Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2401922 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2401922



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1468
12.08.2019 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
06.08.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
06.08.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
06.08.2019 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 9
12.04.2019 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
12.12.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
12.12.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
06.12.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
06.12.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
06.12.2018 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
04.05.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
04.05.2018 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 20
04.05.2018 Amended description with annotations Appeal 5
04.05.2018 Claims Appeal 10
04.05.2018 Description Appeal 5
04.05.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
04.05.2018 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 22
04.05.2018 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
04.05.2018 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
24.03.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
24.03.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
23.03.2017 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Appeal 2
17.03.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
17.03.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
17.03.2017 Request for change of address - applicant Appeal 1
06.09.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
06.09.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
31.08.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
31.08.2016 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 6
31.08.2016 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 20
31.08.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
31.08.2016 Reply to appeal Appeal 59
01.08.2016 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
22.04.2016 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
22.04.2016 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
18.04.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
18.04.2016 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 10
18.04.2016 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 5
18.04.2016 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 10
18.04.2016 Claims Appeal 2
18.04.2016 Claims Appeal 2
18.04.2016 Claims Appeal 1
18.04.2016 Claims Appeal 1
18.04.2016 Claims Appeal 2
18.04.2016 Claims Appeal 2
18.04.2016 Claims Appeal 2
18.04.2016 Claims Appeal 1
18.04.2016 Claims Appeal 1
18.04.2016 Claims Appeal 2
18.04.2016 Claims Appeal 2
18.04.2016 Claims Appeal 1
18.04.2016 Claims Appeal 2
18.04.2016 Claims Appeal 2
18.04.2016 Claims Appeal 2
18.04.2016 Claims Appeal 1
18.04.2016 Claims Appeal 1
18.04.2016 Claims Appeal 2
18.04.2016 Claims Appeal 1
18.04.2016 Claims Appeal 1
18.04.2016 Claims Appeal 1
18.04.2016 Claims Appeal 2
18.04.2016 Claims Appeal 2
18.04.2016 Claims Appeal 1
18.04.2016 Claims Appeal 1
18.04.2016 Claims Appeal 2
18.04.2016 Claims Appeal 1
18.04.2016 Claims Appeal 2
18.04.2016 Claims Appeal 1
18.04.2016 Claims Appeal 1
18.04.2016 Claims Appeal 1
18.04.2016 Claims Appeal 2
18.04.2016 Claims Appeal 2
18.04.2016 Claims Appeal 1
18.04.2016 Claims Appeal 1
18.04.2016 Claims Appeal 2
18.04.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
18.04.2016 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 10
18.04.2016 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 10
18.04.2016 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
18.04.2016 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 16
18.04.2016 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 16
02.03.2016 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
02.03.2016 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
02.03.2016 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
26.02.2016 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
24.02.2016 Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney Appeal 4
24.02.2016 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
12.02.2016 Authorisation of representative Appeal 2
12.02.2016 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Appeal 1
10.02.2016 Invitation to file an authorisation Opposition 1
05.02.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.02.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.02.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
04.02.2016 Authorisation of representative Appeal 1
04.02.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
04.02.2016 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
26.01.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
26.01.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
26.01.2016 Request for change of applicant's representative Opposition 1
07.01.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
22.12.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
16.12.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
14.12.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
08.12.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
08.12.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
08.12.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
08.12.2015 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
08.12.2015 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 2
08.12.2015 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 13
08.12.2015 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
08.12.2015 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 8
07.12.2015 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 3
07.12.2015 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
07.12.2015 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
07.12.2015 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
07.12.2015 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
07.12.2015 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
07.12.2015 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 2
27.10.2015 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 2
23.10.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
23.10.2015 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
23.10.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.10.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.10.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
23.10.2015 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
16.10.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
16.10.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
16.10.2015 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
16.10.2015 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
16.10.2015 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
15.10.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
14.10.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
13.10.2015 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 2
13.10.2015 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 2
12.10.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
12.10.2015 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
12.10.2015 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
09.10.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.10.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.10.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.09.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.09.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.09.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.09.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.09.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
23.09.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
23.09.2015 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 6
23.09.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 20
23.09.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
22.09.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
22.09.2015 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
22.09.2015 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
22.09.2015 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
22.09.2015 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
22.09.2015 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
22.09.2015 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
22.09.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
22.09.2015 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 10
22.09.2015 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
08.09.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.09.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.09.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
02.09.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
02.09.2015 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
28.08.2015 Communication of amended entries Opposition 2
20.08.2015 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 2
16.07.2015 Communication of amended entries Opposition 2
02.07.2015 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 1
15.05.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
05.05.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
27.04.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
24.04.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
17.04.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
17.04.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
17.04.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
17.04.2015 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 9
17.04.2015 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
17.04.2015 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
17.04.2015 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
17.04.2015 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
17.04.2015 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
10.04.2015 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
30.01.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.01.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.01.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
23.01.2015 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
23.01.2015 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 24
23.01.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
23.01.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
23.01.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
23.01.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 19
23.01.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
23.01.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
11.07.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.07.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.06.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
26.06.2014 Claims Opposition 1
26.06.2014 Claims Opposition 1
26.06.2014 Claims Opposition 1
26.06.2014 Claims Opposition 1
26.06.2014 Claims Opposition 1
26.06.2014 Claims Opposition 1
26.06.2014 Claims Opposition 1
26.06.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
26.06.2014 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 11
27.03.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.03.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.03.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
10.03.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
10.03.2014 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
10.03.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
10.03.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
10.03.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
10.03.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
10.03.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
10.03.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 26
10.03.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
10.03.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
10.03.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
10.03.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
10.03.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 63
10.03.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
04.03.2014 Cover sheet for fax transmission Opposition 1
04.03.2014 Request concerning the applicant/representative Opposition 1
26.02.2014 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
26.02.2014 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
26.02.2014 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
26.02.2014 Request for documents Opposition 1
06.02.2014 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
24.01.2014 Letter concerning fees and payments Opposition 1
24.01.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
24.01.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
24.01.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
24.01.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
24.01.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
24.01.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
24.01.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
24.01.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
24.01.2014 Notice of opposition Opposition 38
24.01.2014 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
24.01.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
24.01.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
24.01.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
23.01.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
23.01.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
23.01.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
23.01.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
23.01.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
23.01.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
23.01.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
23.01.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
23.01.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
23.01.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
23.01.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
23.01.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
23.01.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
23.01.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
23.01.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
23.01.2014 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
23.01.2014 Notice of opposition Opposition 65
23.01.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 23
23.01.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
23.01.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
23.01.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 27
23.01.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 26
23.01.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 22
23.01.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 38
23.01.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
23.01.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 23
23.01.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
23.01.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
23.01.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 17
23.01.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
22.01.2014 Cover sheet for fax transmission Opposition 2
22.01.2014 Letter concerning fees and payments Opposition 1
22.01.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
22.01.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
22.01.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
22.01.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
22.01.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
22.01.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
22.01.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
22.01.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
22.01.2014 Notice of opposition Opposition 42
22.01.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
22.01.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
22.01.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
22.01.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
26.04.2013 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
28.03.2013 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
08.03.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
08.03.2013 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
08.03.2013 French translation of claims Search / examination 1
08.03.2013 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
08.03.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
07.11.2012 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
07.11.2012 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
07.11.2012 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
07.11.2012 Text intended for grant Search / examination 16
06.07.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
06.07.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
06.07.2012 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
12.06.2012 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
24.05.2012 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
24.05.2012 European search opinion Search / examination 1
24.05.2012 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 1
07.12.2011 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
29.09.2011 Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
14.09.2011 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 5
08.09.2011 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
23.08.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
23.08.2011 Abstract Search / examination 1
23.08.2011 Claims Search / examination 1
23.08.2011 Description Search / examination 12
23.08.2011 Drawings Search / examination 3
23.08.2011 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 6
11.07.2011 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
06.07.2011 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
20.09.2010 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 11
02.09.2010 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 1
02.09.2010 Copy of the translated international search report Search / examination 1
02.09.2010 International publication pamphlet Search / examination 16