09.2014
[2018/46]
Former [2018/30]HU26.08.2010
AT28.05.2014
BE28.05.2014
BG28.05.2014
CY28.05.2014
CZ28.05.2014
DK28.05.2014
EE28.05.2014
ES28.05.2014
FI28.05.2014
GR28.05.2014
HR28.05.2014
IS28.05.2014
IT28.05.2014
LT28.05.2014
LV28.05.2014
MC28.05.2014
MK28.05.2014
MT28.05.2014
NL28.05.2014
PL28.05.2014
RO28.05.2014
SE28.05.2014
SI28.05.2014
SK28.05.2014
SM28.05.2014
TR28.05.2014
IE26.08.2014
LU26.08.2014
GB28.08.2014
NO28.08.2014
CH31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
PT29.09.2014
Former [2016/33]HU26.08.2010
AT28.05.2014
BE28.05.2014
BG28.05.2014
CY28.05.2014
CZ28.05.2014
DK28.05.2014
EE28.05.2014
ES28.05.2014
FI28.05.2014
GR28.05.2014
HR28.05.2014
IS28.05.2014
IT28.05.2014
LT28.05.2014
LV28.05.2014
MC28.05.2014
MT28.05.2014
NL28.05.2014
PL28.05.2014
RO28.05.2014
SE28.05.2014
SI28.05.2014
SK28.05.2014
SM28.05.2014
TR28.05.2014
IE26.08.2014
LU26.08.2014
GB28.08.2014
NO28.08.2014
CH31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
PT29.09.2014
Former [2016/32]HU26.08.2010
AT28.05.2014
BE28.05.2014
BG28.05.2014
CY28.05.2014
CZ28.05.2014
DK28.05.2014
EE28.05.2014
ES28.05.2014
FI28.05.2014
GR28.05.2014
HR28.05.2014
IS28.05.2014
IT28.05.2014
LT28.05.2014
LV28.05.2014
MC28.05.2014
MT28.05.2014
NL28.05.2014
PL28.05.2014
RO28.05.2014
SE28.05.2014
SI28.05.2014
SK28.05.2014
SM28.05.2014
IE26.08.2014
LU26.08.2014
GB28.08.2014
NO28.08.2014
CH31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
PT29.09.2014
Former [2016/31]AT28.05.2014
BE28.05.2014
BG28.05.2014
CY28.05.2014
CZ28.05.2014
DK28.05.2014
EE28.05.2014
ES28.05.2014
FI28.05.2014
GR28.05.2014
HR28.05.2014
IT28.05.2014
LT28.05.2014
LV28.05.2014
MC28.05.2014
MT28.05.2014
NL28.05.2014
PL28.05.2014
RO28.05.2014
SE28.05.2014
SI28.05.2014
SK28.05.2014
SM28.05.2014
IE26.08.2014
LU26.08.2014
GB28.08.2014
NO28.08.2014
CH31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
PT29.09.2014
Former [2016/28]AT28.05.2014
BE28.05.2014
BG28.05.2014
CY28.05.2014
CZ28.05.2014
DK28.05.2014
EE28.05.2014
ES28.05.2014
FI28.05.2014
HR28.05.2014
IT28.05.2014
LT28.05.2014
LV28.05.2014
MC28.05.2014
MT28.05.2014
NL28.05.2014
PL28.05.2014
RO28.05.2014
SE28.05.2014
SI28.05.2014
SK28.05.2014
SM28.05.2014
IE26.08.2014
LU26.08.2014
GB28.08.2014
NO28.08.2014
CH31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
PT29.09.2014
Former [2016/22]AT28.05.2014
BE28.05.2014
CY28.05.2014
CZ28.05.2014
DK28.05.2014
EE28.05.2014
ES28.05.2014
FI28.05.2014
HR28.05.2014
IT28.05.2014
LT28.05.2014
LV28.05.2014
MC28.05.2014
NL28.05.2014
PL28.05.2014
RO28.05.2014
SE28.05.2014
SI28.05.2014
SK28.05.2014
SM28.05.2014
IE26.08.2014
LU26.08.2014
GB28.08.2014
NO28.08.2014
CH31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
PT29.09.2014
Former [2015/37]AT28.05.2014
BE28.05.2014
CY28.05.2014
CZ28.05.2014
DK28.05.2014
EE28.05.2014
ES28.05.2014
FI28.05.2014
HR28.05.2014
IT28.05.2014
LT28.05.2014
LV28.05.2014
MC28.05.2014
NL28.05.2014
PL28.05.2014
RO28.05.2014
SE28.05.2014
SI28.05.2014
SK28.05.2014
IE26.08.2014
LU26.08.2014
GB28.08.2014
NO28.08.2014
CH31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
PT29.09.2014
Former [2015/36]AT28.05.2014
BE28.05.2014
CY28.05.2014
CZ28.05.2014
DK28.05.2014
EE28.05.2014
ES28.05.2014
FI28.05.2014
HR28.05.2014
IT28.05.2014
LT28.05.2014
LV28.05.2014
MC28.05.2014
NL28.05.2014
PL28.05.2014
RO28.05.2014
SE28.05.2014
SI28.05.2014
SK28.05.2014
LU26.08.2014
GB28.08.2014
NO28.08.2014
CH31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
PT29.09.2014
Former [2015/30]AT28.05.2014
BE28.05.2014
CY28.05.2014
CZ28.05.2014
DK28.05.2014
EE28.05.2014
ES28.05.2014
FI28.05.2014
HR28.05.2014
IT28.05.2014
LT28.05.2014
LV28.05.2014
MC28.05.2014
NL28.05.2014
PL28.05.2014
RO28.05.2014
SE28.05.2014
SK28.05.2014
LU26.08.2014
NO28.08.2014
CH31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
PT29.09.2014
Former [2015/22]AT28.05.2014
CY28.05.2014
CZ28.05.2014
DK28.05.2014
EE28.05.2014
ES28.05.2014
FI28.05.2014
HR28.05.2014
IT28.05.2014
LT28.05.2014
LV28.05.2014
MC28.05.2014
NL28.05.2014
PL28.05.2014
RO28.05.2014
SE28.05.2014
SK28.05.2014
LU26.08.2014
NO28.08.2014
BE31.08.2014
CH31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
PT29.09.2014
Former [2015/20]AT28.05.2014
CY28.05.2014
CZ28.05.2014
DK28.05.2014
EE28.05.2014
ES28.05.2014
FI28.05.2014
HR28.05.2014
LT28.05.2014
LV28.05.2014
MC28.05.2014
NL28.05.2014
PL28.05.2014
RO28.05.2014
SE28.05.2014
SK28.05.2014
LU26.08.2014
NO28.08.2014
BE31.08.2014
CH31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
PT29.09.2014
Former [2015/19]AT28.05.2014
CY28.05.2014
CZ28.05.2014
DK28.05.2014
EE28.05.2014
ES28.05.2014
FI28.05.2014
HR28.05.2014
LT28.05.2014
LV28.05.2014
MC28.05.2014
NL28.05.2014
PL28.05.2014
RO28.05.2014
SE28.05.2014
SK28.05.2014
LU26.08.2014
NO28.08.2014
BE31.08.2014
PT29.09.2014
Former [2015/18]AT28.05.2014
BE28.05.2014
CY28.05.2014
CZ28.05.2014
DK28.05.2014
EE28.05.2014
ES28.05.2014
FI28.05.2014
HR28.05.2014
LT28.05.2014
LV28.05.2014
MC28.05.2014
NL28.05.2014
PL28.05.2014
RO28.05.2014
SE28.05.2014
SK28.05.2014
NO28.08.2014
PT29.09.2014
Former [2015/12]AT28.05.2014
BE28.05.2014
CY28.05.2014
CZ28.05.2014
DK28.05.2014
EE28.05.2014
ES28.05.2014
FI28.05.2014
HR28.05.2014
LT28.05.2014
LV28.05.2014
NL28.05.2014
PL28.05.2014
RO28.05.2014
SE28.05.2014
SK28.05.2014
NO28.08.2014
PT29.09.2014
Former [2015/11]AT28.05.2014
BE28.05.2014
CY28.05.2014
CZ28.05.2014
DK28.05.2014
EE28.05.2014
ES28.05.2014
FI28.05.2014
HR28.05.2014
LT28.05.2014
LV28.05.2014
PL28.05.2014
RO28.05.2014
SE28.05.2014
SK28.05.2014
NO28.08.2014
PT29.09.2014
Former [2015/10]AT28.05.2014
BE28.05.2014
CY28.05.2014
CZ28.05.2014
DK28.05.2014
EE28.05.2014
ES28.05.2014
FI28.05.2014
HR28.05.2014
LT28.05.2014
LV28.05.2014
SE28.05.2014
SK28.05.2014
NO28.08.2014
PT29.09.2014
Former [2015/08]AT28.05.2014
BE28.05.2014
CY28.05.2014
DK28.05.2014
FI28.05.2014
HR28.05.2014
LT28.05.2014
LV28.05.2014
SE28.05.2014
NO28.08.2014
PT29.09.2014
Former [2015/02]AT28.05.2014
CY28.05.2014
FI28.05.2014
HR28.05.2014
LT28.05.2014
LV28.05.2014
SE28.05.2014
NO28.08.2014
PT29.09.2014
Former [2014/51]AT28.05.2014
CY28.05.2014
FI28.05.2014
HR28.05.2014
LT28.05.2014
LV28.05.2014
SE28.05.2014
NO28.08.2014
Former [2014/50]CY28.05.2014
FI28.05.2014
HR28.05.2014
LT28.05.2014
LV28.05.2014
SE28.05.2014
NO28.08.2014
Former [2014/49]CY28.05.2014
FI28.05.2014
LT28.05.2014
NO28.08.2014
Former [2014/48]CY28.05.2014
LT28.05.2014
Former [2014/47]CY28.05.2014
Cited inInternational search[A]WO2007060114  (BASELL POLIOLEFINE SRL [IT], et al) [A] 1-10 * examples 1,1c; claims 1-10 *;
 [AD]WO2006037705  (BASELL POLIOLEFINE SRL [IT], et al) [AD] 1-10 * example 1 *
by applicantWO2005014713
 WO2006037705
 WO2004087807
 EP0045977
 EP0361494
 EP0728769
 EP1272533
 WO0063261
 US4399054
 US4469648
 EP0395083
 WO9844001
 EP20090163192