Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2473084

EP2473084 - BEVERAGE MACHINE FOR A NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  20.09.2013
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.06.2019Change - applicantpublished on 10.07.2019  [2019/28]
07.06.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
07.06.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Société des Produits Nestlé S.A.
Entre-deux-Villes
1800 Vevey / CH
[2019/28]
Former [2012/28]For all designated states
Nestec S.A.
Avenue Nestlé 55
1800 Vevey / CH
Inventor(s)01 / YOAKIM, Alfred
Ch. de la Routiaz 2
1806 Saint-Légier-La Chiésaz / CH
02 / AGON, Fabien Ludovic
Chemin du Clous 2
1897 Le Bouveret / CH
 [2013/26]
Former [2012/28]01 / YOAKIM, Alfred
Ch. de la Routiaz 2
CH-1806 St-legier-la Chiesaz / CH
02 / AGON, Fabien Ludovic
Chemin du Clous 2
CH-1897 Le Bouveret / CH
Representative(s)D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2013/47]Sivier, Damien , et al
Nestec S.A.
CT-IAM
Avenue Nestlé 55
1800 Vevey / CH
Former [2012/28]Sivier, Damien
Nestec S.A. Avenue Nestlé 55
1800 Vevey / CH
Application number, filing date10748090.701.09.2010
WO2010EP62781
Priority number, dateEP2009016921102.09.2009         Original published format: EP 09169211
[2012/28]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2011026853
Date:10.03.2011
Language:EN
[2011/10]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2473084
Date:11.07.2012
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.03.2011
[2012/28]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2473084
Date:23.10.2013
Language:EN
[2013/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP10.03.2011
ClassificationInternational:A47J31/52
[2012/28]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/28]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:GETRÄNKEMASCHINE FÜR EIN NETZWERK[2013/26]
English:BEVERAGE MACHINE FOR A NETWORK[2012/28]
French:MACHINE DE BOISSONS POUR RÉSEAU[2013/26]
Former [2012/28]GETRÄNKEAUTOMAT FÜR EIN NETZWERK
Former [2012/28]MACHINE À BOISSONS POUR UN RÉSEAU
Entry into regional phase02.04.2012National basic fee paid 
02.04.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
02.04.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.04.2012Examination requested  [2012/28]
12.11.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.06.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.08.2013Fee for grant paid
12.08.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  03.06.2013
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  23.07.2014   
González Posada, Luis
Avd/ Espandaña 72
47140 Valladolid / ES
Opponent's representative
Carpintero Lopez, Francisco
Herrero & Asociados, S.L.
Cedaceros 1
28014 Madrid / ES
 02  23.07.2014   
Mondelez Global LLC
Three Parkway North
Deerfield, IL 60015 / US
Opponent's representative
Boult Wade Tennant LLP
Salisbury Square House
8 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8AP / GB
 [N/P]
Former [2014/35]
Opponent(s)01  23.07.2014   
González Posada, Luis
Avd/ Espandaña 72
47140 Valladolid / ES
Opponent's representative
Carpintero Lopez, Francisco
Herrero & Asociados, S.L. Alcalá 35
28014 Madrid / ES
 02  23.07.2014   
Mondelez Global LLC
Three Parkway North
Deerfield, IL 60015 / US
Opponent's representative
Boult Wade Tennant
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
27.08.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
04.03.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
18.04.2016Date of oral proceedings
15.07.2016Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
15.07.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition23.09.2016Appeal received
25.11.2016Statement of grounds filed
26.09.2016Appeal received No.  T2262/16
24.11.2016Statement of grounds filed
06.02.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.09.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
12.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL23.10.2013
BG23.10.2013
CY23.10.2013
EE23.10.2013
HR23.10.2013
LT23.10.2013
LV23.10.2013
MC23.10.2013
MK23.10.2013
MT23.10.2013
SI23.10.2013
SK23.10.2013
SM23.10.2013
IS23.02.2014
LU01.09.2014
CZ01.09.2016
FI01.09.2016
IE01.09.2016
PL01.09.2016
RO01.09.2016
HU02.09.2016
SE02.09.2016
DK30.09.2016
NO30.09.2016
GR11.04.2017
[2018/46]
Former [2018/30]BG23.10.2013
CY23.10.2013
EE23.10.2013
HR23.10.2013
LT23.10.2013
LV23.10.2013
MC23.10.2013
MK23.10.2013
MT23.10.2013
SI23.10.2013
SK23.10.2013
SM23.10.2013
IS23.02.2014
LU01.09.2014
CZ01.09.2016
FI01.09.2016
IE01.09.2016
PL01.09.2016
RO01.09.2016
HU02.09.2016
SE02.09.2016
DK30.09.2016
NO30.09.2016
GR11.04.2017
Former [2018/12]BG23.10.2013
CY23.10.2013
EE23.10.2013
HR23.10.2013
LT23.10.2013
LV23.10.2013
MC23.10.2013
MT23.10.2013
SI23.10.2013
SK23.10.2013
SM23.10.2013
IS23.02.2014
LU01.09.2014
CZ01.09.2016
FI01.09.2016
IE01.09.2016
PL01.09.2016
RO01.09.2016
HU02.09.2016
SE02.09.2016
DK30.09.2016
NO30.09.2016
GR11.04.2017
Former [2017/52]BG23.10.2013
CY23.10.2013
EE23.10.2013
HR23.10.2013
LT23.10.2013
LV23.10.2013
MC23.10.2013
MT23.10.2013
SI23.10.2013
SK23.10.2013
SM23.10.2013
IS23.02.2014
LU01.09.2014
CZ01.09.2016
FI01.09.2016
IE01.09.2016
RO01.09.2016
HU02.09.2016
SE02.09.2016
DK30.09.2016
NO30.09.2016
GR11.04.2017
Former [2017/41]BG23.10.2013
CY23.10.2013
EE23.10.2013
HR23.10.2013
LT23.10.2013
LV23.10.2013
MC23.10.2013
MT23.10.2013
SI23.10.2013
SK23.10.2013
SM23.10.2013
IS23.02.2014
LU01.09.2014
CZ01.09.2016
FI01.09.2016
IE01.09.2016
RO01.09.2016
HU02.09.2016
SE02.09.2016
NO30.09.2016
GR11.04.2017
Former [2017/35]BG23.10.2013
CY23.10.2013
EE23.10.2013
HR23.10.2013
LT23.10.2013
LV23.10.2013
MC23.10.2013
MT23.10.2013
SI23.10.2013
SK23.10.2013
SM23.10.2013
IS23.02.2014
LU01.09.2014
CZ01.09.2016
FI01.09.2016
IE01.09.2016
RO01.09.2016
SE02.09.2016
NO30.09.2016
Former [2017/32]BG23.10.2013
CY23.10.2013
EE23.10.2013
HR23.10.2013
LT23.10.2013
LV23.10.2013
MC23.10.2013
MT23.10.2013
SI23.10.2013
SK23.10.2013
SM23.10.2013
IS23.02.2014
LU01.09.2014
CZ01.09.2016
FI01.09.2016
IE01.09.2016
RO01.09.2016
SE02.09.2016
Former [2017/31]BG23.10.2013
CY23.10.2013
EE23.10.2013
HR23.10.2013
LT23.10.2013
LV23.10.2013
MC23.10.2013
MT23.10.2013
SI23.10.2013
SK23.10.2013
SM23.10.2013
IS23.02.2014
LU01.09.2014
CZ01.09.2016
FI01.09.2016
RO01.09.2016
SE02.09.2016
Former [2016/28]BG23.10.2013
CY23.10.2013
EE23.10.2013
HR23.10.2013
LT23.10.2013
LV23.10.2013
MC23.10.2013
MT23.10.2013
SI23.10.2013
SK23.10.2013
SM23.10.2013
IS23.02.2014
LU01.09.2014
Former [2016/22]CY23.10.2013
EE23.10.2013
HR23.10.2013
LT23.10.2013
LV23.10.2013
MC23.10.2013
SI23.10.2013
SK23.10.2013
SM23.10.2013
IS23.02.2014
LU01.09.2014
Former [2015/22]CY23.10.2013
EE23.10.2013
HR23.10.2013
LT23.10.2013
LV23.10.2013
MC23.10.2013
SI23.10.2013
SK23.10.2013
IS23.02.2014
LU01.09.2014
Former [2015/20]CY23.10.2013
EE23.10.2013
HR23.10.2013
LT23.10.2013
LV23.10.2013
MC23.10.2013
SI23.10.2013
SK23.10.2013
IS23.02.2014
Former [2015/14]CY23.10.2013
EE23.10.2013
HR23.10.2013
LT23.10.2013
LV23.10.2013
SI23.10.2013
SK23.10.2013
IS23.02.2014
Former [2014/37]CY23.10.2013
EE23.10.2013
HR23.10.2013
LT23.10.2013
LV23.10.2013
SK23.10.2013
IS23.02.2014
Former [2014/36]CY23.10.2013
EE23.10.2013
HR23.10.2013
LT23.10.2013
LV23.10.2013
IS23.02.2014
Former [2014/26]CY23.10.2013
HR23.10.2013
LT23.10.2013
LV23.10.2013
IS23.02.2014
Former [2014/25]HR23.10.2013
LT23.10.2013
LV23.10.2013
IS23.02.2014
Former [2014/23]HR23.10.2013
LT23.10.2013
IS23.02.2014
Former [2014/20]LT23.10.2013
Cited inInternational search[X]EP2085000  (KRAFT FOODS R & D INC [DE]) [X] 1-3,5-7,9-15 * paragraphs [0016] , [0018] , [0020] - [0031] - [0033] - [0040]; figure - *;
 [X]US2005154644  (DEAKIN WILLIAM J [US], et al) [X] 1-3,8-13,15 * paragraphs [0002] , [0037] - [0039] - [0043] - [0045] - [0054] - [0056]; figures 1-3 *
by applicantAT410377B
 CH682798
 DE4429353
 DE20200419U
 DE202006019039U
 DE202007008590U
 EP1302138
 EP1448084
 EP1676509
 EP2085000
 FR2624844
 GB2397510
 US4377049
 US4458735
 US4554419
 US4767632
 US4954697
 US5312020
 US5335705
 US5372061
 US5375508
 US5731981
 US5645230
 US5836236
 US5959869
 US6182555
 US6354341
 US6759072
 US2005154644
 US2007157820
 WO9725634
 WO9950172
 WO2004030435
 WO2004030438
 WO2006063645
 WO2006090183
 WO2007003062
 WO2007003990
 WO2008104751
 WO2008138710
 WO2008138820
 WO2009016490
 WO2009074550
 EP20080155851
 WO2009EP53368
 WO2009EP58540
OppositionDE202009003896U
 US2005033646
 WO03005295
 US2007235465
 EP2085000
 US2005154644