Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2404347

EP2404347 - BALANCED METAMATERIAL ANTENNA DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  26.04.2019
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  15.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip26.04.2019Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 29.05.2019 [2019/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Tyco Electronics Services GmbH
Rheinstrasse 20
8200 Schaffhausen / CH
[2012/50]
Former [2012/02]For all designated states
Rayspan Corporation
11975 El Camino Real, Suite 301
San Diego, CA 92130 / US
Inventor(s)01 / HUANG, Wei
3555 Caminito El Rincon
230
San Diego California 92130 / US
02 / PENEV, Vladimir
11553 Hadar Drive
San Diego California 92126 / US
03 / PATHAK, Vaneet
2723 Escala Circle
San Diego California 92108 / US
04 / POILASNE, Gregory
2097 Valley View Blvd.
El Cajon California 92019 / US
 [2012/02]
Representative(s)Schwegman Lundberg Woessner Limited
Hillington Park Innovation Centre
1 Ainslie Road
Glasgow G52 4RU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2012/02]Bongiovanni, Simone , et al
Studio Torta S.p.A.
Via Viotti, 9
10121 Torino / IT
Application number, filing date10749288.603.03.2010
WO2010US26099
Priority number, dateUS20090157132P03.03.2009         Original published format: US 157132 P
US20090223911P08.07.2009         Original published format: US 223911 P
[2012/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2010102042
Date:10.09.2010
Language:EN
[2010/36]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2404347
Date:11.01.2012
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.09.2010
[2012/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR13.01.2011
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.03.2014
ClassificationInternational:H01Q1/38, H01Q9/04, H01Q15/00, H01Q9/16
[2014/17]
Former International [2012/02]H01Q1/38, H01Q9/04
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/02]
TitleGerman:AUSGEGLICHENE METAMATERIALANTENNENVORRICHTUNG[2012/02]
English:BALANCED METAMATERIAL ANTENNA DEVICE[2012/02]
French:DISPOSITIF D'ANTENNE À MÉTAMATÉRIAU ÉQUILIBRÉ[2012/02]
Entry into regional phase03.10.2011National basic fee paid 
03.10.2011Search fee paid 
03.10.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
03.10.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.10.2011Examination requested  [2012/02]
17.10.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.06.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.09.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.02.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.06.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.02.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.07.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.04.2019Application withdrawn by applicant  [2019/22]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  20.06.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
27.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
27.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
27.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
31.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
27.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
13.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 09
13.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:Search[XYI]WO2008115881  (RAYSPAN CORP [US], et al) [X] 1,3,14 * figures 7-9 * * paragraphs [0096] - [0099] * * paragraphs [0104] - [0105] * [Y] 5-13,15 [I] 2,4;
 [A]WO2008024993  (RAYSPAN CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * figure 33 * * paragraphs [0106] , [0107] *
 [Y]  - MARK A CAMPBELL ET AL, "Ultra-Wideband Microstrip to Parallel Strip Balun with Constant Characteristic Impedance", EMTS 2007 INTERNATIONAL URSI COMMISION B - ELECTROMAGNETIC THEORY SYMPOSIUM, JULY 26-28, 2007, OTTAWA, ON, CANADA,, (20070726), page 3pp, XP009176578 [Y] 5-13,15 * abstract * * page 1 *
International search[X]US2008258993  (GUMMALLA AJAY [US], et al);
 [Y]JP2006014157  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD);
 [X]US2008258981  (ACHOUR MAHA [US], et al);
 [A]US2007176827  (ITOH TATSUO [US], et al);
 [A]EP1376759  (HARRIS CORP [US])
by applicantUS7592957
    - TATSUO ITOH, "Invited paper: Prospects for Metamaterials", ELECTRONICS LETTERS, (200408), vol. 40, no. 16, doi:doi:10.1049/el:20046267, XP006022467

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1049/el:20046267
    - MARK A. CAMPBELL, M. OKONIEWSKI, ELISE C. FEAR, ULTRA-WIDEBAND MICROSTRIP TO PARALLEL STRIP BALUN WITH CONSTANT CHARACTERISTIC IMPEDANCE
    - MAHMOUD BASRAOUI, WIDEBAND, PLANAR, LOG-PERIODIC BALUN
    - S. N. PRASAD, DESIGN OF IMPROVED MARCHAND BALUN USING PATTERNED GROUND PLANE
    - N S SREERAM, MICROELECTRONICS
 US20070741674
 US20080250477
 US20080270410
 US20090465571
 US20090536422