Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2471149

EP2471149 - ELECTRICAL CONNECTOR HAVING AN ELECTRICALLY PARALLEL COMPENSATION REGION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.02.2017
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Commscope Technologies LLC
1100 CommScope Place SE
Hickory, NC 28602 / US
[2017/29]
Former [2017/28]For all designated states
Tyco Electronics Corporation
1050 Westlakes Drive
Berwyn, PA 19312 / US
Former [2017/07]For all designated states
TE Connectivity Corporation
1050 Westlakes Drive
Berwyn PA 19312 / US
Former [2012/27]For all designated states
Tyco Electronics Corporation
1050 Westlakes Drive
Berwyn, PA 19312 / US
Inventor(s)01 / BOPP, Steven, Richard
3835 Windstream Way
Jamestown, NC 27282 / US
02 / PEPE, Paul, John
1812 Kilrush Road
Clemmons, NC 27012 / US
 [2012/27]
Representative(s)Johnstone, Douglas Ian , et al
Baron Warren Redfern
1000 Great West Road
Brentford TW8 9DW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2012/27]Johnstone, Douglas Ian , et al
Baron Warren Redfern Cambridge House 100 Cambridge Grove Hammersmith London
W6 0LE / GB
Application number, filing date10747972.719.08.2010
[2016/13]
WO2010US02285
Priority number, dateUS2009054724525.08.2009         Original published format: US 547245
[2012/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2011025527
Date:03.03.2011
Language:EN
[2011/09]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2471149
Date:04.07.2012
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.03.2011
[2012/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2471149
Date:30.03.2016
Language:EN
[2016/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP03.03.2011
ClassificationInternational:H01R13/6464, H01R13/6466, H01R13/6467, H01R13/6477, H01R13/66, H01R24/00, H01R24/58, H01R24/64
[2015/33]
Former International [2012/27]H01R24/58, H01R13/66
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/27]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ELEKTRISCHER VERBINDER MIT ELEKTRISCH PARALLELEM KOMPENSATIONSBEREICH[2015/33]
English:ELECTRICAL CONNECTOR HAVING AN ELECTRICALLY PARALLEL COMPENSATION REGION[2012/27]
French:CONNECTEUR ELECTRIQUE AVEC UNE ETENDUE DE COMPENSATION ELECTRIQUE PARALLELE[2015/33]
Former [2012/27]ELEKTRISCHER STECKVERBUNDER MIT ELEKTRISCH PARALLELEM KOMPENSATIONSBEREICH
Former [2012/27]CONNECTEUR ÉLECTRIQUE DOTÉ D UNE ZONE DE COMPENSATION ÉLECTRIQUEMENT PARALLÈLE
Entry into regional phase10.02.2012National basic fee paid 
10.02.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
10.02.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.02.2012Examination requested  [2012/27]
28.09.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.09.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.01.2016Fee for grant paid
25.01.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
25.01.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  16.09.2015
Opposition(s)03.01.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/10]
03.01.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/28]
03.01.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/29]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.08.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
27.08.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
27.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
27.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU19.08.2010
AL30.03.2016
AT30.03.2016
BE30.03.2016
BG30.03.2016
CY30.03.2016
CZ30.03.2016
DK30.03.2016
EE30.03.2016
FI30.03.2016
HR30.03.2016
LT30.03.2016
LV30.03.2016
MC30.03.2016
MK30.03.2016
NL30.03.2016
PL30.03.2016
RO30.03.2016
SE30.03.2016
SI30.03.2016
SK30.03.2016
SM30.03.2016
TR30.03.2016
NO30.06.2016
GR01.07.2016
IS30.07.2016
PT01.08.2016
IE19.08.2016
LU19.08.2016
CH31.08.2016
LI31.08.2016
MT31.08.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/38]HU19.08.2010
AT30.03.2016
BE30.03.2016
BG30.03.2016
CY30.03.2016
CZ30.03.2016
DK30.03.2016
EE30.03.2016
FI30.03.2016
HR30.03.2016
LT30.03.2016
LV30.03.2016
MC30.03.2016
MK30.03.2016
NL30.03.2016
PL30.03.2016
RO30.03.2016
SE30.03.2016
SI30.03.2016
SK30.03.2016
SM30.03.2016
TR30.03.2016
NO30.06.2016
GR01.07.2016
IS30.07.2016
PT01.08.2016
IE19.08.2016
LU19.08.2016
CH31.08.2016
LI31.08.2016
MT31.08.2016
Former [2018/33]HU19.08.2010
AT30.03.2016
BE30.03.2016
CY30.03.2016
CZ30.03.2016
DK30.03.2016
EE30.03.2016
FI30.03.2016
HR30.03.2016
LT30.03.2016
LV30.03.2016
MC30.03.2016
MK30.03.2016
NL30.03.2016
PL30.03.2016
RO30.03.2016
SE30.03.2016
SI30.03.2016
SK30.03.2016
SM30.03.2016
TR30.03.2016
NO30.06.2016
GR01.07.2016
IS30.07.2016
PT01.08.2016
IE19.08.2016
LU19.08.2016
CH31.08.2016
LI31.08.2016
MT31.08.2016
Former [2018/29]HU19.08.2010
AT30.03.2016
BE30.03.2016
CY30.03.2016
CZ30.03.2016
DK30.03.2016
EE30.03.2016
FI30.03.2016
HR30.03.2016
LT30.03.2016
LV30.03.2016
MC30.03.2016
MK30.03.2016
NL30.03.2016
PL30.03.2016
RO30.03.2016
SE30.03.2016
SI30.03.2016
SK30.03.2016
SM30.03.2016
TR30.03.2016
NO30.06.2016
GR01.07.2016
IS30.07.2016
PT01.08.2016
IE19.08.2016
LU19.08.2016
CH31.08.2016
LI31.08.2016
Former [2018/28]HU19.08.2010
AT30.03.2016
BE30.03.2016
CY30.03.2016
CZ30.03.2016
DK30.03.2016
EE30.03.2016
FI30.03.2016
HR30.03.2016
LT30.03.2016
LV30.03.2016
MC30.03.2016
MK30.03.2016
NL30.03.2016
PL30.03.2016
RO30.03.2016
SE30.03.2016
SI30.03.2016
SK30.03.2016
SM30.03.2016
NO30.06.2016
GR01.07.2016
IS30.07.2016
PT01.08.2016
IE19.08.2016
LU19.08.2016
CH31.08.2016
LI31.08.2016
Former [2017/37]AT30.03.2016
BE30.03.2016
CZ30.03.2016
DK30.03.2016
EE30.03.2016
FI30.03.2016
HR30.03.2016
LT30.03.2016
LV30.03.2016
MC30.03.2016
NL30.03.2016
PL30.03.2016
RO30.03.2016
SE30.03.2016
SI30.03.2016
SK30.03.2016
SM30.03.2016
NO30.06.2016
GR01.07.2016
IS30.07.2016
PT01.08.2016
IE19.08.2016
LU19.08.2016
CH31.08.2016
LI31.08.2016
Former [2017/23]AT30.03.2016
BE30.03.2016
CZ30.03.2016
DK30.03.2016
EE30.03.2016
FI30.03.2016
HR30.03.2016
LT30.03.2016
LV30.03.2016
MC30.03.2016
NL30.03.2016
PL30.03.2016
RO30.03.2016
SE30.03.2016
SI30.03.2016
SK30.03.2016
SM30.03.2016
NO30.06.2016
GR01.07.2016
IS30.07.2016
PT01.08.2016
CH31.08.2016
LI31.08.2016
Former [2017/07]AT30.03.2016
BE30.03.2016
CZ30.03.2016
DK30.03.2016
EE30.03.2016
FI30.03.2016
HR30.03.2016
LT30.03.2016
LV30.03.2016
NL30.03.2016
PL30.03.2016
RO30.03.2016
SE30.03.2016
SK30.03.2016
SM30.03.2016
NO30.06.2016
GR01.07.2016
IS30.07.2016
PT01.08.2016
Former [2017/03]AT30.03.2016
BE30.03.2016
CZ30.03.2016
EE30.03.2016
FI30.03.2016
HR30.03.2016
LT30.03.2016
LV30.03.2016
NL30.03.2016
PL30.03.2016
RO30.03.2016
SE30.03.2016
SK30.03.2016
SM30.03.2016
NO30.06.2016
GR01.07.2016
IS30.07.2016
PT01.08.2016
Former [2016/51]AT30.03.2016
CZ30.03.2016
EE30.03.2016
FI30.03.2016
HR30.03.2016
LT30.03.2016
LV30.03.2016
NL30.03.2016
PL30.03.2016
RO30.03.2016
SE30.03.2016
SK30.03.2016
SM30.03.2016
NO30.06.2016
GR01.07.2016
IS30.07.2016
PT01.08.2016
Former [2016/50]AT30.03.2016
CZ30.03.2016
EE30.03.2016
FI30.03.2016
HR30.03.2016
LT30.03.2016
LV30.03.2016
NL30.03.2016
PL30.03.2016
RO30.03.2016
SE30.03.2016
SK30.03.2016
SM30.03.2016
NO30.06.2016
GR01.07.2016
IS30.07.2016
Former [2016/49]EE30.03.2016
FI30.03.2016
HR30.03.2016
LT30.03.2016
LV30.03.2016
NL30.03.2016
PL30.03.2016
SE30.03.2016
NO30.06.2016
GR01.07.2016
IS30.07.2016
Former [2016/48]FI30.03.2016
HR30.03.2016
LT30.03.2016
LV30.03.2016
NL30.03.2016
SE30.03.2016
NO30.06.2016
GR01.07.2016
IS30.07.2016
Former [2016/44]FI30.03.2016
HR30.03.2016
LT30.03.2016
LV30.03.2016
NL30.03.2016
SE30.03.2016
NO30.06.2016
GR01.07.2016
Former [2016/39]FI30.03.2016
HR30.03.2016
LT30.03.2016
LV30.03.2016
SE30.03.2016
NO30.06.2016
GR01.07.2016
Former [2016/36]FI30.03.2016
HR30.03.2016
LT30.03.2016
NO30.06.2016
GR01.07.2016
Former [2016/35]FI30.03.2016
HR30.03.2016
NO30.06.2016
GR01.07.2016
Cited inInternational search[X]EP1596478  (COMMSCOPE SOLUTIONS PROPERTIES [US]) [X] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [X]US6231397  (DE LA BORBOLLA IAN RUBIN [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * column 8, line 28 - column 15, line 51 * * figures 1,2,6-21 *;
 [I]US6443777  (MCCURDY ALAN H [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [X]EP1406354  (AVAYA TECHNOLOGY CORP [US]) [X] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [XD]EP0901201  (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [XD] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0027] * * figures 6-7F *;
 [XPI]WO2009131640  (TYCO ELECTRONICS CORP [US], et al) [XP] 1-3,6-15 * the whole document * [I] 4,5
by applicantUS5997358
 US20090547321
 US20090547211
 US20080190920
 US20080109544