Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2406597

EP2406597 - METHOD FOR WEIGHING PRODUCTS AND A CHECKWEIGHER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  01.10.2017
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.07.2018New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NORDEN MACHINERY AB
Box 845
391 28 Kalmar / SE
[2012/03]
Inventor(s)01 / NILSSON, Jan
Gäddgatan 2
S-392 47 Kalmar / SE
02 / KARLSSON, Anders
Fiskargatan 66
S-392 31 Kalmar / SE
 [2012/07]
Former [2012/03]01 / NILSSON, Jan
Lindbergsgatan 18
S-392 44 Kalmar / SE
02 / KARLSSON, Anders
Fiskargatan 66
S-392 31 Kalmar / SE
Representative(s)Zacco Sweden AB
P.O. Box 5581
114 85 Stockholm / SE
[2015/23]
Former [2014/45]Zacco Sweden AB
Valhallavägen 117
P.O. Box 5581
114 85 Stockholm / SE
Former [2013/31]Ekwall, Peter , et al
Zacco Sweden AB
P.O. Box 5581
114 85 Stockholm / SE
Former [2012/03]Friberg, Ingvar
Albihns.Zacco Torggatan 8 Box 142
401 22 Göteborg / SE
Application number, filing date10751098.410.03.2010
WO2010SE50270
Priority number, dateSE2009000030910.03.2009         Original published format: SE 0900309
[2012/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2010104465
Date:16.09.2010
Language:EN
[2010/37]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2406597
Date:18.01.2012
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.09.2010
[2012/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2406597
Date:03.06.2015
Language:EN
[2015/23]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE16.09.2010
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.06.2014
ClassificationInternational:G01G15/00
[2012/03]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/03]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM WIEGEN EINES PRODUKTS UND KONTROLLWAAGE[2012/03]
English:METHOD FOR WEIGHING PRODUCTS AND A CHECKWEIGHER[2012/03]
French:PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT DE PESER DES PRODUITS ET BALANCE DE VÉRIFICATION[2012/03]
Entry into regional phase24.08.2011National basic fee paid 
24.08.2011Search fee paid 
24.08.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
24.08.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.08.2011Examination requested  [2012/03]
18.12.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.03.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.04.2015Fee for grant paid
22.04.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
22.04.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  16.03.2015
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  29.02.2016  10.03.2016  ADMISSIBLE
IWK Verpackungstechnik GmbH
Lorenzstrasse 6
76297 Stutensee / DE
Opponent's representative
Lichti - Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Postfach 41 07 60
76207 Karlsruhe / DE
 [2016/15]
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
13.04.2016Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
22.08.2016Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
19.06.2017Date of oral proceedings
02.10.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
02.10.2017Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition30.11.2017Appeal received No.  T2589/17
06.02.2018Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
28.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
12.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
10.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU10.03.2010
AT03.06.2015
BE03.06.2015
CY03.06.2015
CZ03.06.2015
DK03.06.2015
EE03.06.2015
FI03.06.2015
HR03.06.2015
LT03.06.2015
LV03.06.2015
MC03.06.2015
MK03.06.2015
NL03.06.2015
PL03.06.2015
RO03.06.2015
SE03.06.2015
SI03.06.2015
SK03.06.2015
SM03.06.2015
TR03.06.2015
BG03.09.2015
NO03.09.2015
GR04.09.2015
IS03.10.2015
PT06.10.2015
IE10.03.2016
LU10.03.2016
CH31.03.2016
LI31.03.2016
MT31.03.2016
[2018/31]
Former [2018/29]HU10.03.2010
AT03.06.2015
BE03.06.2015
CY03.06.2015
CZ03.06.2015
DK03.06.2015
EE03.06.2015
FI03.06.2015
HR03.06.2015
LT03.06.2015
LV03.06.2015
MC03.06.2015
MK03.06.2015
MT03.06.2015
NL03.06.2015
PL03.06.2015
RO03.06.2015
SE03.06.2015
SI03.06.2015
SK03.06.2015
SM03.06.2015
TR03.06.2015
BG03.09.2015
NO03.09.2015
GR04.09.2015
IS03.10.2015
PT06.10.2015
IE10.03.2016
LU10.03.2016
CH31.03.2016
LI31.03.2016
Former [2018/28]HU10.03.2010
AT03.06.2015
BE03.06.2015
CY03.06.2015
CZ03.06.2015
DK03.06.2015
EE03.06.2015
FI03.06.2015
HR03.06.2015
LT03.06.2015
LV03.06.2015
MC03.06.2015
MK03.06.2015
MT03.06.2015
NL03.06.2015
PL03.06.2015
RO03.06.2015
SE03.06.2015
SI03.06.2015
SK03.06.2015
SM03.06.2015
BG03.09.2015
NO03.09.2015
GR04.09.2015
IS03.10.2015
PT06.10.2015
IE10.03.2016
LU10.03.2016
CH31.03.2016
LI31.03.2016
Former [2017/40]AT03.06.2015
BE03.06.2015
CZ03.06.2015
DK03.06.2015
EE03.06.2015
FI03.06.2015
HR03.06.2015
LT03.06.2015
LV03.06.2015
MC03.06.2015
MT03.06.2015
NL03.06.2015
PL03.06.2015
RO03.06.2015
SE03.06.2015
SI03.06.2015
SK03.06.2015
BG03.09.2015
NO03.09.2015
GR04.09.2015
IS03.10.2015
PT06.10.2015
IE10.03.2016
LU10.03.2016
CH31.03.2016
LI31.03.2016
Former [2017/07]AT03.06.2015
BE03.06.2015
CZ03.06.2015
DK03.06.2015
EE03.06.2015
FI03.06.2015
HR03.06.2015
LT03.06.2015
LV03.06.2015
MC03.06.2015
PL03.06.2015
RO03.06.2015
SI03.06.2015
SK03.06.2015
BG03.09.2015
NO03.09.2015
GR04.09.2015
IS03.10.2015
PT06.10.2015
IE10.03.2016
LU10.03.2016
CH31.03.2016
LI31.03.2016
Former [2017/03]AT03.06.2015
BE03.06.2015
CZ03.06.2015
DK03.06.2015
EE03.06.2015
FI03.06.2015
HR03.06.2015
LT03.06.2015
LV03.06.2015
MC03.06.2015
PL03.06.2015
RO03.06.2015
SI03.06.2015
SK03.06.2015
BG03.09.2015
NO03.09.2015
GR04.09.2015
IS03.10.2015
PT06.10.2015
LU10.03.2016
Former [2016/49]AT03.06.2015
CZ03.06.2015
DK03.06.2015
EE03.06.2015
FI03.06.2015
HR03.06.2015
LT03.06.2015
LV03.06.2015
MC03.06.2015
PL03.06.2015
RO03.06.2015
SI03.06.2015
SK03.06.2015
BG03.09.2015
NO03.09.2015
GR04.09.2015
IS03.10.2015
PT06.10.2015
LU10.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
Former [2016/47]AT03.06.2015
CZ03.06.2015
DK03.06.2015
EE03.06.2015
FI03.06.2015
HR03.06.2015
LT03.06.2015
LV03.06.2015
PL03.06.2015
RO03.06.2015
SI03.06.2015
SK03.06.2015
BG03.09.2015
NO03.09.2015
GR04.09.2015
IS03.10.2015
PT06.10.2015
LU10.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
Former [2016/37]AT03.06.2015
CZ03.06.2015
DK03.06.2015
EE03.06.2015
FI03.06.2015
HR03.06.2015
LT03.06.2015
LV03.06.2015
PL03.06.2015
RO03.06.2015
SI03.06.2015
SK03.06.2015
BG03.09.2015
NO03.09.2015
GR04.09.2015
IS03.10.2015
PT06.10.2015
BE31.03.2016
Former [2016/24]AT03.06.2015
CZ03.06.2015
DK03.06.2015
EE03.06.2015
FI03.06.2015
HR03.06.2015
LT03.06.2015
LV03.06.2015
PL03.06.2015
RO03.06.2015
SI03.06.2015
SK03.06.2015
BG03.09.2015
NO03.09.2015
GR04.09.2015
IS03.10.2015
PT06.10.2015
Former [2016/20]AT03.06.2015
CZ03.06.2015
DK03.06.2015
EE03.06.2015
FI03.06.2015
HR03.06.2015
LT03.06.2015
LV03.06.2015
PL03.06.2015
RO03.06.2015
SK03.06.2015
BG03.09.2015
NO03.09.2015
GR04.09.2015
IS03.10.2015
PT06.10.2015
Former [2016/10]AT03.06.2015
CZ03.06.2015
EE03.06.2015
FI03.06.2015
HR03.06.2015
LT03.06.2015
LV03.06.2015
PL03.06.2015
RO03.06.2015
SK03.06.2015
BG03.09.2015
NO03.09.2015
GR04.09.2015
IS03.10.2015
PT06.10.2015
Former [2016/09]AT03.06.2015
EE03.06.2015
FI03.06.2015
HR03.06.2015
LT03.06.2015
LV03.06.2015
BG03.09.2015
NO03.09.2015
GR04.09.2015
Former [2015/51]AT03.06.2015
FI03.06.2015
HR03.06.2015
LT03.06.2015
LV03.06.2015
BG03.09.2015
NO03.09.2015
GR04.09.2015
Former [2015/50]FI03.06.2015
HR03.06.2015
LT03.06.2015
LV03.06.2015
BG03.09.2015
NO03.09.2015
GR04.09.2015
Former [2015/49]FI03.06.2015
HR03.06.2015
LT03.06.2015
LV03.06.2015
NO03.09.2015
GR04.09.2015
Documents cited:Search[XI]EP0077992  (JACOBS JOH & CO [DE]) [X] 1,9 * abstract * * page 8, line 25 - page 9, line 27 * [I] 2-8,10-22;
 [X]EP0496083  (IMA SPA [IT]) [X] 1,9 * abstract *
International search[A]US6252181  (FALLAS RICHARD J [US], et al);
 [A]WO2006085076  (ISHIDA EUROP LTD [GB], et al);
 [A]EP0540126  (TAS ADRIANUS WILHELMUS [NL]);
 [A]WO9833046  (UNITEC SRL [IT], et al)
OppositionEP0496083
 EP0077992
 EP1980829
 EP1972907