Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2467724

EP2467724 - SURVIVAL PROGNOSTIC ASSAY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  20.06.2014
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.07.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IE
published on 14.08.2019  [2019/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Binding Site Group Limited
8 Calthorpe Road
Edgbaston
Birmingham B15 1QT / GB
[2014/48]
Former [2012/26]For all designated states
The Binding Site Group Limited
PO Box 11712 Birmingham
B14 4ZB / GB
Inventor(s)01 / MEAD, Graham Peter
P O Box 11712
Birmingham B14 4ZB / GB
02 / BRADWELL, Arthur Randall
P O Box 11712
Birmingham B14 4ZB / GB
 [2012/26]
Representative(s)Elsy, David , et al
Withers & Rogers LLP
4 More London Riverside
London SE1 2AU / GB
[2012/26]
Application number, filing date10747657.419.08.2010
WO2010GB51373
Priority number, dateGB2009001453519.08.2009         Original published format: GB 0914535
GB2010000107922.01.2010         Original published format: GB 201001079
[2012/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2011021041
Date:24.02.2011
Language:EN
[2011/08]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2467724
Date:27.06.2012
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.02.2011
[2012/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2467724
Date:23.07.2014
Language:EN
[2014/30]
Type: B8 Corrected title page of specification 
No.:EP2467724
Date:29.10.2014
[2014/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.04.2011
ClassificationInternational:G01N33/68
[2012/26]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/35]
Former [2012/26]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ÜBERLEBENSPROGNOSETEST[2012/26]
English:SURVIVAL PROGNOSTIC ASSAY[2012/26]
French:DOSAGE PRONOSTIQUE DE DÉTERMINATION DE LA SURVIE[2012/26]
Entry into regional phase15.03.2012National basic fee paid 
15.03.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
15.03.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.03.2012Examination requested  [2012/26]
28.09.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.03.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.07.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.01.2014Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 21.01.2014
21.01.2014Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
06.02.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.06.2014Fee for grant paid
13.06.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
13.06.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP14171848.6  / EP2799879
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  07.03.2013
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  08.04.2015   
Siemens Healthcare Diagnostics Products GmbH
Emil-von-Behring Strasse 76
35041 Marburg / DE
 [2015/20]
01.06.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
01.12.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
27.09.2016Date of oral proceedings
20.10.2016Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
20.10.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition19.12.2016Appeal received No.  T2665/16
24.02.2017Statement of grounds filed
15.12.2016Appeal received No.  T2665/16
20.02.2017Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.08.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
31.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU19.08.2010
AL23.07.2014
CY23.07.2014
EE23.07.2014
FI23.07.2014
HR23.07.2014
LT23.07.2014
LV23.07.2014
MC23.07.2014
MK23.07.2014
MT23.07.2014
RO23.07.2014
SI23.07.2014
SK23.07.2014
SM23.07.2014
LU19.08.2014
BG23.10.2014
NO23.10.2014
GR24.10.2014
IS23.11.2014
AT19.08.2018
IE19.08.2018
PT19.02.2019
[2019/33]
Former [2019/26]HU19.08.2010
AL23.07.2014
CY23.07.2014
EE23.07.2014
FI23.07.2014
HR23.07.2014
LT23.07.2014
LV23.07.2014
MC23.07.2014
MK23.07.2014
MT23.07.2014
RO23.07.2014
SI23.07.2014
SK23.07.2014
SM23.07.2014
LU19.08.2014
BG23.10.2014
NO23.10.2014
GR24.10.2014
IS23.11.2014
AT19.08.2018
PT19.02.2019
Former [2019/23]HU19.08.2010
AL23.07.2014
CY23.07.2014
EE23.07.2014
FI23.07.2014
HR23.07.2014
LT23.07.2014
LV23.07.2014
MC23.07.2014
MK23.07.2014
MT23.07.2014
RO23.07.2014
SI23.07.2014
SK23.07.2014
SM23.07.2014
LU19.08.2014
BG23.10.2014
NO23.10.2014
GR24.10.2014
IS23.11.2014
AT19.08.2018
Former [2018/46]HU19.08.2010
AL23.07.2014
CY23.07.2014
EE23.07.2014
FI23.07.2014
HR23.07.2014
LT23.07.2014
LV23.07.2014
MC23.07.2014
MK23.07.2014
MT23.07.2014
RO23.07.2014
SI23.07.2014
SK23.07.2014
SM23.07.2014
LU19.08.2014
BG23.10.2014
NO23.10.2014
GR24.10.2014
IS23.11.2014
Former [2018/30]HU19.08.2010
CY23.07.2014
EE23.07.2014
FI23.07.2014
HR23.07.2014
LT23.07.2014
LV23.07.2014
MC23.07.2014
MK23.07.2014
MT23.07.2014
RO23.07.2014
SI23.07.2014
SK23.07.2014
SM23.07.2014
LU19.08.2014
BG23.10.2014
NO23.10.2014
GR24.10.2014
IS23.11.2014
Former [2016/33]HU19.08.2010
CY23.07.2014
EE23.07.2014
FI23.07.2014
HR23.07.2014
LT23.07.2014
LV23.07.2014
MC23.07.2014
MT23.07.2014
RO23.07.2014
SI23.07.2014
SK23.07.2014
SM23.07.2014
LU19.08.2014
BG23.10.2014
NO23.10.2014
GR24.10.2014
IS23.11.2014
Former [2016/32]HU19.08.2010
CY23.07.2014
EE23.07.2014
FI23.07.2014
HR23.07.2014
LT23.07.2014
LV23.07.2014
MC23.07.2014
MT23.07.2014
RO23.07.2014
SI23.07.2014
SK23.07.2014
SM23.07.2014
BG23.10.2014
NO23.10.2014
GR24.10.2014
IS23.11.2014
Former [2016/28]CY23.07.2014
EE23.07.2014
FI23.07.2014
HR23.07.2014
LT23.07.2014
LV23.07.2014
MC23.07.2014
MT23.07.2014
RO23.07.2014
SI23.07.2014
SK23.07.2014
SM23.07.2014
BG23.10.2014
NO23.10.2014
GR24.10.2014
IS23.11.2014
Former [2016/22]CY23.07.2014
EE23.07.2014
FI23.07.2014
HR23.07.2014
LT23.07.2014
LV23.07.2014
MC23.07.2014
RO23.07.2014
SI23.07.2014
SK23.07.2014
SM23.07.2014
BG23.10.2014
NO23.10.2014
GR24.10.2014
IS23.11.2014
Former [2015/50]CY23.07.2014
EE23.07.2014
FI23.07.2014
HR23.07.2014
LT23.07.2014
LV23.07.2014
MC23.07.2014
RO23.07.2014
SI23.07.2014
SK23.07.2014
BG23.10.2014
NO23.10.2014
GR24.10.2014
IS23.11.2014
Former [2015/23]CY23.07.2014
EE23.07.2014
FI23.07.2014
HR23.07.2014
LT23.07.2014
LV23.07.2014
MC23.07.2014
RO23.07.2014
SK23.07.2014
BG23.10.2014
NO23.10.2014
GR24.10.2014
IS23.11.2014
Former [2015/22]CY23.07.2014
FI23.07.2014
HR23.07.2014
LT23.07.2014
LV23.07.2014
MC23.07.2014
RO23.07.2014
BG23.10.2014
NO23.10.2014
GR24.10.2014
IS23.11.2014
Former [2015/20]CY23.07.2014
FI23.07.2014
HR23.07.2014
LT23.07.2014
LV23.07.2014
MC23.07.2014
BG23.10.2014
NO23.10.2014
GR24.10.2014
IS23.11.2014
Former [2015/12]CY23.07.2014
FI23.07.2014
HR23.07.2014
LT23.07.2014
LV23.07.2014
BG23.10.2014
NO23.10.2014
GR24.10.2014
IS23.11.2014
Former [2015/11]CY23.07.2014
FI23.07.2014
LT23.07.2014
BG23.10.2014
NO23.10.2014
GR24.10.2014
Former [2015/10]FI23.07.2014
LT23.07.2014
BG23.10.2014
NO23.10.2014
Former [2015/09]FI23.07.2014
LT23.07.2014
Former [2015/08]LT23.07.2014
Cited inInternational search[X]WO2006079816  (BINDING SITE LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1,2,4-6,9,24 * page 12, paragraph 2 - paragraph 8 * * page 11, paragraphs 3,4 * * page 21, paragraphs 1,4 * * page 5, paragraph 3 *;
 [X]EP0336472  (NEW SCIENT CO SPA [IT]) [X] 1-3,5,9,24 * column 3, paragraph 8 - paragraph 32 *;
 [X]DE202004012479U  (LEVIN FELIX [DE]) [X] 1-5,24 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0010] *;
 [X]  - LE BRICON THIERRY ET AL, "Urinary free light chain analysis by the Freelite(R) immunoassay: A preliminary study in multiple myeloma", CLINICAL BIOCHEMISTRY, ELSEVIER INC, US, CA, (20021001), vol. 35, no. 7, ISSN 0009-9120, pages 565 - 567, XP008127742 [X] 1,2,4-8,24 * page 566, column 1, paragraph 4 * * page 566, column 2, paragraph 5 *
 [XI]  - RAJKUMAR S VINCENT ET AL, "Presence of monoclonal free light chains in serum predicts risk of progression in monoclonal gammopathy of undetermined significance (MGUS)", BLOOD, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF HEMATOLOGY, US, (20031116), vol. 102, no. 11, ISSN 0006-4971, page 935A, XP008127772 [X] 1,2,4-9,13-21,24 * abstract * [I] 22
 [XYI]  - STAGGS BRENT ET AL, "Comparison of serum quantitative free light chains (Freelite) to serum quantitative total light chains in recurrent multiple myeloma", ARCHIVES OF PATHOLOGY & LABORATORY MEDICINE, COLLEGE OF AMERICAN PATHOLOGISTS, US, (20040201), vol. 128, no. 2, ISSN 0363-0153, page 143, XP008127760 [X] 1-8,13-17,20,21,24 * abstract * [Y] 1-25 [I] 11,12
 [XY]  - SHOWELL P J ET AL, "Correlation of FREELITE (TM) and cystatin C in chronic kidney disease on the binding site SPAPLUS (TM) bench-top analyser", CLINICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CLINICAL CHEMISTRY, WASHINGTON, DC, (20070601), vol. 53, no. 6 sup.S, ISSN 0009-9147, page A129, XP008127771 [X] 10 * the whole document * [Y] 1-25
 [XY]  - HUTCHISON COLIN A ET AL, "Quantitative assessment of serum and urinary polyclonal free light chains in patients with type II diabetes: an early marker of diabetic kidney disease?", EXPERT OPINION ON THERAPEUTIC TARGETS JUN 2008 LNKD- PUBMED:18479214, (200806), vol. 12, no. 6, ISSN 1744-7631, pages 667 - 676, XP008132516 [X] 10 * page 669, column 1, paragraph 3 * [Y] 1-25

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/
 [XY]  - HOFMANN W ET AL, "A new concept for detection of Bence Jones proteinuria in patients with monoclonal gammopathy", CLINICAL LABORATORY, CLIN LAB PUBLICATIONS, HEIDELBERG, (20040101), vol. 50, no. 3-4, ISSN 1433-6510, pages 181 - 185, XP008132515 [X] 10 * abstract * [Y] 1-25
 [XY]  - KYRTSONIS MARIE-CHRISTINE ET AL, "Serum free light chain ratio (FLCR) at diagnosis constitute a powerful prognostic factor of survival in multiple myeloma (MM)", BLOOD; 48TH ANNUAL MEETING OF THE AMERICAN-SOCIETY-OF-HEMATOLOGY; ORLANDO,FL, USA; DECEMBER 09 -12, 2006, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF HEMATOLOGY, US, (20061116), vol. 108, no. 11 part 1, ISSN 0006-4971, pages 1 - 3, XP008132501 [X] 10 * abstract * [Y] 1-25
 [XY]  - ROSSI JEAN-FRANCOIS ET AL, "A phase I/II study of atacicept (TACI-Ig) to neutralize APRIL and BLyS in patients with refractory or relapsed multiple myeloma (MM) or active previously treated waldenstrom's macroglobulinemia (WM)", BLOOD; 48TH ANNUAL MEETING OF THE AMERICAN-SOCIETY-OF-HEMATOLOGY; ORLANDO,FL, USA; DECEMBER 09 -12, 2006, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF HEMATOLOGY, US, (20061116), vol. 108, no. 11 part 1, ISSN 0006-4971, pages 1 - 3, XP008132499 [X] 10 * abstract * [Y] 1-25
 [XY]  - KATZMANN JERRY A ET AL, "Serum reference intervals and diagnostic ranges for free kappa and free lambda immunoglobulin light chains: Relative sensitivity for detection of monoclonal light chains", CLINICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CLINICAL CHEMISTRY, WASHINGTON, DC, (20020901), vol. 48, no. 9, ISSN 0009-9147, pages 1437 - 1444, XP002378160 [X] 10 * abstract * [Y] 1-25
 [XY]  - ABADIE JUDE M ET AL, "Are Renal Reference Intervals Required When Screening for Plasma Cell Disorders With Serum Free Light Chains and Serum Protein Electrophoresis?", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF CLINICAL PATHOLOGY, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR CLINICAL PATHOLOGY, US, (20090201), vol. 131, no. 2, doi:DOI:10.1309/AJCPR2M4EUYNHLGM, ISSN 0002-9173, pages 166 - 171, XP008132506 [X] 10 * abstract * [Y] 1-25

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1309/AJCPR2M4EUYNHLGM
 [XY]  - GERTZ MORIE A ET AL, "Hepatic amyloidosis: Clinical appraisal in 77 patients", HEPATOLOGY, WILLIAMS AND WILKINS, BALTIMORE, MD, US, vol. 25, no. 1, doi:DOI:10.1002/HEP.510250122, ISSN 0270-9139, (19970101), pages 118 - 121, (20031230), XP008132523 [X] 10 * abstract * [Y] 1-25

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/hep.510250122
 [XY]  - BRUCK P ET AL, "Lambda- and kappa-free light chains in haematologic patients", CLINICAL AND EXPERIMENTAL MEDICAL LETTERS,, (20080101), vol. 49, no. 1, ISSN 1895-2089, pages 19 - 22, XP008132487 [X] 10 * abstract * [Y] 1-25
ExaminationWO2005103717
 EP0044219
 WO2007125338
 WO2010049672
 GB2472518
    - HOPPER J E ET AL, "CLINICAL RELAPSE IN SYSTEMIC LUPUS ERYTHEMATOSUS CORRELATION WITH ANTECEDENT ELEVATION OF URINARY FREE LIGHT-CHAIN IMMUNOGLOBULIN", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL IMMUNOLOGY, (1989), vol. 9, no. 4, ISSN 0271-9142, pages 338 - 350
    - JEFFERIS R ET AL, "QUANTITATION OF HUMAN TOTAL IMMUNO GLOBULIN G KAPPA IMMUNO GLOBULIN G AND LAMBDA IMMUNO GLOBULIN G IN SERUM USING MONO CLONAL ANTIBODIES", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGICAL METHODS, (1980), vol. 39, no. 4, ISSN 0022-1759, pages 355 - 362
    - ABE M ET AL, "Differences in kappa to lambda (kappa:gamma) ratios of serum and urinary free light chains", CLINICAL AND EXPERIMENTAL IMMUNOLOGY, (199802), vol. 111, no. 2, ISSN 0009-9104, pages 457 - 462
    - RAJKUMAR S VINCENT ET AL, "Serum free light chain ratio is an independent risk factor for progression in monoclonal gammopathy of undetermined significance", BLOOD, (200508), vol. 106, no. 3, ISSN 0006-4971, pages 812 - 817,803
by applicantEP0336472
 DE202004012479U
 WO9717372
    - KATZMAN, CLIN. CHEM., (2002), vol. 48, no. 9, pages 1437 - 1944