Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2401922

EP2401922 - CULTURED MILK WITH LOW LACTOSE CONTENT AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  22.03.2013
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.06.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 25.07.2018  [2018/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Meiji Co., Ltd.
2-1, Kyobashi 2-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8306 / JP
[2017/17]
Former [2012/01]For all designated states
Meiji Co., Ltd.
1-2-10, Shinsuna, Koto-ku
Tokyo 136-0075 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / HORIUCHI, Hiroshi
c/o Meiji Dairies Corporation
Division of Research and Development
540 Naruda
Odawara-shi Kanagawa 250-0862 / JP
 [2012/01]
Representative(s)TBK
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/15]Instone, Alicia Claire , et al
Scott & York Intellectual Property Limited 45 Grosvenor Road
St Albans, Hertfordshire AL1 3AW / GB
Former [2012/01]Maughan, Sophie Louise , et al
Scott & York Intellectual Property Ltd 45 Grosvenor Road
St Albans, Hertfordshire AL1 3AW / GB
Application number, filing date10745971.124.02.2010
WO2010JP01235
Priority number, dateJP2009004324425.02.2009         Original published format: JP 2009043244
[2012/01]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2010098086
Date:02.09.2010
Language:JA
[2010/35]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2401922
Date:04.01.2012
Language:EN
[2012/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2401922
Date:24.04.2013
Language:EN
[2013/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP02.09.2010
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.05.2012
ClassificationInternational:A23C9/12, A23C7/04, A23C9/123
[2012/26]
Former International [2012/01]A23C9/12
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/01]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:KULTIVIERTE MILCH MIT GERINGEM LAKTOSEGEHALT UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG[2012/01]
English:CULTURED MILK WITH LOW LACTOSE CONTENT AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING THE SAME[2012/01]
French:LAIT DE CULTURE A FAIBLE TENEUR EN LACTOSE ET SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION[2012/49]
Former [2012/01]LAIT DE CULTURE À FAIBLE TENEUR EN LACTOSE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION
Entry into regional phase23.08.2011Translation filed 
23.08.2011National basic fee paid 
23.08.2011Search fee paid 
23.08.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
23.08.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.08.2011Examination requested  [2012/01]
07.11.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.03.2013Fee for grant paid
08.03.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  07.11.2012
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  22.01.2014  19.02.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Arla Foods amba
Sønderhøj 14
8260 Viby J / DK
Opponent's representative
Potter Clarkson
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
 02  23.01.2014  19.02.2014  ADMISSIBLE
DuPont Nutrition BioSciences ApS
Langebrogade 1
P.O. Box 17
1001 Copenhagen K / DK
Opponent's representative
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
 [N/P]
Former [2015/40]
Opponent(s)01  22.01.2014  19.02.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Arla Foods amba
Sønderhøj 14
8260 Viby J / DK
Opponent's representative
Potter Clarkson LLP
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham, NG1 5GG / GB
 02  23.01.2014  19.02.2014  ADMISSIBLE
DuPont Nutrition BioSciences ApS
Langebrogade 1
P.O. Box 17
1001 Copenhagen K / DK
Opponent's representative
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
Former [2015/34]
Opponent(s)01  22.01.2014  19.02.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Arla Foods amba
Sønderhøj 14
8260 Viby J / DK
Opponent's representative
Linehan, Sheena Alice
Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
 02  23.01.2014  19.02.2014  ADMISSIBLE
DuPont Nutrition BioSciences ApS
Langebrogade 1
P.O. Box 17
1001 Copenhagen K / DK
Opponent's representative
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
Former [2014/17]
Opponent(s)01  22.01.2014  19.02.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Arla Foods amba
Sønderhøj 14
8260 Viby J / DK
Opponent's representative
Linehan, Sheena Alice
Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
 02  23.01.2014  19.02.2014  ADMISSIBLE
DuPont Nutrition BioSciences ApS
Langebrogade 1
P.O. Box 17
1001 Copenhagen K / DK
Opponent's representative
Harding, Charles Thomas
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London
EC1N 2DY / GB
Former [2014/13]
Opponent(s)01  22.01.2014  19.02.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Arla Foods amba Arla Foods Ingredients amba
Sønderhøj 14
8260 Viby J / DK
Opponent's representative
Linehan, Sheena Alice
Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
 02  23.01.2014  19.02.2014  ADMISSIBLE
DuPont Nutrition BioSciences ApS
Langebrogade 1
P.O. Box 17
1001 Copenhagen K / DK
Opponent's representative
Harding, Charles Thomas
D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London
EC1N 2DY / GB
Former [2014/10]
Opponent(s)01  22.01.2014   
Arla Foods amba Arla Foods Ingredients amba
Sønderhøj 14
8260 Viby J / DK
 02  23.01.2014   
DuPont Nutrition BioSciences ApS
Langebrogade 1
P.O. Box 17
1001 Copenhagen K / DK
Opponent's representative
Harding, Charles Thomas
D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London
EC1N 2DY / GB
26.02.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
26.06.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
27.10.2015Date of oral proceedings
07.12.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
08.12.2015Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition04.02.2016Appeal received No.  T0470/16
18.04.2016Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
21.02.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU24.02.2010
AT24.04.2013
BE24.04.2013
CY24.04.2013
CZ24.04.2013
EE24.04.2013
HR24.04.2013
IT24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
LV24.04.2013
MC24.04.2013
MK24.04.2013
MT24.04.2013
NL24.04.2013
PL24.04.2013
RO24.04.2013
SI24.04.2013
SK24.04.2013
SM24.04.2013
TR24.04.2013
NO24.07.2013
GR25.07.2013
ES04.08.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
IE24.02.2014
LU24.02.2014
[2018/30]
Former [2016/33]HU24.02.2010
AT24.04.2013
BE24.04.2013
CY24.04.2013
CZ24.04.2013
EE24.04.2013
HR24.04.2013
IT24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
LV24.04.2013
MC24.04.2013
MT24.04.2013
NL24.04.2013
PL24.04.2013
RO24.04.2013
SI24.04.2013
SK24.04.2013
SM24.04.2013
TR24.04.2013
NO24.07.2013
GR25.07.2013
ES04.08.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
IE24.02.2014
LU24.02.2014
Former [2016/32]HU24.02.2010
AT24.04.2013
BE24.04.2013
CY24.04.2013
CZ24.04.2013
EE24.04.2013
HR24.04.2013
IT24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
LV24.04.2013
MC24.04.2013
MT24.04.2013
NL24.04.2013
PL24.04.2013
RO24.04.2013
SI24.04.2013
SK24.04.2013
SM24.04.2013
NO24.07.2013
GR25.07.2013
ES04.08.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
IE24.02.2014
LU24.02.2014
Former [2016/22]AT24.04.2013
BE24.04.2013
CY24.04.2013
CZ24.04.2013
EE24.04.2013
HR24.04.2013
IT24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
LV24.04.2013
MC24.04.2013
MT24.04.2013
NL24.04.2013
PL24.04.2013
RO24.04.2013
SI24.04.2013
SK24.04.2013
SM24.04.2013
NO24.07.2013
GR25.07.2013
ES04.08.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
IE24.02.2014
LU24.02.2014
Former [2016/12]AT24.04.2013
BE24.04.2013
CY24.04.2013
CZ24.04.2013
EE24.04.2013
HR24.04.2013
IT24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
LV24.04.2013
MC24.04.2013
MT24.04.2013
NL24.04.2013
PL24.04.2013
RO24.04.2013
SI24.04.2013
SK24.04.2013
NO24.07.2013
GR25.07.2013
ES04.08.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
IE24.02.2014
LU24.02.2014
Former [2015/07]AT24.04.2013
BE24.04.2013
CY24.04.2013
CZ24.04.2013
EE24.04.2013
HR24.04.2013
IT24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
LV24.04.2013
MC24.04.2013
NL24.04.2013
PL24.04.2013
RO24.04.2013
SI24.04.2013
SK24.04.2013
NO24.07.2013
GR25.07.2013
ES04.08.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
IE24.02.2014
LU24.02.2014
Former [2014/44]AT24.04.2013
BE24.04.2013
CY24.04.2013
CZ24.04.2013
EE24.04.2013
HR24.04.2013
IT24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
LV24.04.2013
MC24.04.2013
NL24.04.2013
PL24.04.2013
RO24.04.2013
SI24.04.2013
SK24.04.2013
NO24.07.2013
GR25.07.2013
ES04.08.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
LU24.02.2014
Former [2014/14]AT24.04.2013
BE24.04.2013
CY24.04.2013
CZ24.04.2013
EE24.04.2013
HR24.04.2013
IT24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
LV24.04.2013
NL24.04.2013
PL24.04.2013
RO24.04.2013
SI24.04.2013
SK24.04.2013
NO24.07.2013
GR25.07.2013
ES04.08.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
Former [2014/11]AT24.04.2013
BE24.04.2013
CY24.04.2013
CZ24.04.2013
EE24.04.2013
HR24.04.2013
IT24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
LV24.04.2013
PL24.04.2013
RO24.04.2013
SI24.04.2013
SK24.04.2013
NO24.07.2013
GR25.07.2013
ES04.08.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
Former [2014/10]AT24.04.2013
BE24.04.2013
CY24.04.2013
CZ24.04.2013
EE24.04.2013
HR24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
LV24.04.2013
PL24.04.2013
SI24.04.2013
SK24.04.2013
NO24.07.2013
GR25.07.2013
ES04.08.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
Former [2013/52]AT24.04.2013
BE24.04.2013
CY24.04.2013
HR24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
LV24.04.2013
PL24.04.2013
SI24.04.2013
NO24.07.2013
GR25.07.2013
ES04.08.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
Former [2013/51]AT24.04.2013
BE24.04.2013
HR24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
LV24.04.2013
PL24.04.2013
SI24.04.2013
NO24.07.2013
GR25.07.2013
ES04.08.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
Former [2013/50]AT24.04.2013
BE24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
LV24.04.2013
PL24.04.2013
SI24.04.2013
NO24.07.2013
GR25.07.2013
ES04.08.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
Former [2013/49]AT24.04.2013
BE24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
SI24.04.2013
NO24.07.2013
GR25.07.2013
ES04.08.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
Former [2013/48]AT24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
NO24.07.2013
ES04.08.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
Former [2013/47]LT24.04.2013
NO24.07.2013
PT26.08.2013
Documents cited:Search   [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[A]JPH0984520  (YAKULT HONSHA KK);
 [A]JP2005348703  (MEIJI MILK PROD CO LTD)
 [A]  - GABRIELA CORTESA ET AL., "Production of beta-galactosidase by Kluyveromyces marxianus under oscillating dissolved oxygen tension", PROCESS BIO CHEMISTRY, (2005), vol. 40, no. 2, pages 773 - 778, XP027793877
by applicantJP3389377B
 US6025008
 US5482723
 US5096731
 US4938973
 JP20040180526
 JP20050176603
 JP20060288309
 JP20010078665
 JP20010009206
 JP20050110527
 JP20020370006
 JP20050304390