EP2476028 - SPIRAL SPRING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.06.2014 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Manufacture et fabrique de montres et chronomètres Ulysse Nardin Le Locle S.A. Rue du Jardin 3 2400 Le Locle / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2012/29] | For all designated states Manufacture et fabrique de montres et de chronomètres Ulysse Nardin Le Locle S.A. Rue du Jardin 3 2400 Le Locle / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VON GUNTEN, Stéphane Rue des Courtils 10 CH-2035 Corcelles / CH | 02 /
HUMAIR, Lucas En Galilée 25 CH-2022 Bevaix / CH | 03 /
GYGAX, Pierre Chemin du Bois 18 CH-2016 Cortaillod / CH | [2012/29] | Representative(s) | Ballot, Gabriel Gresset & Laesser Neuchâtel Puits-Godet 8a CH-2000 Neuchâtel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2012/29] | Ballot, Gabriel Gresset & Laesser Neuchâtel Puits-Godet 8a CH-2000 Neuchâtel / CH | Application number, filing date | 10747438.9 | 16.08.2010 | WO2010EP61913 | Priority number, date | CH20090001385 | 07.09.2009 Original published format: CH 13852009 | [2012/29] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011026725 | Date: | 10.03.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2476028 | Date: | 18.07.2012 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.03.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2476028 | Date: | 21.08.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G04B17/06, F16F1/10 | [2012/29] | CPC: |
F16F1/10 (EP,KR,US);
G04B17/30 (KR);
G04B17/063 (US);
G04B17/066 (EP,KR,US);
G04B17/325 (EP,KR,US);
G04B17/345 (EP,KR,US);
F16F2226/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/29] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SPIRALFEDER | [2012/29] | English: | SPIRAL SPRING | [2012/29] | French: | RESSORT SPIRAL | [2012/29] | Entry into regional phase | 15.02.2012 | National basic fee paid | 15.02.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.02.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.06.2011 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.02.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.02.2012 | Examination requested [2012/29] | 13.03.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.07.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 12.07.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.03.2013 | Opposition(s) | 22.05.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.08.2010 | AL | 21.08.2013 | AT | 21.08.2013 | BG | 21.08.2013 | CY | 21.08.2013 | CZ | 21.08.2013 | DK | 21.08.2013 | EE | 21.08.2013 | FI | 21.08.2013 | HR | 21.08.2013 | LT | 21.08.2013 | LV | 21.08.2013 | MK | 21.08.2013 | MT | 21.08.2013 | NL | 21.08.2013 | PL | 21.08.2013 | RO | 21.08.2013 | SE | 21.08.2013 | SI | 21.08.2013 | SK | 21.08.2013 | SM | 21.08.2013 | TR | 21.08.2013 | NO | 21.11.2013 | GR | 22.11.2013 | IS | 21.12.2013 | PT | 23.12.2013 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 16.08.2010 | |
AT | 21.08.2013 | ||
BG | 21.08.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
EE | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
HR | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
MK | 21.08.2013 | ||
MT | 21.08.2013 | ||
NL | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
SK | 21.08.2013 | ||
SM | 21.08.2013 | ||
TR | 21.08.2013 | ||
NO | 21.11.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 16.08.2010 | |
AT | 21.08.2013 | ||
BG | 21.08.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
EE | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
HR | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
MT | 21.08.2013 | ||
NL | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
SK | 21.08.2013 | ||
SM | 21.08.2013 | ||
TR | 21.08.2013 | ||
NO | 21.11.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 16.08.2010 | |
AT | 21.08.2013 | ||
BG | 21.08.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
EE | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
HR | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
MT | 21.08.2013 | ||
NL | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
SK | 21.08.2013 | ||
SM | 21.08.2013 | ||
NO | 21.11.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 21.08.2013 | |
BG | 21.08.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
EE | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
HR | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
MT | 21.08.2013 | ||
NL | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
SK | 21.08.2013 | ||
SM | 21.08.2013 | ||
NO | 21.11.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 21.08.2013 | |
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
EE | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
HR | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
NL | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
SK | 21.08.2013 | ||
SM | 21.08.2013 | ||
NO | 21.11.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | AT | 21.08.2013 | |
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
EE | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
HR | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
NL | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
SK | 21.08.2013 | ||
NO | 21.11.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | AT | 21.08.2013 | |
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
HR | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
NL | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
NO | 21.11.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 21.08.2013 | |
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
HR | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
NO | 21.11.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | AT | 21.08.2013 | |
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
HR | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
NO | 21.11.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | AT | 21.08.2013 | |
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
HR | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 21.11.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 21.08.2013 | |
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
HR | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 21.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 21.08.2013 | |
HR | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 21.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 21.08.2013 | |
HR | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
NO | 21.11.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 21.08.2013 | |
NO | 21.11.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | NO | 21.11.2013 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE3216449 (VOLKSWAGENWERK AG [DE]) [A] 1* page 4, lines 14-35; figures 3,4 *; | [Y]WO2004029733 (FORE EAGLE CO LTD [CN], et al) [Y] 1,3-6,10,13,14 * page 6, line 12 - page 7, line 13; figures 4, 5 * * claims 14, 15 *; | [A]WO2008064714 (ACENER INVESTIGACION Y DESARRO [ES], et al) [A] 1 * page 11, lines 6-16; figures 3.2,3.3 *; | [Y]CH697207 (PATEK PHILIPPE SA [CH]) [Y] 10 * abstract *; | [A]US2008171604 (CHAUDHARI DALSANG KANABHAI [US], et al) [A] 1 * figure 2 *; | [YA]EP2063325 (RICHEMONT INT SA [CH]) [Y] 1,3-6,10,13,14 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0019]; figures 1-3 * [A] 2,7-9,11,12; | [XPI]EP2151722 (ROLEX SA [CH]) [XP] 1-13 * the whole document * [I] 14; | [E]CH700812 (RICHEMONT INT SA [CH]) [E] 1,3-5,13,14 * the whole document *; | [A] - SUIBERTW, "Basel2007* Moser's New Double Straumann Hairspring Escapement", INTERNET CITATION, (20070412), pages 1 - 5, URL: http://basel.watchprosite.com/show-nblog.post/ti-360412/, (20081106), XP002502705 [A] 1-11 * the whole document * |