Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2470293

EP2470293 - MIXER FOR MIXING A DENTAL MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2012/27]MIXER FOR MIXING A DENTAL MATERIAL, AND DEVICES FOR DISPENSING A DENTAL MATERIAL
[2015/11]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  09.05.2015
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.08.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
07.08.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
3M Innovative Properties Company
3M Center
P.O.Box 33427
St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
[N/P]
Former [2012/27]For all designated states
3M Innovative Properties Company
3M Center Post Office Box 33427
Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
Inventor(s)01 / WALTER, Alexander
ESPE Platz
82229 Seefeld / DE
02 / GRAMANN, Jens
ESPE Platz
82229 Seefeld / DE
03 / HARRE, Manfred
ESPE Platz
82229 Seefeld / DE
04 / JELOVAC, Emir
ESPE Platz
82229 Seefeld / DE
05 / PEUKER, Marc
ESPE Platz
82229 Seefeld / DE
 [2012/27]
Representative(s)Hohmann, Arno
3M Deutschland GmbH
Office of Intellectual Property Counsel
ESPE Platz
82229 Seefeld / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/27]Hohmann, Arno
3M Deutschland GmbH
Office of Intellectual Property Counsel
Espe Platz
82229 Seefeld / DE
Application number, filing date10748197.023.08.2010
WO2010US46357
Priority number, dateGB2009001500728.08.2009         Original published format: GB 0915007
[2012/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2011031440
Date:17.03.2011
Language:EN
[2011/11]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2470293
Date:04.07.2012
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.03.2011
[2012/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2470293
Date:03.06.2015
Language:EN
[2015/23]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP17.03.2011
ClassificationInternational:B01F7/00, A61C9/00, F16D1/10, // B01F15/00
[2015/11]
Former International [2012/27]B01F7/16, B01F15/00, A61C9/00, F16D1/10
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/27]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:MISCHER ZUM MISCHEN VON DENTALMATERIAL[2015/11]
English:MIXER FOR MIXING A DENTAL MATERIAL[2015/11]
French:MELANGEUR POUR MELANGE DE MATERIAU DENTAIRE[2015/22]
Former [2012/27]MISCHER ZUM MISCHEN VON ZAHNMATERIAL UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR AUSGABE EINES ZAHNMATERIALS
Former [2012/27]MIXER FOR MIXING A DENTAL MATERIAL, AND DEVICES FOR DISPENSING A DENTAL MATERIAL
Former [2012/27]MÉLANGEUR POUR MÉLANGE DE MATÉRIAU DENTAIRE ET DISPOSITIFS DE DISTRIBUTION DE MATÉRIAU DENTAIRE
Entry into regional phase24.02.2012National basic fee paid 
24.02.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
24.02.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.02.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.02.2012Examination requested  [2012/27]
04.02.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.06.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.06.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.10.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.02.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.05.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.06.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.09.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.02.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.04.2015Fee for grant paid
23.04.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
23.04.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  04.02.2013
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  02.03.2016  09.03.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Sulzer Mixpac AG
Rütistrasse 7
9469 Haag / CH
Opponent's representative
Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Martin-Greif-Strasse 1
80336 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2016/15]
Opponent(s)01  02.03.2016  09.03.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Sulzer Mixpac AG
Rütistrasse 7
9469 Haag / CH
Opponent's representative
Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR
Martin-Greif-Strasse 1
80336 München / DE
07.04.2016Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
04.10.2016Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
04.10.2017Date of oral proceedings
08.11.2017Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
08.11.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition16.01.2018Appeal received No.  T0142/18
08.03.2018Statement of grounds filed
18.01.2018Appeal received No.  T0142/18
02.03.2018Statement of grounds filed
16.06.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.08.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
19.08.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
13.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU23.08.2010
AL03.06.2015
AT03.06.2015
BE03.06.2015
CY03.06.2015
CZ03.06.2015
DK03.06.2015
EE03.06.2015
ES03.06.2015
FI03.06.2015
HR03.06.2015
IT03.06.2015
LT03.06.2015
LV03.06.2015
MC03.06.2015
MK03.06.2015
MT03.06.2015
NL03.06.2015
PL03.06.2015
RO03.06.2015
SE03.06.2015
SI03.06.2015
SK03.06.2015
SM03.06.2015
TR03.06.2015
IE23.08.2015
LU23.08.2015
FR31.08.2015
BG03.09.2015
GB03.09.2015
NO03.09.2015
GR04.09.2015
IS03.10.2015
PT06.10.2015
CH31.08.2018
LI31.08.2018
[2019/21]
Former [2018/47]HU23.08.2010
AL03.06.2015
AT03.06.2015
BE03.06.2015
CY03.06.2015
CZ03.06.2015
DK03.06.2015
EE03.06.2015
ES03.06.2015
FI03.06.2015
HR03.06.2015
IT03.06.2015
LT03.06.2015
LV03.06.2015
MC03.06.2015
MK03.06.2015
MT03.06.2015
NL03.06.2015
PL03.06.2015
RO03.06.2015
SE03.06.2015
SI03.06.2015
SK03.06.2015
SM03.06.2015
TR03.06.2015
IE23.08.2015
LU23.08.2015
FR31.08.2015
BG03.09.2015
GB03.09.2015
NO03.09.2015
GR04.09.2015
IS03.10.2015
PT06.10.2015
Former [2018/30]HU23.08.2010
AT03.06.2015
BE03.06.2015
CY03.06.2015
CZ03.06.2015
DK03.06.2015
EE03.06.2015
ES03.06.2015
FI03.06.2015
HR03.06.2015
IT03.06.2015
LT03.06.2015
LV03.06.2015
MC03.06.2015
MK03.06.2015
MT03.06.2015
NL03.06.2015
PL03.06.2015
RO03.06.2015
SE03.06.2015
SI03.06.2015
SK03.06.2015
SM03.06.2015
TR03.06.2015
IE23.08.2015
LU23.08.2015
FR31.08.2015
BG03.09.2015
GB03.09.2015
NO03.09.2015
GR04.09.2015
IS03.10.2015
PT06.10.2015
Former [2017/38]HU23.08.2010
AT03.06.2015
BE03.06.2015
CY03.06.2015
CZ03.06.2015
DK03.06.2015
EE03.06.2015
ES03.06.2015
FI03.06.2015
HR03.06.2015
IT03.06.2015
LT03.06.2015
LV03.06.2015
MC03.06.2015
MT03.06.2015
NL03.06.2015
PL03.06.2015
RO03.06.2015
SE03.06.2015
SI03.06.2015
SK03.06.2015
SM03.06.2015
TR03.06.2015
IE23.08.2015
LU23.08.2015
FR31.08.2015
BG03.09.2015
GB03.09.2015
NO03.09.2015
GR04.09.2015
IS03.10.2015
PT06.10.2015
Former [2017/21]AT03.06.2015
BE03.06.2015
CZ03.06.2015
DK03.06.2015
EE03.06.2015
ES03.06.2015
FI03.06.2015
HR03.06.2015
IT03.06.2015
LT03.06.2015
LV03.06.2015
MC03.06.2015
MT03.06.2015
PL03.06.2015
RO03.06.2015
SI03.06.2015
SK03.06.2015
IE23.08.2015
LU23.08.2015
FR31.08.2015
BG03.09.2015
GB03.09.2015
NO03.09.2015
GR04.09.2015
IS03.10.2015
PT06.10.2015
Former [2017/03]AT03.06.2015
BE03.06.2015
CZ03.06.2015
DK03.06.2015
EE03.06.2015
ES03.06.2015
FI03.06.2015
HR03.06.2015
IT03.06.2015
LT03.06.2015
LV03.06.2015
MC03.06.2015
PL03.06.2015
RO03.06.2015
SI03.06.2015
SK03.06.2015
IE23.08.2015
LU23.08.2015
FR31.08.2015
BG03.09.2015
GB03.09.2015
NO03.09.2015
GR04.09.2015
IS03.10.2015
PT06.10.2015
Former [2016/36]AT03.06.2015
CZ03.06.2015
DK03.06.2015
EE03.06.2015
ES03.06.2015
FI03.06.2015
HR03.06.2015
IT03.06.2015
LT03.06.2015
LV03.06.2015
MC03.06.2015
PL03.06.2015
RO03.06.2015
SI03.06.2015
SK03.06.2015
IE23.08.2015
LU23.08.2015
FR31.08.2015
BG03.09.2015
GB03.09.2015
NO03.09.2015
GR04.09.2015
IS03.10.2015
PT06.10.2015
Former [2016/34]AT03.06.2015
CZ03.06.2015
DK03.06.2015
EE03.06.2015
ES03.06.2015
FI03.06.2015
HR03.06.2015
IT03.06.2015
LT03.06.2015
LV03.06.2015
MC03.06.2015
PL03.06.2015
RO03.06.2015
SI03.06.2015
SK03.06.2015
IE23.08.2015
LU23.08.2015
BG03.09.2015
GB03.09.2015
NO03.09.2015
GR04.09.2015
IS03.10.2015
PT06.10.2015
Former [2016/33]AT03.06.2015
CZ03.06.2015
DK03.06.2015
EE03.06.2015
ES03.06.2015
FI03.06.2015
HR03.06.2015
IT03.06.2015
LT03.06.2015
LV03.06.2015
MC03.06.2015
PL03.06.2015
RO03.06.2015
SI03.06.2015
SK03.06.2015
IE23.08.2015
LU23.08.2015
BG03.09.2015
NO03.09.2015
GR04.09.2015
IS03.10.2015
PT06.10.2015
Former [2016/24]AT03.06.2015
CZ03.06.2015
DK03.06.2015
EE03.06.2015
ES03.06.2015
FI03.06.2015
HR03.06.2015
IT03.06.2015
LT03.06.2015
LV03.06.2015
MC03.06.2015
PL03.06.2015
RO03.06.2015
SI03.06.2015
SK03.06.2015
LU23.08.2015
BG03.09.2015
NO03.09.2015
GR04.09.2015
IS03.10.2015
PT06.10.2015
Former [2016/21]AT03.06.2015
CZ03.06.2015
DK03.06.2015
EE03.06.2015
ES03.06.2015
FI03.06.2015
HR03.06.2015
IT03.06.2015
LT03.06.2015
LV03.06.2015
MC03.06.2015
PL03.06.2015
RO03.06.2015
SK03.06.2015
LU23.08.2015
BG03.09.2015
NO03.09.2015
GR04.09.2015
IS03.10.2015
PT06.10.2015
Former [2016/20]AT03.06.2015
CZ03.06.2015
DK03.06.2015
EE03.06.2015
ES03.06.2015
FI03.06.2015
HR03.06.2015
LT03.06.2015
LV03.06.2015
MC03.06.2015
PL03.06.2015
RO03.06.2015
SK03.06.2015
LU23.08.2015
BG03.09.2015
NO03.09.2015
GR04.09.2015
IS03.10.2015
PT06.10.2015
Former [2016/18]AT03.06.2015
CZ03.06.2015
EE03.06.2015
ES03.06.2015
FI03.06.2015
HR03.06.2015
LT03.06.2015
LV03.06.2015
MC03.06.2015
PL03.06.2015
RO03.06.2015
SK03.06.2015
LU23.08.2015
BG03.09.2015
NO03.09.2015
GR04.09.2015
IS03.10.2015
PT06.10.2015
Former [2016/17]AT03.06.2015
CZ03.06.2015
EE03.06.2015
ES03.06.2015
FI03.06.2015
HR03.06.2015
LT03.06.2015
LV03.06.2015
PL03.06.2015
RO03.06.2015
SK03.06.2015
LU23.08.2015
BG03.09.2015
NO03.09.2015
GR04.09.2015
IS03.10.2015
PT06.10.2015
Former [2016/10]AT03.06.2015
CZ03.06.2015
EE03.06.2015
ES03.06.2015
FI03.06.2015
HR03.06.2015
LT03.06.2015
LV03.06.2015
PL03.06.2015
RO03.06.2015
SK03.06.2015
BG03.09.2015
NO03.09.2015
GR04.09.2015
IS03.10.2015
PT06.10.2015
Former [2016/09]AT03.06.2015
EE03.06.2015
ES03.06.2015
FI03.06.2015
HR03.06.2015
LT03.06.2015
LV03.06.2015
BG03.09.2015
NO03.09.2015
GR04.09.2015
Former [2015/51]AT03.06.2015
ES03.06.2015
FI03.06.2015
HR03.06.2015
LT03.06.2015
LV03.06.2015
BG03.09.2015
NO03.09.2015
GR04.09.2015
Former [2015/50]ES03.06.2015
FI03.06.2015
HR03.06.2015
LT03.06.2015
LV03.06.2015
BG03.09.2015
NO03.09.2015
GR04.09.2015
Former [2015/49]ES03.06.2015
FI03.06.2015
HR03.06.2015
LT03.06.2015
LV03.06.2015
NO03.09.2015
GR04.09.2015
Cited inInternational search[AD]WO2007106701  (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US], et al) [AD] 1-15 * page 1, lines 5-9 * * page 2, line 14 - page 3, line 2 * * page 10, lines 28-33 * * page 11, line 19 - page 14, line 16 * * abstract *;
 [AD]EP1458467  (KETTENBACH GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [AD] 1-15 * paragraphs [0034] - [0036] * * abstract *;
 [A]US6244740  (WAGNER INGO [DE], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract *;
 [A]DE9313604U  (GOBBERS WALTER [DE], et al) [A] 1-15 * figures 1,2 *;
 [A]GB2113352  (WALTERSCHEID GMBH JEAN) [A] 1-15 * abstract *;
 [A]DE20016245U  (HOCHSTRATE GUSTAV ADOLF [DE]) [A] 1-15 * abstract *;
 [A]AT332527B  (BUERMOOS DENTALWERK [AT]) [A] 1-15 * figures 1-4 *
ExaminationUS3542178
by applicantWO2007106701
 EP1458467
OppositionWO2007106701
 GB2285110
 FR2558224
 WO0226448
 DE9313604U
 US5019080
 EP1903223
 US3542178
 EP1458467
 AT332527B
 DE20016245U
 GB2113352
 US6244740
    - German translation of D3