Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2401922 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201080008349 CN201510032480 EP10745971



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2011305797Global Dossier 15.12.2011A1
Priority number Date
WO2010JP01235 24.02.2010
JP2009043244 25.02.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP5607022BGlobal Dossier 15.10.2014B2
JPWO2010098086 30.08.2012A1
Priority number Date
WO2010JP01235 24.02.2010
JP2009043244 25.02.2009
JP2011501501 24.02.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN102325459Global Dossier 18.01.2012A
Priority number Date
WO2010JP01235 24.02.2010
JP2009043244 25.02.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2401922Global Dossier 24.04.2013B1
EP2401922 27.06.2012A4
EP2401922 04.01.2012A1
Priority number Date
WO2010JP01235 24.02.2010
JP2009043244 25.02.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2753348 16.10.2012C
CA2753348 02.09.2010A1
Priority number Date
WO2010JP01235 24.02.2010
JP2009043244 25.02.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DK2401922T 21.05.2013T3
Priority number Date
WO2010JP01235 24.02.2010
JP2009043244 25.02.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
SG173789 29.09.2011A1
Priority number Date
WO2010JP01235 24.02.2010
JP2009043244 25.02.2009
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2010098086Global Dossier 02.09.2010A1
Priority number Date
JP2009043244 25.02.2009
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN104719465Global Dossier 24.06.2015A
Priority number Date
JP2009043244 25.02.2009
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
HK1207531 05.02.2016A1
Priority number Date
JP2009043244 25.02.2009