Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2401922


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
22.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.07.2018  [2018/30]
24.03.2017 Change - applicant published on  26.04.2017  [2017/17]
15.07.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  17.08.2016  [2016/33]
08.07.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.08.2016  [2016/32]
29.04.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.06.2016  [2016/22]
20.04.2016 New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal
27.02.2016 Change: Appeal number
19.02.2016 Change - representative
19.02.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  23.03.2016  [2016/12]
05.02.2016 New entry: Appeal number
05.02.2016 New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal
07.12.2015 New entry: Despatch of communication that patent is revoked
06.12.2015 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
28.08.2015 Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative published on  30.09.2015  [2015/40]
17.07.2015 Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative published on  19.08.2015  [2015/34]
17.04.2015 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
09.01.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.02.2015  [2015/07]
26.09.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.10.2014  [2014/44]
03.07.2014 New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
21.03.2014 Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative published on  23.04.2014  [2014/17]
07.03.2014 Change - representative published on  09.04.2014  [2014/15]
28.02.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  02.04.2014  [2014/14]
25.02.2014 New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
21.02.2014 Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative published on  26.03.2014  [2014/13]
07.02.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.03.2014  [2014/11]
31.01.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.03.2014  [2014/10]
31.01.2014 Opposition filed published on  05.03.2014  [2014/10]
22.11.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.12.2013  [2013/52]
15.11.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.12.2013  [2013/51]
08.11.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.12.2013  [2013/50]
01.11.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.12.2013  [2013/49]
25.10.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.11.2013  [2013/48]
18.10.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.11.2013  [2013/47]
22.03.2013 (Expected) grant published on  24.04.2013  [2013/17]
13.03.2013 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
13.03.2013 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
25.02.2013 New entry: Renewal fee paid
06.11.2012 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
02.11.2012 Change - French title published on  05.12.2012  [2012/49]
28.09.2012 Change - classification published on  31.10.2012  [2012/44]
28.09.2012 Change - classification published on  31.10.2012  [2012/44]
25.05.2012 Supplementary search report published on  27.06.2012  [2012/26]
25.05.2012 Change - classification published on  27.06.2012  [2012/26]
25.05.2012 Change - classification published on  27.06.2012  [2012/26]
27.04.2012 Change - extension states published on  30.05.2012  [2012/22]
21.02.2012 New entry: Renewal fee paid
02.12.2011 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  04.01.2012  [2012/01]
02.12.2011 Request for examination filed published on  04.01.2012  [2012/01]
21.09.2011 PCT data prior to European publication
01.09.2011 PCT data prior to European publication
03.08.2011 PCT data prior to European publication
16.09.2010 PCT data prior to European publication
03.09.2010 PCT data prior to European publication