Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2464269

EP2464269 - AUTONOMOUS COVERAGE ROBOTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.04.2017
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
iRobot Corporation
8 Crosby Drive
Bedford, MA 01730 / US
[2012/25]
Inventor(s)01 / HUSSEY, Patrick Alan
2 Abbott Lane
Unit 7
Concord, MA 01742 / US
02 / ROY, Robert Paul
24 Stewart Street
Dracut, MA 01826 / US
03 / NEUMANN, Rogelio Manfred
66 Jaques Street
Somerville, MA 02145 / US
04 / SVENDSEN, Selma
7 Cameron Road
Andover, MA 01810 / US
05 / OZICK, Daniel N.
131 Warren Street
Newton, MA 02459 / US
06 / CASEY, Christopher M.
155 Concord Avenue
Lexington, MA 02421 / US
07 / KAPOOR, Deepak Ramesh
22575 Alcalde Road
Cupertino, CA 65014 / US
08 / CAMPBELL, Tony L.
33 Summerhill Street
Stoncham, MA 02180 / US
09 / WON, Chikyung
42 Windham Road
Tewksbury, MA 01876 / US
10 / MORSE, Christopher John
130 Glen Street
Malden, MA 02148 / US
11 / BURNETT, Scott Thomas
24 Golden Brook Road
Windham, NH 03087 / US
 [2016/22]
Former [2012/25]01 / HUSSEY, Patrick Alan
2 Abbott Lane
Unit 7
Concord Massachusetts 01742 / US
02 / ROY, Robert Paul
24 Stewart Street
Dracut Massachusetts 01826 / US
03 / NEUMANN, Rogelio Manfred
66 Jaques Street
Somerville Massachusetts 02145 / US
04 / SVENDSEN, Selma
7 Cameron Road
Andover Massachusetts 01810 / US
05 / OZICK, Daniel N.
131 Warren Street
Newton Massachusetts 02459 / US
06 / CASEY, Christopher M.
155 Concord Avenue
Lexington Massachusetts 02421 / US
07 / KAPOOR, Deepak Ramesh
22575 Alcalde Road
Cupertino California 65014 / US
08 / CAMPBELL, Tony L.
33 Summerhill Street
Stoncham, MA 02180 / US
09 / WON, Chikyung
42 Windham Road
Tewksbury Massachusetts 01876 / US
10 / MORSE, Christopher John
130 Glen Street
Malden Massachusetts 02148 / US
11 / BURNETT, Scott Thomas
24 Golden Brook Road
Windham New Hampshire 03087 / US
Representative(s)Peterreins Schley , et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Hermann-Sack-Strasse 3
80331 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2016/22]Peterreins Schley , et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Soeltlstraße 2a
81545 München / DE
Former [2012/25]Schley, Jan Malte , et al
Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Str. 8
80807 München / DE
Application number, filing date10750199.113.08.2010
[2016/22]
WO2010US45502
Priority number, dateUS2009054088413.08.2009         Original published format: US 540884
[2012/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2011020040
Date:17.02.2011
Language:EN
[2011/07]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2464269
Date:20.06.2012
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.02.2011
[2012/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2464269
Date:01.06.2016
Language:EN
[2016/22]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP17.02.2011
ClassificationInternational:A47L5/30, A47L11/24, A47L11/40, G05D1/02, A47L9/04
[2015/48]
Former International [2012/25]A47L9/04, A46B17/06
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/25]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ROBOTER MIT AUTONOMER REICHWEITE[2012/25]
English:AUTONOMOUS COVERAGE ROBOTS[2012/25]
French:ROBOTS DE SURFACE AUTONOMES[2012/25]
Entry into regional phase01.03.2012National basic fee paid 
01.03.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
01.03.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.03.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.03.2012Examination requested  [2012/25]
13.11.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.02.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.03.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.06.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.12.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.04.2016Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
07.04.2016Fee for grant paid
07.04.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
25.04.2016Information about intention to grant a patent
25.04.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP15171282.5  / EP2944246
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  13.11.2013
Opposition(s)02.03.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.08.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
27.08.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
27.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
27.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU13.08.2010
AL01.06.2016
AT01.06.2016
BE01.06.2016
BG01.06.2016
CY01.06.2016
CZ01.06.2016
DK01.06.2016
EE01.06.2016
ES01.06.2016
FI01.06.2016
HR01.06.2016
IT01.06.2016
LT01.06.2016
LV01.06.2016
MC01.06.2016
MK01.06.2016
NL01.06.2016
PL01.06.2016
RO01.06.2016
SE01.06.2016
SI01.06.2016
SK01.06.2016
SM01.06.2016
TR01.06.2016
IE13.08.2016
LU13.08.2016
CH31.08.2016
LI31.08.2016
MT31.08.2016
NO01.09.2016
GR02.09.2016
IS01.10.2016
PT03.10.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/38]HU13.08.2010
AT01.06.2016
BE01.06.2016
BG01.06.2016
CY01.06.2016
CZ01.06.2016
DK01.06.2016
EE01.06.2016
ES01.06.2016
FI01.06.2016
HR01.06.2016
IT01.06.2016
LT01.06.2016
LV01.06.2016
MC01.06.2016
MK01.06.2016
NL01.06.2016
PL01.06.2016
RO01.06.2016
SE01.06.2016
SI01.06.2016
SK01.06.2016
SM01.06.2016
TR01.06.2016
IE13.08.2016
LU13.08.2016
CH31.08.2016
LI31.08.2016
MT31.08.2016
NO01.09.2016
GR02.09.2016
IS01.10.2016
PT03.10.2016
Former [2018/33]HU13.08.2010
AT01.06.2016
BE01.06.2016
CY01.06.2016
CZ01.06.2016
DK01.06.2016
EE01.06.2016
ES01.06.2016
FI01.06.2016
HR01.06.2016
IT01.06.2016
LT01.06.2016
LV01.06.2016
MC01.06.2016
MK01.06.2016
NL01.06.2016
PL01.06.2016
RO01.06.2016
SE01.06.2016
SI01.06.2016
SK01.06.2016
SM01.06.2016
TR01.06.2016
IE13.08.2016
LU13.08.2016
CH31.08.2016
LI31.08.2016
MT31.08.2016
NO01.09.2016
GR02.09.2016
IS01.10.2016
PT03.10.2016
Former [2018/29]HU13.08.2010
AT01.06.2016
BE01.06.2016
CY01.06.2016
CZ01.06.2016
DK01.06.2016
EE01.06.2016
ES01.06.2016
FI01.06.2016
HR01.06.2016
IT01.06.2016
LT01.06.2016
LV01.06.2016
MC01.06.2016
MK01.06.2016
NL01.06.2016
PL01.06.2016
RO01.06.2016
SE01.06.2016
SI01.06.2016
SK01.06.2016
SM01.06.2016
TR01.06.2016
IE13.08.2016
LU13.08.2016
CH31.08.2016
LI31.08.2016
NO01.09.2016
GR02.09.2016
IS01.10.2016
PT03.10.2016
Former [2018/28]HU13.08.2010
AT01.06.2016
BE01.06.2016
CY01.06.2016
CZ01.06.2016
DK01.06.2016
EE01.06.2016
ES01.06.2016
FI01.06.2016
HR01.06.2016
IT01.06.2016
LT01.06.2016
LV01.06.2016
MC01.06.2016
MK01.06.2016
NL01.06.2016
PL01.06.2016
RO01.06.2016
SE01.06.2016
SI01.06.2016
SK01.06.2016
SM01.06.2016
IE13.08.2016
LU13.08.2016
CH31.08.2016
LI31.08.2016
NO01.09.2016
GR02.09.2016
IS01.10.2016
PT03.10.2016
Former [2017/37]AT01.06.2016
BE01.06.2016
CZ01.06.2016
DK01.06.2016
EE01.06.2016
ES01.06.2016
FI01.06.2016
HR01.06.2016
IT01.06.2016
LT01.06.2016
LV01.06.2016
MC01.06.2016
NL01.06.2016
PL01.06.2016
RO01.06.2016
SE01.06.2016
SI01.06.2016
SK01.06.2016
SM01.06.2016
IE13.08.2016
LU13.08.2016
CH31.08.2016
LI31.08.2016
NO01.09.2016
GR02.09.2016
IS01.10.2016
PT03.10.2016
Former [2017/24]AT01.06.2016
BE01.06.2016
CZ01.06.2016
DK01.06.2016
EE01.06.2016
ES01.06.2016
FI01.06.2016
HR01.06.2016
IT01.06.2016
LT01.06.2016
LV01.06.2016
MC01.06.2016
NL01.06.2016
PL01.06.2016
RO01.06.2016
SE01.06.2016
SI01.06.2016
SK01.06.2016
SM01.06.2016
CH31.08.2016
LI31.08.2016
NO01.09.2016
GR02.09.2016
IS01.10.2016
PT03.10.2016
Former [2017/23]AT01.06.2016
BE01.06.2016
CZ01.06.2016
EE01.06.2016
ES01.06.2016
FI01.06.2016
HR01.06.2016
IT01.06.2016
LT01.06.2016
LV01.06.2016
MC01.06.2016
NL01.06.2016
PL01.06.2016
RO01.06.2016
SE01.06.2016
SI01.06.2016
SK01.06.2016
SM01.06.2016
CH31.08.2016
LI31.08.2016
NO01.09.2016
GR02.09.2016
IS01.10.2016
PT03.10.2016
Former [2017/17]AT01.06.2016
BE01.06.2016
CZ01.06.2016
EE01.06.2016
ES01.06.2016
FI01.06.2016
HR01.06.2016
IT01.06.2016
LT01.06.2016
LV01.06.2016
MC01.06.2016
NL01.06.2016
PL01.06.2016
RO01.06.2016
SE01.06.2016
SK01.06.2016
SM01.06.2016
NO01.09.2016
GR02.09.2016
IS01.10.2016
PT03.10.2016
Former [2017/11]AT01.06.2016
BE01.06.2016
CZ01.06.2016
EE01.06.2016
ES01.06.2016
FI01.06.2016
HR01.06.2016
IT01.06.2016
LT01.06.2016
LV01.06.2016
NL01.06.2016
PL01.06.2016
RO01.06.2016
SE01.06.2016
SK01.06.2016
SM01.06.2016
NO01.09.2016
GR02.09.2016
IS01.10.2016
PT03.10.2016
Former [2017/10]BE01.06.2016
CZ01.06.2016
EE01.06.2016
ES01.06.2016
FI01.06.2016
HR01.06.2016
IT01.06.2016
LT01.06.2016
LV01.06.2016
NL01.06.2016
PL01.06.2016
RO01.06.2016
SE01.06.2016
SK01.06.2016
NO01.09.2016
GR02.09.2016
IS01.10.2016
Former [2017/09]CZ01.06.2016
EE01.06.2016
ES01.06.2016
FI01.06.2016
HR01.06.2016
IT01.06.2016
LT01.06.2016
LV01.06.2016
NL01.06.2016
RO01.06.2016
SE01.06.2016
BE31.08.2016
NO01.09.2016
GR02.09.2016
Former [2017/03]ES01.06.2016
FI01.06.2016
HR01.06.2016
LT01.06.2016
LV01.06.2016
NL01.06.2016
SE01.06.2016
BE31.08.2016
NO01.09.2016
GR02.09.2016
Former [2016/52]ES01.06.2016
FI01.06.2016
HR01.06.2016
LT01.06.2016
LV01.06.2016
NL01.06.2016
SE01.06.2016
NO01.09.2016
GR02.09.2016
Former [2016/51]ES01.06.2016
FI01.06.2016
HR01.06.2016
LT01.06.2016
LV01.06.2016
NO01.09.2016
GR02.09.2016
Former [2016/50]ES01.06.2016
FI01.06.2016
HR01.06.2016
LT01.06.2016
LV01.06.2016
NO01.09.2016
Former [2016/49]FI01.06.2016
LT01.06.2016
NO01.09.2016
Former [2016/46]LT01.06.2016
NO01.09.2016
Cited inInternational search[XY]US2007266508  (JONES JOSEPH L [US], et al) [X] 13 * abstract * * paragraph [0065] - paragraph [0067]; figures 1-7B * [Y] 1-12,14-31;
 [Y]EP1228734  (BERTOLA PIERANGELO [IT]) [Y] 1-12,14-31 * abstract *;
 [A]WO2007137234  (IROBOT CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-31 * abstract *;
 [A]US3863285  (HUKUBA HIROSHI) [A] 1-31 * abstract *;
 [AD]US2007234492  (SVENDSEN SELMA [US], et al) [AD] 1-31 * abstract *
by applicantUS6594844
 US6883201
 US6809490
 US6781338
 US20060747791
 US20060633869
 US20060633886
 US20060633883